California Central District Court
Judge:Andre Birotte Jr
Referred: Jacqueline Chooljian
Case #: 2:23-cv-09673
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Nov 15, 2023
Last checked: Monday May 13, 2024 1:18 AM PDT
Defendant
Mia Kaminski
Represented By
Andrew K. Jacobson
Bay Oak Law
contact info
Andrew K Jacobson
Bay Oak Law
contact info
Defendant
Mosaic Brands, Inc.
Represented By
Andrew K. Jacobson
Bay Oak Law
contact info
Andrew K Jacobson
Bay Oak Law
contact info
Defendant
Scott Kaminsk
Represented By
Andrew K. Jacobson
Bay Oak Law
contact info
Andrew K Jacobson
Bay Oak Law
contact info
Mediator (ADR Panel)
David Oken
Represented By
David H Oken
Law Offices Of David H. Oken - Oken Mediation
contact info
Plaintiff
The Ridge Wallet LLC
Represented By
Gina A Johnson
The Ridge Wallet LLC
contact info
Benjamin E. Weed
The Ridge Wallet LLC
contact info
Lukas David Jackson
Vokshori Law Group Aplc
contact info
Benjamin E Weed
The Ridge Wallet LLC
contact info
Nima Stephen Vokshori
Vokshori Law Group Aplc
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, May 19, 2025
105 105 motion Leave to File Document Under Seal Mon 05/19 10:00 PM
APPLICATION to file document Exhibit A to Defendants' Amended Answer and Counterclaims to Second Amended Complaint under seal filed by Defendants Mia Kaminski, Scott Kaminski, Mosaic Brands, Inc., Counter Claimants Mia Kaminski, Scott Kaminski, Mosaic Brands, Inc..(Ribas, Cynthia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
104 104 attyseal Sealed Declaration in Support Mon 05/19 8:32 PM
SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Cynthia M. Ribas under seal99 filed by Defendants Mia Kaminski, Scott Kaminski, Mosaic Brands, Inc., Counter Claimants Mia Kaminski, Scott Kaminski, Mosaic Brands, Inc..(Ribas, Cynthia)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 16, 2025
103 103 order Leave to File Document Under Seal Fri 05/16 12:59 PM
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE EXHIBIT 2 TO DECLARATION OF CYNTHIA M. RIBAS UNDER SEAL99 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (es)
Related: [-]
102 102 respm Reply (Motion related) Fri 05/16 12:55 PM
REPLY In Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to to Determine that the 8/14/23 Settlement Agreement is the Operative Contract or, in the Alternative, that No Binding Contract Exists with Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authoritie 97 filed by Plaintiff The Ridge Wallet LLC.(Vokshori, Nima)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF GENUINE DISPUTES AND RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS STATEMENT OF ADDITIONAL UNCONTROVERTED FACTS,
Att: 2 Declaration Supplemental of Benjamin E. Weed,
Att: 3 Exhibit Q,
Att: 4 Exhibit R,
Att: 5 Exhibit S
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
101 101 order Leave to File Document Under Seal Wed 05/14 12:18 PM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE EXHIBITS A AND H TO THE DECLARATION OF BENJAMIN E. WEED, ESQ. UNDER SEAL95 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (es)
Related: [-]