New York Northern District Court
Judge:David N Hurd
Referred: Miroslav Lovric
Case #: 5:23-cv-01419
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 American Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Nov 15, 2023
Terminated:Mar 26, 2024
Last checked: Monday May 13, 2024 4:22 AM EDT
Defendant
DOES 1 to 25
Defendant
Haza Foods of Minnesota LLC
Represented By
Phillip Bauknight
Fisher & Phillips
contact info
Defendant
Haza Foods of Northeast, LLC.
Represented By
Phillip Bauknight
Fisher & Phillips
contact info
Defendant
Haza foods, LLC.
Represented By
Phillip Bauknight
Fisher & Phillips
contact info
Plaintiff
Sarah Townsend
Represented By
Jordan Porter
Nye Stirling Hale Miller & Sweet
contact info
Benjamin Sweet
Nye, Stirling, Hale, Miller & Sweet LLP
contact info

GPO Mar 18 2024
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: that Plaintiff must Show Cause, in writing, on or before March 25, 2024, why this action should not be transferred to the Western District New York pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1406(a).Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 03/18/2024. (hmr)

Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
23 23 order Order Transferring Case Tue 03/26 8:36 AM
TEXT ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Western District of New York: Upon review of plaintiff's #22 response to the Court's 3/18/24 Order to Show Cause, it is ORDERED that this action be transferred to the U.S. District Court for the Western District of New York. The fourteen-day waiting period in Local Rule 3.7 is WAIVED. So Ordered by Judge David N. Hurd on 03/26/2024. (hmr)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Tue 03/26 8:47 AM
Case transferred electronically to Western District of New York pursuant to Order of Transfer dated 3/26/2024. (hmr)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Tue 03/26 10:37 AM
Case transferred from New York Northern has been opened in U.S. District Court, Western District of New York as case 6:24-cv-06180, filed 03/26/2024. (nas )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
22 22 respm Response to Order to Show Cause Mon 03/25 4:00 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Sarah Townsend. (Sweet, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
21 21 4 pgs order Order Mon 03/18 9:32 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: that Plaintiff must Show Cause, in writing, on or before March 25, 2024, why this action should not be transferred to the Western District New York pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1406(a).Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 03/18/2024. (hmr)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 03/18 9:36 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Notice of Compliance Deadline 3/25/2024 -Re: Dkt. No. 21 - Order to Show Cause. (hmr)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
20 20 respm Response in Support of Motion Fri 02/09 3:07 PM
REPLY in Support re12 MOTION to Dismiss PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER FRCP 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6) filed by Haza Foods of Minnesota LLC, Haza Foods of Northeast, LLC., Haza foods, LLC.. Motion returnable before Judge Miroslav Lovric MOTION to Strike1 Complaint, TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S CLASS ALLEGATIONS filed by Haza Foods of Minnesota LLC, Haza Foods of Northeast, LLC., Haza foods, LLC.. Reply Brief in Support filed by Haza Foods of Minnesota LLC, Haza Foods of Northeast, LLC., Haza foods, LLC.. (Bauknight, Phillip) Modified on 2/9/2024 (hmr)
Related: [-]
misc Clerk Correction of Docket Entry Fri 02/09 3:47 PM
CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re20 Response in Support of Motion: Clerk removed "Response" and Added "Reply" to correct this docket entry. (hmr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 02/08 10:28 AM
ORDER granting18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief from February 7, 2024 to February 9, 2024 as to12 PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER FRCP 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6).Reply to Response to Motion is now due by 2/9/2024 Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 02/08/2024. (hmr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 02/07 9:28 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to12 MOTION to Dismiss PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER FRCP 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6) filed by Haza Foods of Minnesota LLC, Haza Foods of Northeast, LLC., Haza foods, LLC.. Motion returnable before Judge Miroslav Lovric MOTION to Strike1 Complaint, TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S CLASS ALLEGATIONS filed by Haza Foods of Minnesota LLC, Haza Foods of Northeast, LLC., Haza foods, LLC.. from February 7, 2024 to February 9, 2024 filed by Haza Foods of Minnesota LLC, Haza Foods of Northeast, LLC., Haza foods, LLC.. Response to Motion due by 2/28/2024 Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Bauknight, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
17 17 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 01/31 10:05 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re12 MOTION to Dismiss PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER FRCP 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6) filed by Haza Foods of Minnesota LLC, Haza Foods of Northeast, LLC., Haza foods, LLC.. Motion returnable before Judge Miroslav Lovric MOTION to Strike1 Complaint, TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S CLASS ALLEGATIONS filed by Haza Foods of Minnesota LLC, Haza Foods of Northeast, LLC., Haza foods, LLC.. filed by Sarah Townsend. (Sweet, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
16 16 order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Order Thu 01/11 9:00 AM
TEXT ORDER: In light of the filing of Motion to Dismiss12 , the Rule 16 Initial Conference scheduled for 3/6/2024 before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric, and the conference related deadlines, are all STAYED without date. SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 1/11/2024. (jdc )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
15 15 misc FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 01/10 4:16 PM
FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Haza Foods of Minnesota LLC. (Bauknight, Phillip)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 01/10 4:15 PM
FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Haza Foods of Northeast, LLC.. (Bauknight, Phillip)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 01/10 4:14 PM
FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Haza foods, LLC.. (Bauknight, Phillip)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Dismiss Strike Wed 01/10 4:13 PM
MOTION to Dismiss PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER FRCP 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6) filed by Haza Foods of Minnesota LLC, Haza Foods of Northeast, LLC., Haza foods, LLC.. Motion returnable before Judge Miroslav Lovric(. Reply to Response to Motion due by 2/7/2024 ), MOTION to Strike1 Complaint, TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S CLASS ALLEGATIONS filed by Haza Foods of Minnesota LLC, Haza Foods of Northeast, LLC., Haza foods, LLC.. Response to Motion due by 1/31/2024 Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Bauknight, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law ISO Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss Under FRCP 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6),
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1 To Memorandum of Law
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 12/26 11:34 AM
ORDER granting the10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the1 Complaint. Defendants answer due 1/10/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 12/26/2023. (amt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 12/21 3:20 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, 21 days to January 10, 2024 filed by Haza Foods of Minnesota LLC, Haza Foods of Northeast, LLC., Haza foods, LLC.. Response to Motion due by 1/11/2024 Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Bauknight, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/20 10:14 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jordan Porter on behalf of Sarah Townsend (Porter, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed (for non-Pro Se cases only) Thu 11/30 3:52 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sarah Townsend. Haza Foods of Northeast, LLC. served on 11/29/2023, answer due 12/20/2023. (Sweet, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed (for non-Pro Se cases only) Thu 11/30 3:49 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sarah Townsend. Haza Foods of Minnesota LLC served on 11/29/2023, answer due 12/20/2023. (Sweet, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed (for non-Pro Se cases only) Thu 11/30 9:06 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sarah Townsend. Haza foods, LLC. served on 11/28/2023, answer due 12/19/2023. (Sweet, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
5 5 misc Status Report Wed 11/29 2:02 PM
STATUS REPORT RE: NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT (DKT. 4) by Sarah Townsend. (Sweet, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
notice Notice - Other Thu 11/16 9:23 AM
TEXT NOTICE: The Initial Conference set for 3/6/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric, via Microsoft Teams Teleconferencing. The Courtroom Deputy will send a teams link to the parties to participate. (jdc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Admission Requirement Wed 11/15 1:01 PM
NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Sarah Townsend; Attorney Jordan T. Porter, Email address is jordan@nshmlaw.com. Phone number is 805-963-2345. Admissions due by 11/29/2023. Notice emailed to attorney along with G0 25 on 11/15/2023(mmg)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc G.O. 25 Filing Order Wed 11/15 12:57 PM
G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Telephone Conference set for 3/6/2024 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/28/2024. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (mmg)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 11/15 12:55 PM
Summons Issued as to Haza Foods of Minnesota LLC, Haza Foods of Northeast, LLC., Haza foods, LLC..(mmg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Issued as to Haza Foods of Minnesota, LLC,
Att: 2 Summons Issued as to Haza Foods of Northeast, LLC
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 11/15 12:50 PM
CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against DOES 1 to 25, Haza Foods of Minnesota LLC, Haza Foods of Northeast, LLC., Haza foods, LLC. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-6513542) filed by Sarah Townsend. Modified on 11/15/2023 (mmg, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
notice Text Notice Regarding John Doe Defendant (Text-Only) Wed 11/15 1:02 PM
TEXT NOTICE: Although the plaintiff herein has named John Doe defendant(s) in the Complaint, the Clerk's Office will not issue summons(es) for service of process on a John Doe defendant(s) at this time. In the event plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims against this defendant, plaintiff shall take reasonable steps to ascertain their identity. When plaintiff determines the identity of the John Doe defendant(s), plaintiff may seek to amend the pleading to add the properly named defendant(s) pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 15 and summons(es) will be issued at that time. (mmg, )
Related: [-]