Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:23-bk-02815

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Roberta A Colton
Case #: 8:23-ap-00205
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Nov 15, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Bryan Ventre
112 N. Ponce De Leon Blvd.
Saint Augustine, FL 32084
Represented By
Bryan Ventre
contact info
Defendant
Marjorie Ventre
112 N. Ponce De Leon Blvd.
Saint Augustine, FL 32084
Represented By
Marjorie Ventre
contact info
Plaintiff
Craig John Vogt
15219 Michael Drive
Hudson, FL 34667
Represented By
M Eric Barksdale
Law Office Of M. Eric Barksdale, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
31 31 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Wed 04/30 4:44 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Eric Barksdale; Nicole Noel WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: RULING: Status Conference - CON'T TO 6/4/25 @ 1:30 PM (AOCNFNG) Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
30 30 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice (AP) Thu 04/10 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Notice Date 04/09/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #27 )
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
29 29 court Notice Canceling and/or Rescheduling (AP) Tue 04/08 11:01 AM
Notice Rescheduling Status Conference Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 4/30/2025 at 01:30 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue . (Wendy)
Related: [-] 27
28 28 court Notice Canceling and/or Rescheduling (AP) Tue 04/08 10:59 AM
Notice Rescheduling Status Conference Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 4/30/2025 at 01:30 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue . (Wendy)
Related: [-] 27
Monday, April 07, 2025
27 27 court Notice Of Pretrial / Status Conference Mon 04/07 3:24 PM
Notice of Pretrial/ Status Conference. . Pre-Trial Conference set for 5/14/2025 at 01:30 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Dana B.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
26 26 answer Response - Other than Motions Wed 04/02 8:50 AM
Response to Courts Notice and Order Conditionally Dismissing Adversary Proceeding and Request for Status Conference (Doc. No. 24) Filed by M Eric Barksdale on behalf of Plaintiff Craig John Vogt Related [+]. (Barksdale, M)
Related: [-] 24
Friday, March 21, 2025
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 03/22 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 03/21/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #24 )
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
24 24 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Adversary Wed 03/19 1:29 PM
Conditional Order Dismissing Adversary and Notice (14 days for Plaintiff to proceed or case stands as dismissed for lack of prosecution) . Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Lidia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
23 23 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Wed 10/30 5:17 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Eric Barksdale; Nicole Noel WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: RULING: Status Conference - PARTIES TO FILE STIPULATION; STIPULATION WILL INCLUDE LANGUAGE "COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICATION", FOR COURT APPROVAL OF STIP Response to Courts Notice and OrderConditionally Dismissing Adversary Proceeding and Request for Status Conference by Plaintiff (Doc #20) Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill)
Related: [-]
Saturday, October 19, 2024
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice (AP) Sun 10/20 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Notice Date 10/19/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #21 )
Thursday, October 17, 2024
21 21 court Notice of Hearing / Status Conference Thu 10/17 2:24 PM
Notice of Status Conference on Response to Courts Notice and Order Conditionally Dismissing Adversary Proceeding and Request for Status Conference Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2024 at 01:30 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue . (Tonya)
Related: [-] 20 ,18
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
20 20 answer Response - Other than Motions Wed 10/09 11:14 AM
Response to Courts Notice and Order Conditionally Dismissing Adversary Proceeding and Request for Status Conference Filed by M Eric Barksdale on behalf of Plaintiff Craig John Vogt Related [+]. (Barksdale, M)
Related: [-] 18
Friday, September 27, 2024
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 09/28 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 09/27/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #18 )
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
18 18 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Wed 09/25 2:22 PM
Notice and Order Conditionally Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Brenton) Modified on 9/25/2024 (Brenton)
Related: [-] 17
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
17 17 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Tue 06/11 5:26 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Eric Barksdale: Nicole Noel; Alex Dowding WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: RULING: ***(1) Con't Pretrial/Status Conference - PARTIES TO FILE 9019 MOTION Complaint (Doc #1) Answer (Doc #11) ***(2) Amended Motion to Strike Defendants' Affirmative Defenses by Plaintiff (Doc #15) - ABATED PENDING SETTLEMENT Response by Defendants (Doc #16) Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
