South Carolina District Court
Judge:David C Norton
Referred: Mary Gordon Baker
Case #: 2:23-cv-05878
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:Nov 16, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday May 14, 2024 4:46 AM EDT
Defendant
CarMax Auto Superstores, Inc.
508 Meeting Street
West Columbia, SC 29169
Represented By
Erika Rachel Collins
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak And Stewart PC
contact info
William L Duda
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak And Stewart (cola)
contact info
Plaintiff
Deanna Strothers
Represented By
Anthony Christopher Potts
Hitchcock And Potts
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
31 31 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 05/05 8:27 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 30 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's response to the pending Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. No. 29) is due by June 11, 2025. Absent extraordinary circumstances, no further extensions will be granted. IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 5/5/25.(akob, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
30 30 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 05/02 12:50 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to29 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Deanna Strothers. Response to Motion due by 5/16/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Potts, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
29 29 motion Summary Judgment Mon 04/28 4:50 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by CarMax Auto Superstores, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 5/12/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Collins, Erika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Deposition Transcript (cited excerpts and attachments),
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Michaela Gallo's Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Thomas (Tom) Burke's Deposition Transcript (cited excerpts),
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Joe Holder's Declaration,
Att: 6 Exhibit E - Plaintiff's 2012 and 2013 Performance Reviews from Burlington Coat Factory,
Att: 7 Exhibit F - Chantis Tharpe's Deposition Transcript (cited excerpts and attachments),
Att: 8 Exhibit G - Joe Holder's Deposition Transcript (cited excerpts)
Monday, April 07, 2025
28 28 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 04/07 8:28 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 27 Motion for Extension of Time. Dispositive motions are due by April 28, 2025. Absent extraordinary circumstances, no further extensions will be granted. IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 4/7/25.(akob, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
27 27 motion Extension of Time Fri 04/04 9:45 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion by CarMax Auto Superstores, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 4/18/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Collins, Erika)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
25 25 discov Affidavit of Records Custodian Thu 02/06 11:56 AM
Supplemental Notice of Filing AFFIDAVIT of Records Custodian Supplemental Notice of Filing by CarMax Auto Superstores, Inc..(Collins, Erika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Records Custodian for Burlington Stores, Inc.
Friday, January 31, 2025
24 24 adr ADR Statement/Certification Fri 01/31 2:25 PM
ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Deanna Strothers(Potts, Anthony)
Related: [-]
23 23 discov Affidavit of Records Custodian Fri 01/31 12:42 PM
Notice of Filing AFFIDAVIT of Records Custodian Notice of Filing by CarMax Auto Superstores, Inc..(Collins, Erika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Affidavits of Records Custodian
22 22 adr ADR Statement/Certification Fri 01/31 12:22 PM
ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by CarMax Auto Superstores, Inc.(Collins, Erika)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
21 21 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 10/21 11:01 AM
THIRD AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/31/2025, Discovery due by 1/31/2025, Motions due by 4/14/2025, Mediation Due by 3/3/2025. Motion GRANTED: 20 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 19 Scheduling Order, Terminate Motions, filed by CarMax Auto Superstores, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 10/21/2024. (dgar)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
20 20 motion Amend/Correct Fri 10/18 5:02 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct19 Scheduling Order,, Terminate Motions, by CarMax Auto Superstores, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 11/1/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Collins, Erika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, June 27, 2024
19 19 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 06/27 12:48 PM
SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/31/2024, Discovery due by 10/31/2024, Motions due by 1/13/2025, Mediation Due by 12/2/2024. Motion GRANTED: 18 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 16 Scheduling Order, filed by Deanna Strothers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 6/27/2024. (dgar)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Amend/Correct Thu 06/27 9:49 AM
Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct16 Scheduling Order,, by Deanna Strothers. Response to Motion due by 7/11/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Potts, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
17 17 order Confidentiality Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 03/13 8:18 AM
CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Motion GRANTED: 15 Consent MOTION for Confidentiality Order filed by CarMax Auto Superstores, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 3/13/2024. (agaz, )
Related: [-]
16 16 order Scheduling Order Wed 03/13 8:16 AM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 2/27/2024, Rule 26 Report due by 3/12/2024, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 4/2/2024, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 5/2/2024, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 6/3/2024, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 8/2/2024, Discovery due by 8/2/2024, Motions due by 10/1/2024, Mediation Due by 9/3/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 3/13/2024. (agaz, ) Modified to edit docket text on 3/13/2024 (agaz, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
15 15 motion Confidentiality Order Tue 03/12 4:47 PM
Consent MOTION for Confidentiality Order by CarMax Auto Superstores, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 3/26/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(Collins, Erika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Confidentiality Order - Redlined
14 14 discov Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories Tue 03/12 4:40 PM
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by CarMax Auto Superstores, Inc..(Collins, Erika)
Related: [-]
13 13 discov Rule 26 Discovery Plan Tue 03/12 4:39 PM
Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by CarMax Auto Superstores, Inc..(Collins, Erika)
Related: [-]
12 12 discov Rule 26(f) Report Tue 03/12 4:37 PM
Joint Rule 26(f) Report by CarMax Auto Superstores, Inc..(Collins, Erika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Consent Amended Scheduling Order
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/12 4:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Erika Rachel Collins on behalf of CarMax Auto Superstores, Inc. (Collins, Erika)
Related: [-]
10 10 discov Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories Tue 03/12 2:27 PM
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Deanna Strothers.(Potts, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
9 9 order Scheduling Order Tue 02/06 8:42 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 2/27/2024, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 3/12/2024, Rule 26 Report due by 3/12/2024, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 4/2/2024, Plaintiff's ID of Expert Witness due by 5/2/2024, Defendant's ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 6/3/2024, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 6/3/2024, Discovery due by 8/2/2024, Motions due by 10/1/2024, Mediation Due by 9/3/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 2/6/2024. (dgar)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
8 8 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Mon 02/05 5:28 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by CarMax Auto Superstores, Inc..(Duda, William)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/05 5:27 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by CarMax Auto Superstores, Inc..(Duda, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 12/01 10:04 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE by Deanna Strothers. CarMax Auto Superstores, Inc. waiver executed on 11/21/2023, answer due 1/22/2024.(Potts, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Main Document Waiver of Service of Summons
Thursday, November 16, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 11/16 11:43 AM
Summons Issued as to CarMax Auto Superstores, Inc.. Service due by 2/14/2024 (agaz, )
Related: [-]
2 2 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Thu 11/16 11:42 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Deanna Strothers.(agaz, )
Related: [-]
1 1 25 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 11/16 11:42 AM
COMPLAINT against CarMax Auto Superstores, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-11431917.), filed by Deanna Strothers. Service due by 2/14/2024(agaz, )
Related: [-]