Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:David M Lawson
Referred: David R Grand
Case #: 2:23-cv-12916
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Nov 15, 2023
Terminated:Feb 14, 2024
Last checked: Monday May 13, 2024 4:30 AM EDT
Defendant
Richard L. Federico
Defendant
Arthur H. Goldberg
Defendant
Brian L. Harper
Defendant
Joanna T. Lau
Defendant
David J. Nettina
Defendant
RPT Realty
Defendant
Laurie M. Shahon
Defendant
Andrea M. Weiss
Plaintiff
Matthew Hamilton
Represented By
Richard A. Acocelli, Jr.
Acocelli Law, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
4 4 order Dismissing Case Wed 02/14 2:52 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Voluntary Dismissal Wed 02/14 12:35 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Matthew Hamilton (Acocelli, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
2 2 order Reassignment/Disqualification Tue 12/05 11:56 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Laurie J. Michelson and Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman to District Judge David M. Lawson and Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (SSch)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
1 1 18 pgs cmp Civil Case - Complaint Wed 11/15 2:58 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Matthew Hamilton against Richard L. Federico, Arthur H. Goldberg, Brian L. Harper, Joanna T. Lau, David J. Nettina, RPT Realty, Laurie M. Shahon, Andrea M. Weiss with Jury Demand. No summons requested. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9562839 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Oakland County - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland County. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): Eastern District of Michigan, 2:23-cv-12891-DML-DRG, Judge Hon. David M. Lawson ] (Acocelli, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Wed 11/15 3:52 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (MCho)
Related: [-]