16 16 answer Response Wed 05/15 3:13 PM
Response to Plaintiffs Amended Motion to Strike Defendants Affirmative Defenses Filed by Alexander T Dowding on behalf of Defendants Bryan Ventre, Marjorie Ventre Related [+]. (Dowding, Alexander)
Related: [-] 15
Att: 1 State Court Order
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
court Tue 05/07 12:46 PM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 06/11/2024 02:00 PM Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. Re: Amended Motion to Strike Defendants' Affirmative Defenses Contains negative notice. Doc15 . This entry will serve as the official notification of hearing from the court. Related [+]. (Bill)
Related: [-] 15
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
15 15 motion Motion to Strike (AP) Wed 05/01 6:16 AM
Amended Motion to Strike Defendants' Affirmative Defenses Contains negative notice. Filed by M Eric Barksdale on behalf of Plaintiff Craig John Vogt. (Barksdale, M)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
14 14 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Tue 04/30 5:32 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Eric Barksdale: Plaintiff Atty; Nicole Noel: Defendant Atty WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: RULING: Notice of Pretrial/Status Conference - CON'T 6/11/24 @ 2:00 PM (AOCNFNG) Complaint (Doc #1) Answer (Doc #11) Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Motion to Strike (BK) Tue 04/30 12:10 PM
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
12 12 court Notice Of Pretrial / Status Conference Tue 03/19 3:15 PM
Notice of Pretrial/ Status Conference. Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/30/2024 at 02:00 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Faye)
Related: [-] 11 ,1
Thursday, March 14, 2024
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 03/14 2:11 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+]. Filed by Nicole Mariani Noel on behalf of Plaintiff Craig John Vogt. (Noel, Nicole)
Related: [-] 1
Saturday, March 02, 2024
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 03/03 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 03/02/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #9 )
Thursday, February 29, 2024
9 9 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 02/29 10:05 AM
Order Denying Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Brenton)
Related: [-] 8
Friday, February 23, 2024
8 8 motion Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Fri 02/23 10:40 AM
Amended Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Nicole Mariani Noel on behalf of Defendants Bryan Ventre, Marjorie Ventre Related [+]. (Noel, Nicole)
Related: [-] 5
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
7 7 court CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held Wed 01/31 5:29 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Eric Barksdale: Plaintiff Atty; Nicole Noel: Defendant Atty WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: RULING: Preliminary Hearing on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Nicole Mariani Noel on behalf of Defendants Bryan Ventre, Marjorie Ventre Related [+]. (Noel, Nicole) Doc #5 - BOTH PARTIES DIRECTED TO FILE CASE LAW WITHIN 30 DAYS FOR THE COURT TO CONSIDER; MATTER WILL BE TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT AFTER CASE LAW FILED Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, January 18, 2024
6 6 2 pgs order Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom Thu 01/18 10:20 AM
Order Establishing Procedures for Video Hearings and Registration Link to Appear via Zoom. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. NG -(ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
court Thu 12/28 3:58 PM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 01/24/2024 02:30 PM Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8A, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. Re: Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Doc5 . This entry will serve as the official notification of hearing from the court. Related [+]. (Bill)
Related: [-] 5
Monday, December 18, 2023
5 5 motion Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 12/18 3:11 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Nicole Mariani Noel on behalf of Defendants Bryan Ventre, Marjorie Ventre Related [+]. (Noel, Nicole)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, November 17, 2023
4 4 misc Summons Service Executed Fri 11/17 7:55 AM
Service Executed on Marjorie Ventre of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by M Eric Barksdale on behalf of Plaintiff Craig John Vogt. (Barksdale, M)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Summons Service Executed Fri 11/17 7:53 AM
Service Executed on Bryan Ventre of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by M Eric Barksdale on behalf of Plaintiff Craig John Vogt. (Barksdale, M)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
2 2 court ADI - Summons Issued (auto) Thu 11/16 12:56 PM
Summons issued along with Local Rule 7001-1 - Adversary Proceedings - Procedures. Answer Due 12/18/2023. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
1 1 cmp ADI - Complaint - Original Wed 11/15 6:09 AM
Complaint by Craig John Vogt against Bryan Ventre, Marjorie Ventre. Filing Fee Not Required. Nature of Suit: [13 Related [+]]. (Barksdale, M)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer