Mississippi Southern District Court
Judge:Carlton W Reeves
Referred: Lakeysha Greer Isaac
Case #: 3:23-cv-03094
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Nov 16, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday May 14, 2024 3:30 AM CDT
Defendant
Biewer Lumber, LLC
Represented By
Dakota James Stephens
Jones Walker, Llp - Jackson
contact info
Joseph Lee Adams
Jones Walker, Llp - Jackson
contact info
Plaintiff
John Evans
Represented By
Joel F. Dillard
Joel F. Dillard, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
43 43 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/15 5:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Thomas Hanlon on behalf of John Evans (Hanlon, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 01, 2025
utility Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines/Hearings Wed 01/01 11:17 AM
Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines/Hearings in accordance with TEXT ONLY ORDER issued 12/27/24 Specifying Times: Jury Trial set for 12/1/2025 09:00 AM before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves; Pretrial Conference set for 10/31/2025 09:00 AM before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves (CCO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
utility Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines/Hearings Tue 12/31 6:44 PM
Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines in accordance with TEXT ONLY ORDER issued 12/27/24: Discovery due by 6/17/2025; Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 3/18/2025; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 4/17/2025; Motions due by 7/1/2025; ADR Report due by 10/24/2025 (CCO)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
order Order Fri 12/27 2:55 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER Revsing Deadlines in this case sue sponte as follows:Trial rescheuled to December 1, 2025; Pretrial Conference rescheduled to October 31, 2025; Discovery deadline extended to June 17, 2025; Plaintiffs Expert Designation extended to March 18, 2025; Defendants Expert Designation extended to April 17, 2025; Motions Deadline extended to July 1, 2025; ADR Report due October 24, 2025. Parties are to contact the court regarding rescheduling settlement conference date. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL FOLLOW. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 12/27/24 (CCO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
42 42 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 11/12 11:38 AM
First Amended ANSWER to41 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant by Biewer Lumber, LLC.(Adams, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
41 41 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 10/30 11:02 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT (dropping class claims and clarifying issues) against Biewer Lumber, LLC, filed by John Evans.(Dillard, Joel)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 10/30 10:50 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting40 Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 10/30/2024. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE ON THIS MOTION. (AC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
40 40 motion Extension of Time to File Document Tue 10/29 9:29 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint by John Evans (Dillard, Joel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
39 39 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Tue 10/15 9:42 AM
ORDER denying without prejudice27 Motion for Extension of Time and29 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 10/15/24. (AC)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Order on Motion to Extend Deadline Tue 10/15 9:43 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER finding as moot37 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, per39 Order. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 10/15/24. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE ON THIS MOTION. (AC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
38 38 5 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Wed 10/09 10:08 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re37 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery MOTION for Extension of Time to File MOTION to Extend Class action certification motion, discovery, amendment Deadline filed by John Evans (Dillard, Joel)
Related: [-]
37 37 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Extension of Time to File Document Extend Deadline Wed 10/09 10:06 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery , MOTION for Extension of Time to File , MOTION to Extend Class action certification motion, discovery, amendment Deadline by John Evans (Dillard, Joel)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
36 36 respm Rebuttal Mon 07/15 3:25 PM
Rebuttal re29 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(c) ,30 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Biewer Lumber, LLC (Adams, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
35 35 13 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Mon 07/08 6:24 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re29 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(c) filed by John Evans (Dillard, Joel)
Related: [-]
34 34 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 07/08 6:21 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re29 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(c) filed by John Evans (Dillard, Joel)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 06/21 12:07 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting33 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. The new deadline is July 8. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 6/21/24. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. (AC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
33 33 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 06/20 9:48 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to29 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(c) by John Evans (Dillard, Joel)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
misc Docket Annotation Mon 06/10 6:59 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #31 : Proposed orders are not to be electronically filed as a separate pleading or as an attachment to a pleading, but instead are to be provided to chambers by e-mail (Court's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Sec.5.B.). (KNS)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
32 32 23 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Fri 06/07 5:18 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re27 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend21 Case Management Order,,,,1 Complaint filed by Biewer Lumber, LLC (Adams, Joseph)
