New Jersey District Court
Case #: 1:23-mj-07089
Case Filed:Nov 14, 2023
Last checked: Friday Nov 17, 2023 3:42 AM EST
Defendant
MICHAEL GORDON (1)
Represented By
CHRISTOPHER H. O'MALLEY
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
JOSEPHINE J. PARK
Doj-Usao
contact info
ANDREW B. JOHNS
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/17/2023 7:44 AM EST
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
Arrest of MICHAEL GORDON (bda)
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs COMPLAINT as to MICHAEL GORDON (1). (bda)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE JOSEPHINE J. PARK appearing for USA. (PARK, JOSEPHINE)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to MICHAEL GORDON CHRISTOPHER H. O'MALLEY for MICHAEL GORDON appointed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 11/14/2023. (bda)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER advising of the United States' continuing obligation to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland . Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 11/14/2023. (bda)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs ORDER advising of the United States' continuing obligation to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland . Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 11/14/2023. (bda)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by MICHAEL GORDON (bda)
Related: [-]
8 8 3 pgs ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to MICHAEL GORDON Time excluded from 11/14/2023 until 1/13/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 11/14/2023. (bda)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs ORDER scheduling a Detention Hearing as to MICHAEL GORDON. Bond Hearing set for 11/17/2023, at 10:00 AM in Camden - Courtroom 5C before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 11/14/2023. (bda)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal: Initial Appearance. Hearing on application by defendant for appointment of counsel. Financial affidavit executed and filed. Ordered application granted.Ordered Christopher OMalley, AFPD appointed as counsel. Order to be entered.Defendant advised of rights, charges, and penalties. Defendant waives formal reading of the complaint. Brady Order read into the record. Order to be entered. Defendant consents to detention without prejudice pending a detention hearing.Detention hearing set for November 17, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. Order to be entered.Defendant waives preliminary hearing. Order to be entered. Order of continuance executed on the record excluding time from the November 14, 2023, through January 12, 2024, pursuant to the Speed Trial Act. Order to be entered. Ordered defendant remanded to the custody for the Marshals for transportation to the correctional facility. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (bda)
Related: [-]