Huerta Morales v. Walt's Wholesale Meats Incorporated
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Tiffany M Cartwright |
Case #: | 3:23-cv-06043 |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Cause | 42:12112 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 14, 2023 |
Terminated: | Sep 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday May 12, 2024 1:53 AM PDT |
Defendant
Walt's Wholesale Meats Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maria Del Carmen Huerta Morales
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, September 11, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
![]() STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. It is hereby Ordered that the claims against Defendant shall be dismissed with prejudice and without fees and costs awarded to either party. Signed by District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright. (MW) |
|
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Stipulated MOTION and Order of Voluntary Dismissal , filed by Plaintiff Maria Del Carmen Huerta Morales. Noting Date 9/10/2024, (Chase Fazio, Janelle) |
|
Friday, June 07, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
![]() ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Walt's Wholesale Meats Incorporated.(Bigos, John) |
|
Thursday, June 06, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
![]() NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney John Bradley Bigos. Filed by Defendant Walt's Wholesale Meats Incorporated. (Bigos, John) |
|
Tuesday, June 04, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
![]() MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES by District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright. *6 DAY* Jury Trial is set for 5/19/2025 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom C before District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright. Joinder of Parties due by 9/3/2024, Amended Pleadings due by 9/13/2024, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 10/21/2024, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 11/20/2024, Discovery Motions due by 11/20/2024, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 12/20/2024, Discovery completed by 12/20/2024, Dispositive motions due by 1/21/2025, Motions in Limine due by 4/14/2025, Pretrial Order due by 4/28/2025, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 4/28/2025, Agreed Neutral Statement of the Case due by 4/28/2025, Deposition Designations due by 4/28/2025, Pretrial Conference set for 5/6/2025 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom C before District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright. (MET) |
|
Monday, June 03, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
![]() JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 6. (Chase Fazio, Janelle) |
|
Friday, May 24, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
![]() ORDER denying6 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright.(CJS) |
|
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
![]() REPLY, filed by Defendant Walt's Wholesale Meats Incorporated, TO RESPONSE to6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Motion to Dismiss (Bigos, John) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re10 Response to Motion to Dismiss (Chase Fazio, Janelle) |
|
10 | 10
![]() RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Maria Del Carmen Huerta Morales, to6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Motion to Dismiss . (Chase Fazio, Janelle) |
|
Tuesday, March 05, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 5/20/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/28/2024, Joint Status Report due by 6/3/2024. (MET) |
|
Monday, March 04, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright for all further proceedings, by Magistrate Judge Grady J Leupold. The Honorable Grady J Leupold is no longer associated with this matter. (KAM) |
|
Friday, March 01, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 3/8/2024. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KAM) |
|
Thursday, February 29, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Motion to Dismiss , filed by Defendant Walt's Wholesale Meats Incorporated. Noting Date 3/22/2024, (Bigos, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
5 | 5
![]() CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Purewater Foods III USA Inc. for Walt's Wholesale Meats Incorporated. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Walt's Wholesale Meats Incorporated. (Bigos, John) |
|
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John Bradley Bigos on behalf of Defendant Walt's Wholesale Meats Incorporated. (Bigos, John) |
|
Tuesday, February 06, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Walt's Wholesale Meats Incorporated mailed on 1/3/2024 (Chase Fazio, Janelle) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Walt's Wholesale Meats Incorporated. (AMD) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND Attorney Janelle Ellen Chase Fazio added to party Maria Del Carmen Huerta Morales(pty:pla) filed by Maria Del Carmen Huerta Morales.(Chase Fazio, Janelle) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 11/14 4:19 PM
Magistrate Judge Grady J Leupold added. (AMD) |