New Jersey District Court
Judge:Madeline Cox Arleo
Referred: James B Clark
Case #: 2:23-cv-22424
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Nov 16, 2023
Re-opened:May 22, 2024
Terminated:May 22, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday May 14, 2024 4:38 AM EDT
Defendant
C. TECH COLLECTIONS, INC.
Plaintiff
ALEXANDER THEMISTOCLEOUS
Represented By
ELLIOT ELO
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Wed 05/22 4:10 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice, and without costs. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 5/22/2024. (jd, )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order 60-Day Administrative Termination Fri 03/01 4:03 PM
Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 4/30/2024. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 3/1/2024. (jd, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Settlement (aty) Thu 02/29 1:35 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by ALEXANDER THEMISTOCLEOUS (ELO, ELLIOT)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 02/26 7:36 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALEXANDER THEMISTOCLEOUS. C. TECH COLLECTIONS, INC. served on 11/22/2023, answer due 12/13/2023. (ELO, ELLIOT)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 11/20 9:25 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to C. TECH COLLECTIONS, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jd, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 11/16 2:52 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14878007) with JURY DEMAND, filed by alexander themistocleous.(ELO, ELLIOT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 11/16 5:58 PM
Case assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (jr)
Related: [-]