Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Robin L Rosenberg
Referred: Panayotta D Augustin-Birch
Case #: 0:23-cv-62174
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Nov 15, 2023
Terminated:Jan 11, 2024
Last checked: Monday May 13, 2024 4:22 AM EDT
Defendant
Almod Diamonds Ltd., Inc.
Represented By
Stepanka Rubio
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Mendy Halberstam
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Ivette Palacios
Represented By
Daniel H. Hunt
Daniel H. Hunt, Esq.
contact info

GPO Jan 11 2024
ORDER GRANTING 10 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS; DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND AND CLOSING CASE. All pending Motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 1/11/2024. See attached document for full details. (caw)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, January 11, 2024
27 27 6 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Thu 01/11 3:15 PM
ORDER GRANTING10 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS; DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND AND CLOSING CASE. All pending Motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 1/11/2024. See attached document for full details. (caw)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
26 26 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Mon 01/08 2:52 PM
PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceeding held before Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/8/2024. Total time in court: 0 hours : 15 minutes. Attorney Appearances: Mendy Halberstam, Stepanka Rubio, Daniel H. Hunt. (sk01)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
25 25 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 01/04 11:21 AM
Defendant's REPLY to Response to Motion re10 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Almod Diamonds Ltd., Inc.. (Halberstam, Mendy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
24 24 order Order on Motion to Continue Tue 01/02 8:57 AM
ORDER GRANTING23 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Continue Pretrial Conference. The Pretrial Conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(a) is reset to January 8, 2024, at 2:30 p.m. Eastern Standard Time in the Fort Lauderdale Division before United States Magistrate Judge Augustin-Birch, to take place via Zoom Video Teleconference. To log in through ZoomGov Meeting, use Meeting ID: 16096518849 and Passcode: 752819. All counsel must appear by both audio and video. Any motion to continue the Pretrial Conference must include at least three alternative dates on which all counsel are available for a rescheduled Pretrial Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch on 1/2/2024. (sk01)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
23 23 motion Continue Thu 12/28 3:50 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Continue Pretrial Conference re 22 Order Setting/Cancelling Hearing,, by Almod Diamonds Ltd., Inc.. Responses due by 1/11/2024(Rubio, Stepanka)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, December 22, 2023
22 22 order Order Setting/Cancelling Hearing Fri 12/22 9:08 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: A Pretrial Conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(a) is set in this matter on January 5, 2024, at 2:30 p.m. Eastern Standard Time in the Fort Lauderdale Division before United States Magistrate Judge Augustin-Birch, to take place via Zoom Video Teleconference. To log in through ZoomGov Meeting, use Meeting ID: 16096518849 and Passcode: 752819. All counsel must appear by both audio and video. Any motion to continue the Pretrial Conference must include at least three alternative dates on which all counsel are available for a rescheduled Pretrial Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch on 12/22/2023. (sk01)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
21 21 2 pgs order Order Setting/Cancelling Hearing ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 12/21 5:06 PM
Order Setting Discovery Status Conference and Requiring Joint Discovery Status Report. A Discovery Status Conference is set for May 31, 2024, at 9:30 a.m. in the Fort Lauderdale Division before Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch, to be conducted via Zoom Video Teleconference. A Joint Discovery Status Report is due by May 24, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch on 12/21/2023. See attached document for full details. (sk01)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Order Striking Thu 12/21 5:02 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER STRIKING docket entry19 as incorrectly filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch on 12/21/2023. (sk01)
Related: [-]
19 19 5 pgs order Order Setting/Cancelling Hearing ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 12/21 4:58 PM
Order Setting Discovery Status Conference and Requiring Joint Discovery Status Report. A Discovery Status Conference is set for May 31, 2024, at 9:30 a.m. in the Fort Lauderdale Division before Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch, to be conducted via Zoom Video Teleconference. A Joint Discovery Status Report is due by May 24, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch on 12/21/2023. See attached document for full details. (sk01)
Related: [-]
18 18 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Thu 12/21 4:49 PM
ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch on 12/21/2023. See attached document for full details. (sk01)
Related: [-]
17 17 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 12/21 2:40 PM
Defendant's REPLY to Response to Motion re11 Defendant's MOTION to Strike Demand for a Jury Trial (in Support of) filed by Almod Diamonds Ltd., Inc..(Halberstam, Mendy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
16 16 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation Thu 12/21 11:56 AM
ORDER Setting Status Conference, Calendar Call, Pretrial Deadlines, And Trial Date, Order Of Requirements, And Order Of Reference To Mediation. (Fact Discovery due by 7/5/2024., Expert Discovery due by 7/5/2024., Dispositive Motions due by 4/5/2024., Jury Trial set for 11/4/2024 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 10/30/2024 10:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 9/4/2024 10:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.) Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 12/21/2023. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
15 15 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Wed 12/20 3:30 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting14 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (bkd)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Wed 12/20 2:23 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to10 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (In Support Of) by Almod Diamonds Ltd., Inc..(Rubio, Stepanka)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
13 13 respm Response to Motion Tue 12/19 10:52 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re10 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Ivette Palacios. Replies due by 12/27/2023. (Hunt, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
12 12 respm Response to Motion Fri 12/15 12:19 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re11 Defendant's MOTION to Strike Demand for a Jury Trial filed by Ivette Palacios. Replies due by 12/22/2023. (Hunt, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
11 11 motion Strike Thu 12/07 4:25 PM
Defendant's MOTION to Strike Demand for a Jury Trial by Almod Diamonds Ltd., Inc.. Responses due by 12/21/2023(Halberstam, Mendy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
10 10 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 12/05 3:56 PM
Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Almod Diamonds Ltd., Inc.. Responses due by 12/19/2023 (Halberstam, Mendy)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 12/05 3:52 PM
Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Almod Diamonds Ltd., Inc. (Halberstam, Mendy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
8 8 misc Status Report Tue 11/28 5:23 PM
STATUS REPORT by Almod Diamonds Ltd., Inc. (Halberstam, Mendy)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Tue 11/28 5:21 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Almod Diamonds Ltd., Inc.(Halberstam, Mendy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
6 6 order Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Wed 11/22 11:16 AM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN REMOVAL CASES. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 11/22/2023. See attached document for full details. (jas)
Related: [-]
5 5 3 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Order of Requirements Wed 11/22 11:15 AM
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND ORDER OF COURT-MANDATED REQUIREMENTS ON SERVICE, DEFAULTS, AND JOINT SCHEDULING REPORTS. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch for appropriate disposition of all pro hac vice motions, motions to substitute counsel, and pretrial motions related to discovery. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 11/22/2023. See attached document for full details. (jas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 11/16 12:45 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel H. Hunt on behalf of IVETTE PALACIOS (Hunt, Daniel)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 11/16 12:42 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by IVETTE PALACIOS (Hunt, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Thu 11/16 10:24 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and US Magistrate Judge Panayotta D Augustin-Birch. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Panayotta Augustin-Birch is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (wce)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) Wed 11/15 4:28 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17076732, filed by ALMOD DIAMONDS LTD., INC.,.(Halberstam, Mendy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F