Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:23-bk-90739

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Marvin Isgur
Case #: 4:23-ap-03251
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Nov 15, 2023
Terminated:May 20, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Bank 7
Represented By
Bank 7
contact info
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Alpine Summit Energy Partners, Inc. et al., on behalf of the Debtors' estate
Represented By
Paul D Moak
Reed Smith
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Monday, May 20, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Mon 05/20 7:41 AM
Stipulated Dismissal Under Rule 41. Adversary Case 4:23-ap-3251 Closed. (tjl4)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
25 25 misc Stipulation Fri 05/17 4:17 PM
Stipulation By Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Alpine Summit Energy Partners, Inc. et al., on behalf of the Debtors' estate and Bank7. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? No. (Filed By Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Alpine Summit Energy Partners, Inc. et al., on behalf of the Debtors' estate ). (Janak, Taylre)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
24 24 court Courtroom Minutes Wed 02/07 9:27 AM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 7:59 AM - 8:55 AM. Cases 4:23-ap-03238 and 4 23-03251 called concurrently. Audio filed in main case no. 23-90739 Appearances: Benjamin Finestone for Ad Hoc Committee of Drilling Partnership Claimants. Heather Hatfield for HB2 Origination, LLC. Chris Bankler for Bank7. Alexa Leventhal an interested party. The Court heard oral argument. The Court abated adversary case no. 23-03251 on the record. Parties may move to terminate the abatement as stated on the record. Motion to dismiss at ECF no. 12 in adversary case no. 23-03238 to be taken under advisement by the Court on 03/14/24. Related [+] (SierraThomasAnderson)
Related: [-] 7 Order for Conference
Monday, January 29, 2024
23 23 order Seal Tue 01/30 6:37 AM
Order Granting Motion of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (I) Authorizing the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors to File the Amended Complaint and Exhibits Under Seal and (II) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Signed on 1/29/2024. (SierraThomasAnderson)
Related: [-] 15
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
22 22 notice Notice Tue 01/23 4:28 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss . Related [+] Filed by Bank7 (Bankler, Christopher)
Related: [-] 18 Notice
Friday, January 19, 2024
21 21 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/19 6:04 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by Bank7 (Bankler, Christopher)
Related: [-] 14 Amended Complaint
20 20 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Fri 01/19 6:02 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by Bank7 (Bankler, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 01/10 11:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 01/10/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Order Setting Hearing
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
18 18 notice Notice Tue 01/09 3:12 PM
Notice of Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss . Related [+] Filed by Bank 7 (Bankler, Christopher)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Monday, January 08, 2024
court Hearing Set Mon 01/08 1:27 PM
Hearing Set On Related [+]. Movant to notice all interested parties and file a certificate of service with the court. Hearing scheduled for 2/7/2024 at 08:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (TylerLaws)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
court Hearing Cont Mon 01/08 1:30 PM
Notice of Time Change Only. Hearing Time Reset Related [+]. Scheduling Conference set for 2/7/2024 at 08:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (TylerLaws)
Related: [-] 7 Order for Conference,17 Order Setting Hearing
Friday, January 05, 2024
17 17 order Setting Hearing Mon 01/08 8:07 AM
Joint Stipulation Continuing Rule 7016 Conference, Signed on 1/5/2024 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 2/7/2024 at 10:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (SierraThomasAnderson)
Related: [-] 7 Order for Conference,13 Stipulation
16 16 motion Sealed Motion Fri 01/05 5:37 PM
Sealed Motion (Amended Complaint) Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Alpine Summit Energy Partners, Inc. et al., on behalf of the Debtors' estate (Moak, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit D
Att: 4 Exhibit E
Att: 5 Exhibit F
Att: 6 Exhibit G
15 15 motion Seal Document Motion or Other Pleading Fri 01/05 5:26 PM
Motion to Seal - Motion of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors to File the Amended Complaint and Exhibits Under Seal and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Alpine Summit Energy Partners, Inc. et al., on behalf of the Debtors' estate (Moak, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 01/05 5:15 PM
Amended Complaint Related [+] (Moak, Paul)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Att: 5 Exhibit E
Att: 6 Exhibit F
Att: 7 Exhibit G
Att: 8 Exhibit H
Att: 9 Exhibit I
Att: 10 Exhibit J
Att: 11 Exhibit K
Att: 12 Exhibit L
Thursday, January 04, 2024
13 13 misc Stipulation Thu 01/04 10:19 AM
Stipulation By Bank 7 and Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? Yes. (Filed By Bank 7 ) Related [+] (Bankler, Christopher)
Related: [-] 7 Order for Conference
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
12 12 misc Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan(for Attorney) Tue 01/02 4:54 PM
Joint Discovery Plan/Case Management Plan (Filed By Bank 7, Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Alpine Summit Energy Partners, Inc. et al., on behalf of the Debtors' estate ). (Janak, Taylre)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 12/15 7:18 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by Bank 7 (Bankler, Christopher)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
10 10 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Fri 12/15 7:14 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by Bank 7 (Bankler, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, December 08, 2023
9 9 misc Certificate Fri 12/08 4:24 PM
Certificate of Service (Filed By Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Alpine Summit Energy Partners, Inc. et al., on behalf of the Debtors' estate ) Related [+] (Janak, Taylre)
Related: [-] 7 Order for Conference
Friday, December 01, 2023
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 12/01 11:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 12/01/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order for Conference
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
7 7 2 pgs order Order for Conference (FORM) (MULTI) Wed 11/29 11:45 AM
Order for Conference Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/8/2024 at 09:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (TylerLaws)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 11/29 10:29 AM
Summons Service Executed on Bank 7 11/20/2023. (Janak, Taylre)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
5 5 court Summons Issued Mon 11/20 9:51 AM
Summons Issued on Bank 7 Date Issued 11/20/2023. (RhondaMooreKonieczny)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
4 4 misc Summons - Request for Issuance Fri 11/17 11:47 AM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Bank7. (Moak, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
3 3 motion Sealed Motion Wed 11/15 4:57 PM
Sealed Motion (Complaint) Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Alpine Summit Energy Partners, Inc. et al., on behalf of the Debtors' estate (Moak, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit D
Att: 4 Exhibit E
Att: 5 Exhibit F
Att: 6 Exhibit G
2 2 motion Seal Document Motion or Other Pleading Wed 11/15 3:57 PM
Motion to Seal - Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors to File the Complaint and Exhibits Under Seal and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Alpine Summit Energy Partners, Inc. et al., on behalf of the Debtors' estate (Moak, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
1 1 cmp Complaint [system event] Wed 11/15 3:26 PM
Adversary case 23-03251 Nature of Suit: (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (91 (Declaratory judgment)) Complaint by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Alpine Summit Energy Partners, Inc. et al., on behalf of the Debtors' estate against Bank 7. Fee Amount $350 (Moak, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Att: 5 Exhibit E
Att: 6 Exhibit F
Att: 7 Exhibit G
Att: 8 Exhibit H
Att: 9 Exhibit I
Att: 10 Exhibit J
Att: 11 Exhibit K
Att: 12 Exhibit L