Illinois Southern District Court
Judge:Staci M Yandle
Case #: 3:23-cv-03704
Nature of Suit490 Other Statutes - Cable/Sat TV
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:Nov 15, 2023
Terminated:Apr 19, 2024
Last checked: Monday May 13, 2024 3:22 AM CDT
Defendant
Chad Goldschmidt
2 Berry Patch Lane
Columbia, IL 62236
Represented By
Clay B. St. Clair
St. Clair, Gilbreth & Steppig, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Hank & Lilly's Creekside, LLC
Represented By
Clay B. St. Clair
St. Clair, Gilbreth & Steppig, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
213 W. Street Road
Feasterville, PA 19053
Represented By
Yeoeun Yoon
Taft Stettinius & Hollister Llp - Chicago
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, April 19, 2024
15 15 order Judgment - Clerk Fri 04/19 10:07 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Approved by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 4/19/2024. (mah)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order Fri 04/19 10:01 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The parties filed a Stipulation of Dismissal (Doc.13 ), in which they stipulated that this case should be dismissed with prejudice with each party to bear their own costs. Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), a Stipulation of Dismissal filed by all the parties who have appeared in the action is effective immediately upon filing and does not require judicial approval. See e.g. Jenkins v. Village of Maywood , 506 F.3d 622, 624 (7th Cir. 2007). Accordingly, this case is DISMISSED with prejudice, and the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to enter judgment accordingly.Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 4/19/2024. (mah)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 04/19 9:21 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Yoon, Yeoeun)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
12 12 notice Notice Terminating Judge Assignment Fri 12/08 10:09 AM
NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Judge Staci M. Yandle for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 3:23-CV-3704-SMY. (clw)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Modification Fri 12/08 10:02 AM
NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re 10 Notice (Other) filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. This specific document should be filed under the correct event and sealed. The Clerk's Office has corrected this entry. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (clw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Thu 12/07 3:34 PM
NOTICE by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. re4 Notice of Initial Magistrate Assignment,,,,,, Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction and Consent/Non-Consent Form (Yoon, Yeoeun)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice Requesting Consent Thu 12/07 8:46 AM
NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Chad Goldschmidt and Hank & Lilly's Creekside to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience:[LINK:https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf] . Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Chad Goldschmidt and Hank & Lilly's Creekside on 12/7/2023. Consent due by 12/28/2023 (clw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
8 8 misc Jury Demand Wed 12/06 4:38 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Chad Goldschmidt, Hank & Lilly's Creekside, LLC. (St. Clair, Clay)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/06 4:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Clay B. St. Clair on behalf of Chad Goldschmidt, Hank & Lilly's Creekside, LLC (St. Clair, Clay)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 12/06 4:34 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Chad Goldschmidt, Hank & Lilly's Creekside, LLC.(St. Clair, Clay)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 11/17 9:46 AM
Summons Issued as to Chad Goldschmidt, Hank & Lilly's Creekside, LLC, d/b/a Hank & Lilly's Creekside. Originals sent to counsel for service. (clw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Initial Magistrate Assignment Thu 11/16 10:18 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Mark A. Beatty pursuant to Administrative Order 347. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 347, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or non-consent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience:[LINK:https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf] . All future documents must bear case number 3:23-CV-3704-MAB. Consent due by 12/7/2023 (clw)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement Thu 11/16 9:44 AM
Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Yoon, Yeoeun)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11/15 4:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Yeoeun Yoon on behalf of Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Yoon, Yeoeun)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 11/15 4:24 PM
COMPLAINT against Chad Goldschmidt, Hank & Lilly's Creekside, LLC, d/b/a Hank & Lilly's Creekside ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-5236534.), filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc..(Yoon, Yeoeun)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons