Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Sara Lioi
Case #: 5:23-cv-02227
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Nov 16, 2023
Terminated:Oct 23, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday May 14, 2024 4:32 AM EDT
Defendant
Blue Stream Rehab and Nursing, LLC
Represented By
Y. Timothy Chai
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani - Cleveland
contact info
Stephen L Miller
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith
contact info
David A. Campbell, III
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani -Columbus
contact info
Defendant
Mendel Brecher
Represented By
Y. Timothy Chai
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani - Cleveland
contact info
Stephen L Miller
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith
contact info
David A. Campbell, III
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani -Columbus
contact info
Defendant
Dawn Nelson
Represented By
Y. Timothy Chai
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani - Cleveland
contact info
Stephen L Miller
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith
contact info
David A. Campbell, III
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani -Columbus
contact info
Plaintiff
Brandi Little
Represented By
Taurean J. Shattuck
Spitz Law
contact info

GPO Apr 08 2024
Memorandum Opinion and Order denying defendants' 6 motion to dismiss. Judge Sara Lioi on 4/8/2024. (V,A)

Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, February 06, 2025
23 23 notice Notice of Dismissal Thu 02/06 10:33 AM
Stipulated Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Brandi Little. (Shattuck, Taurean)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
22 22 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 10/23 2:02 PM
Order . This case, having been settled by agreement of the parties, is hereby dismissed. ( See Doc. No. 21 (Notice of Settlement).) Each party shall pay its own costs. Any and all releases, agreements or judgment entries necessary to comply with this settlement shall be executed by the interested parties. A final agreed entry, approved by counsel for all parties, shall be filed with the Court on or before December 9, 2024. This case is hereby closed. Chief District Judge Sara Lioi on 10/23/2024. (V,A)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Settlement Notice (atty event) Wed 10/23 9:37 AM
Settlement Notice filed by All Defendants. (Campbell, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
minutes Status Conference Tue 09/10 1:00 PM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Chief District Judge Sara Lioi. On September 10, 2024, the Court conducted a telephonic status conference. Attorneys Taurean Shattuck and Timothy Chai participated. Counsel advised the Court that the parties have completed all discovery, with the exception of a deposition of a former human resources employee that needs to be rescheduled. Counsel will work together to get this final deposition scheduled and completed, if possible. Counsel further indicated that the parties are interested in engaging in informal settlement discussions, and requested that the Court extend the briefing on summary judgment to accommodate those discussions and the need to take the one remaining deposition. The Court agreed to adjust the Case Management Plan and Trial Order accordingly: dispositive motions are now due 10/21/2024, responses are due 11/18/2024, and replies, if any, must be filed by 12/3/2024. All other dates and deadlines appearing in the CMPTO remain in effect. (See Doc. No.15 .) If, at any time, the parties would like the Court's assistance with scheduling or facilitating mediation, counsel may so indicate in a status report or by contacting chambers directly. (Court Reporter: None.) Time: 15 minutes. (V,A)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
order Order Mon 08/26 4:37 PM
Order [non-document]. The telephonic status conference set for 9/10/2024 at 1:00 p.m. is rescheduled for 9/10/2024 at 12:30 p.m. (TIME CHANGE ONLY) Chief District Judge Sara Lioi on 8/26/2024. (V,A)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
20 20 notice Status Report (atty event) Fri 08/09 2:44 PM
Joint Status Report filed by All Defendants. (Campbell, David)
Related: [-]
order Order Fri 08/09 1:09 PM
Order [non-document]. The telephonic status conference set for 8/16/2024 is rescheduled for 9/10/2024 at 1:00 p.m. Chief District Judge Sara Lioi on 8/9/2024. (V,A)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
order Order on Motion to extend deadlines Fri 07/26 10:04 AM
Order [non-document] granting joint19 motion for extension of non-expert discovery deadline until 9/9/2024. Chief District Judge Sara Lioi on 7/26/2024. (V,A)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
19 19 motion Extension (of deadlines) Thu 07/25 2:50 PM
Joint Motion for extension of Non-Expert Discovery Deadline until 9/9/2024 filed by Blue Stream Rehab and Nursing, LLC, Mendel Brecher, Dawn Nelson. (Campbell, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
18 18 notice Status Report (atty event) Tue 06/18 11:14 AM
Joint Status Report filed by All Defendants. (Campbell, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
order Order Fri 06/14 9:12 AM
Order [non-document]: A review of the docket reflects that counsel have failed to file 45-day joint status reports, as required by the Court's Case Management Plan and Trial Order. (See Doc. No.15 (CMPTO), at 2.) Counsel are directed to meet and confer and file a joint status report by no later than June 17, 2024, and continue to file joint status reports every 45 days thereafter until the case is concluded. Chief District Judge Sara Lioi on 6/14/2024. (V,A)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
17 17 12 pgs order Order on Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim Mon 04/08 1:22 PM
Memorandum Opinion and Order denying defendants'6 motion to dismiss. Judge Sara Lioi on 4/8/2024. (V,A)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
16 16 notice Preliminary Estimate/Budget of Amount of Fees and Expenses (atty event) Tue 02/20 5:30 PM
Preliminary Estimate/Budget of Amount of Fees and Expenses filed by Brandi Little. (Shattuck, Taurean)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
15 15 order Case Management Conference Plan/Order Thu 02/08 1:17 PM
Case Management Plan and Trial Order. Case is assigned to the Standard Track; Deadline to add parties or amend pleadings 2/22/2024; Deadline for completing fact discovery 8/9/2024; The parties have agreed to follow the default standard for discovery of electronically-stored information; Deadline for party with burden of proof to identify experts and provide reports 9/13/2024; Deadline to identify rebuttal experts and provide reports 10/31/2024; Deadline for completing expert discovery 12/20/2024; Deadline for filing dispositive motions 9/27/2024; Deadline for filing oppositions to motions 10/28/2024; Deadline for filing replies to responses 11/12/2024; Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/16/2024 at 11:30 a.m.; Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/28/2025 at 1:00 p.m.; Jury Trial set on two week standby period beginning 3/31/2025 at 8:00 a.m. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Sara Lioi on 2/8/2024. (V,A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix A - Final Pretrial Order,
Att: 2 Appendix B - Exhibit List,
Att: 3 Appendix C - Witness List
minutes Case Management Conference Thu 02/08 1:03 PM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Sara Lioi. On February 8, 2024, the Court conducted a telephonic case management conference. Attorneys Taurean Shattuck and Y. Timothy Chai participated. The Court discussed with counsel dates and deadlines that will appear in the Court's case management plan and trial order. Counsel was advised that the Court requires the filing of joint 45-day status reports. The Court also briefly discussed the pending partial motion to dismiss, and the Court will issue a ruling on the motion in due course. Additionally, counsel was advised that, should the parties desire a referral to the magistrate judge or ADR panel member for mediation, counsel may so indicate in a status report or by contacting chambers directly. (Court Reporter: None.) Time: 15 minutes. (V,A)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
14 14 notice Report of Parties Planning Meeting (atty event) Tue 02/06 10:27 AM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Brandi Little. (Shattuck, Taurean)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
13 13 notice Initial Disclosures (atty event) Thu 02/01 4:06 PM
Initial Disclosures Defendants' Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by All Defendants. (Campbell, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
12 12 resp Reply Thu 01/25 3:13 PM
Reply in support of6 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by All Defendants. (Campbell, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
11 11 oth_ans Brief Thu 01/18 5:30 PM
Brief IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Brandi Little. Related document(s)6 . (Shattuck, Taurean)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Motion for leave Thu 01/11 9:10 AM
Order granting defendant's9 unopposed motion for leave to substitute David Campbell and Timothy Chai as counsel. Judge Sara Lioi on 1/11/2024. (V,A)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
9 9 motion Leave Wed 01/10 11:02 AM
Motion for leave to Substitute as Counsel for Defendants filed by Blue Stream Rehab and Nursing, LLC, Mendel Brecher, and Dawn Nelson. (Chai, Y.) Modified text on 1/10/2024 (E,CK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Substitution of Counsel
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
8 8 order Case Management Conference Scheduling Order Wed 01/03 12:57 PM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order : Telephone case management conference, with counsel only, to be held on 2/8/2024 at 12:00 P.M. before Judge Sara Lioi. Directions for joining the call will be emailed to counsel of record no later than the day before the CMC. The disclosures mandated by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) will all apply. Plaintiff must serve on opposing parties the initial disclosures by 1/25/2024. All other parties must serve on opposing parties the initial disclosures by 2/1/2024. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Sara Lioi on 1/3/2024. (V,A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/02 2:52 PM
Answer to1 Complaint, filed by Blue Stream Rehab and Nursing, LLC, Mendel Brecher, Dawn Nelson. (Campbell, David)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 01/02 2:49 PM
Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Blue Stream Rehab and Nursing, LLC, Mendel Brecher, Dawn Nelson. Related document(s)1 . (Campbell, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
order Order on Motion for extension of time to answer Thu 12/21 10:14 AM
Order [non-document] granting defendants'5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 1/3/2024. Judge Sara Lioi on 12/21/2023. (V,A)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
5 5 motion Extension (answer complaint) Tue 12/19 3:00 PM
Unopposed Motion for extension of time until January 3, 2024 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Blue Stream Rehab and Nursing, LLC, Mendel Brecher, Dawn Nelson. Related document(s)1 . (Campbell, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
4 4 service Return of Service Executed Wed 12/13 3:15 PM
Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail, executed upon Blue Stream Rehab and Nursing, LLC. No delivery date on green card, information on the U.S. Postal Service website indicates 'Awaiting Delivery. November 30, 2023, 2:42 am'. Filed on behalf of Brandi Little. Related document(s)2 . (B,DL)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
oth_evt Service by Clerk Mon 11/27 11:54 AM
Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Blue Stream Rehab and Nursing, LLC. Receipt # 9589 0710 5270 1262 0988 63. Blue Stream Rehab and Nursing, LLC, National General Management Corp. c/o VCorp Agent Services, Inc. Receipt # 9589 0710 5270 1262 0988 94. Mendel Brecher, c/o Blue Stream Rehab and Nursing, LLC. Receipt # 9589 0710 5270 1262 0988 70. Dawn Nelson, c/o Blue Stream Rehab and Nursing, LLC. Receipt # 9589 0710 5270 1262 0988 87. Placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: Certified Mail. (B,DL)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
3 3 order Initial Order - Judge Lioi Fri 11/17 9:02 AM
Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 11/17/2023. (E,CK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix A - Witness List,
Att: 2 Appendix B - Exhibit List
2 2 oth_evt Summons Issued Fri 11/17 9:00 AM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Blue Stream Rehab and Nursing, LLC, Blue Stream Rehab and Nursing, LLC c/o VCorp Agent Services, Mendel Brecher, and Dawn Nelson. (E,CK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
utility Add and Terminate Judge Fri 11/17 8:07 AM
Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (E,CK)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Fri 11/17 8:09 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp. (E,CK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 11/16 3:56 PM
Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-12278433.. Filed by BRANDI LITTLE. (Shattuck, Taurean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit EEOC Right-to-Sue,
Att: 3 Exhibit OCRC Right-to-Sue,
Att: 4 Summons