Related: [-]
31 31 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 06/07 5:10 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re27 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend21 Case Management Order,,,,1 Complaint filed by Biewer Lumber, LLC(Adams, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Case Management Order
misc Docket Annotation Fri 06/07 9:28 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #29 : L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number AND a meaningful description. Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings (cwl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
30 30 13 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Thu 06/06 5:23 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re29 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(c) filed by Biewer Lumber, LLC (Adams, Joseph)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Judgment on the Pleadings Thu 06/06 5:19 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(c) by Biewer Lumber, LLC(Adams, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Monday, June 03, 2024
28 28 7 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Mon 06/03 11:06 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re27 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend21 Case Management Order,,,,1 Complaint filed by John Evans (Dillard, Joel)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Extension of Time to Amend Mon 06/03 10:57 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend21 Case Management Order,,,,1 Complaint by John Evans (Dillard, Joel)
Related: [-]
26 26 respm Response to Memorandum Mon 06/03 8:14 AM
RESPONSE to Memorandum re25 Response to21 Order filed by Biewer Lumber, LLC(Adams, Joseph) Modified on 6/3/2024 (KNS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
misc Docket Annotation Mon 06/03 9:46 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #26 : L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings. (KNS)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
25 25 respm Response to Order Fri 05/31 4:08 PM
Response to Order re21 CLASS CERTIFICATION SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties will exchange initial disclosures regarding class certification issues pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 on or prior to May 17, 2024. The deadline for Defendants to respond to Plaintiffs' amended complaint, if any, is June 24, 2024. Discovery must be completed by October 9, 2024. The deadline to file any motions to amend the pleadings or to join additional parties is June 3, 2024. Expert witnesses for class certification, if any, shall be disclosed, in compliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26, by August 8, 2024 for Plaintiffs, and by September 9, 2024 for Defendants. Daubert motions challenging the parties' class certification experts must be filed by December 9, 2024. Plaintiffs' motion for class certification and memorandum shall be filed by January 23, 2025, and shall not exceed 40 pages; the response by Defendants is due 14 days thereafter and will not exceed 40 pages; and any reply by Plaintiffs will be due 7 days after Defendants' response and will not exceed 20 pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 5/6/24 (NL),24 Response to Order re21 CLASS CERTIFICATION SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties will exchange initial disclosures regarding class certification issues pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 on or prior to May 17, 2024. The deadline for Defendants to respond to Plaintiffs' amended complaint, if any, is June 24, 2024. Discovery must be completed by October 9, 2024. The deadline to file any motions to amend the pleadings or to join additional parties is June 3, 2024. Expert witnesses for class certification, if any, shall be disclosed, in compliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26, by August 8, 2024 for Plaintiffs, and by September 9, 2024 for Defendants. Daubert motions challenging the parties' class certification experts must be filed by December 9, 2024. Plaintiffs' motion for class certification and memorandum shall be filed by January 23, 2025, and shall not exceed 40 pages; the response by Defendants is due 14 days thereafter and will not exceed 40 pages; and any reply by Plaintiffs will be due 7 days after Defendants' response and will not exceed 20 pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 5/6/24 (NL) filed by Biewer Lumber, LLC(Adams, Joseph) filed by John Evans (Dillard, Joel)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
24 24 respm Response to Order Fri 05/17 1:44 PM
Response to Order re21 CLASS CERTIFICATION SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties will exchange initial disclosures regarding class certification issues pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 on or prior to May 17, 2024. The deadline for Defendants to respond to Plaintiffs' amended complaint, if any, is June 24, 2024. Discovery must be completed by October 9, 2024. The deadline to file any motions to amend the pleadings or to join additional parties is June 3, 2024. Expert witnesses for class certification, if any, shall be disclosed, in compliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26, by August 8, 2024 for Plaintiffs, and by September 9, 2024 for Defendants. Daubert motions challenging the parties' class certification experts must be filed by December 9, 2024. Plaintiffs' motion for class certification and memorandum shall be filed by January 23, 2025, and shall not exceed 40 pages; the response by Defendants is due 14 days thereafter and will not exceed 40 pages; and any reply by Plaintiffs will be due 7 days after Defendants' response and will not exceed 20 pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 5/6/24 (NL) filed by Biewer Lumber, LLC(Adams, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Attachment Reedy v. Phillips 66 Co.,
Att: 4 Attachment Shaw v. Helix Energy Solutions Grp., Inc.,
Att: 5 Attachment Brown v. San Antonio Food Bank,
Att: 6 Attachment Miller v. Ga. Gulf Corp.,
Att: 7 Attachment Jones v. Casey's Gen. Stores,
Att: 8 Attachment Rovinelli v. Trans World Entm't Corp.,
Att: 9 Attachment Silver v. Pep Boys-Manny, Moe & Jack of Delaware, Inc.,
Att: 10 Attachment Iron Workers Mid-South Pension Fund v. Davis,
Att: 11 Attachment Pet Gifts United States, LLC v. Imagine This Co., LLC,
Att: 12 Attachment White v. Hon Co.,
Att: 13 Attachment Van Heel v. GCA Educ. Servs.,
Att: 14 Attachment Roberts v. Baptist Healthcare Sys., LLC
Friday, May 10, 2024
23 23 discov Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production Fri 05/10 9:01 AM
First NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Production by John Evans (Dillard, Joel)
Related: [-]
22 22 discov Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories Fri 05/10 8:58 AM
First NOTICE of Service of Response to Interrogatories by John Evans (Dillard, Joel)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
21 21 4 pgs order Case Management Order Mon 05/06 10:37 AM
CLASS CERTIFICATION SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties will exchange initial disclosures regarding class certification issues pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 on or prior to May 17, 2024. The deadline for Defendants to respond to Plaintiffs' amended complaint, if any, is June 24, 2024. Discovery must be completed by October 9, 2024. The deadline to file any motions to amend the pleadings or to join additional parties is June 3, 2024. Expert witnesses for class certification, if any, shall be disclosed, in compliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26, by August 8, 2024 for Plaintiffs, and by September 9, 2024 for Defendants. Daubert motions challenging the parties' class certification experts must be filed by December 9, 2024. Plaintiffs' motion for class certification and memorandum shall be filed by January 23, 2025, and shall not exceed 40 pages; the response by Defendants is due 14 days thereafter and will not exceed 40 pages; and any reply by Plaintiffs will be due 7 days after Defendants' response and will not exceed 20 pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac on 5/6/24 (NL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
20 20 discov Notice of Service of Disclosure Thu 05/02 4:52 PM
NOTICE of Service of Defendant's Supplemental Initial Disclosure by Biewer Lumber, LLC (Adams, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
19 19 discov Notice of Service of Response to Interrogatories Wed 04/24 3:59 PM
NOTICE of Service of Response to Interrogatories by Biewer Lumber, LLC (Adams, Joseph)
Related: [-]
18 18 discov Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production Wed 04/24 2:58 PM
NOTICE of Service of Response to Request for Production by Biewer Lumber, LLC (Adams, Joseph)
Related: [-]
17 17 discov Notice of Service of Disclosure Wed 04/24 10:05 AM
NOTICE of Service of Defendant's Initial Disclosure by Biewer Lumber, LLC (Adams, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
16 16 discov Notice of Service of Request for Production Fri 03/15 4:22 PM
NOTICE of Service of First Request for Production by Biewer Lumber, LLC (Adams, Joseph)
Related: [-]
15 15 discov Notice of Service of Interrogatories Fri 03/15 4:21 PM
NOTICE of Service of First Set of Interrogatories by Biewer Lumber, LLC (Adams, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
14 14 notice Rule 16(a) Initial Order Tue 03/12 10:05 AM
Rule 16(a) Initial Order: PLEASE NOTE - DATE/TIME REMAIN THE SAME: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2024 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to isaac_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. The parties are instructed to use the following Dial-in Number for the Conference: (888) 684-8852 PASSCODE: 3566012 (PLEASE NOTE: Parties are directed to use the Case Management Order Form 1 found on the website of the US District Court for the Southern District of MS - Form Last Updated: Jan 2022). (NL)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
13 13 discov Notice of Service of Request for Production Mon 03/11 4:31 PM
NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by John Evans (Dillard, Joel)
Related: [-]
12 12 discov Notice of Service of Interrogatories Mon 03/11 4:30 PM
NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by John Evans (Dillard, Joel)
Related: [-]
11 11 discov Notice of Service of Disclosure Mon 03/11 4:30 PM
First NOTICE of Service of Disclosure by John Evans (Dillard, Joel)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Mon 03/04 11:52 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Andrew S. Harris recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge LaKeysha Greer Isaac for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew S. Harris on 3/4/2024 (KNS)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Mon 03/04 11:55 AM
Remark: Parties should include the reassigned Magistrate Judge's initials LGI on future filings. (KNS)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
9 9 9 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Fri 03/01 12:10 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Andrew S. Harris for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew S. Harris on 03/01/2024 (CO)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Fri 03/01 12:11 PM
Remark: Parties should include the newly assigned Magistrate Judge's initials ASH on future filings. (CO)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
8 8 notice Rule 16(a) Initial Order Fri 02/09 1:17 PM
Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2024 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/30 3:08 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant by Biewer Lumber, LLC.(Adams, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 01/12 10:10 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. The deadline for Defendant Biewer Lumber, LLC to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 1/30/2024. No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 1/12/2024 (MAM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 01/11 10:48 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Initial Pleading by Biewer Lumber, LLC (Adams, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
misc Docket Annotation Thu 12/28 7:09 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #s [4, 5]: Attorney is advised to include Northern Division name in future filings. (KNS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/27 2:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Dakota James Stephens on behalf of Biewer Lumber, LLC (Stephens, Dakota)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/27 2:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Lee Adams on behalf of Biewer Lumber, LLC (Adams, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 12/13 5:22 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Evans. Biewer Lumber, LLC waiver sent on 11/17/2023, answer due 1/16/2024. (Dillard, Joel)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
2 2 service Request for Waiver of Service Mon 11/20 3:38 PM
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Biewer Lumber, LLC on 11/20/2023 by John Evans. Waiver of Service due by 12/20/2023 (Dillard, Joel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 11/16 2:16 PM
COMPLAINT against Biewer Lumber, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSSDC-5270023), filed by John Evans.(KNS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet