New York Western District Court
Case #: 1:23-mj-01151
Case Filed:Nov 14, 2023
Terminated:Nov 14, 2023
Last checked: Friday Nov 17, 2023 2:26 AM EST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Charles Mark Kruly
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Bflo
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Danny Mizrahi (1)
Terminated: 11/14/2023
Represented By
Brian P. Comerford
Federal Public Defender
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/08/2023 4:15 PM EST
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
Arrest of Danny Mizrahi (EG)
Related: [-]
1 1 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy: Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3) Proceedings as to Danny Mizrahi held on 11/14/2023. The parties appear. Defendant received copy of the EDNY indictment. Defendant advised of rights, including to counsel. Defendant requests appointment of counsel for purpose of today's appearance. AFPDs Comerford and Morrissey appointed as counsel for purpose of today's appearance only. Defendant advised of right to identity hearing, detention hearing, and rights under Rule 20. Defendant executed written waiver. Defendant will reserve his rights to those hearings before the EDNY Judge. The government seeks custodial transfer to EDNY. Defendant opposes detention, but consents to custodial transfer to EDNY for further proceedings. The court order defendant to be transferred to EDNY. APPEARANCES: AUSA Charles Kruly; Defendant with AFPDs Brian Comerford, John Morrissey; USPO Janelle Dzina (FTR Gold) (EG)
Related: [-]
2 2 WAIVER of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearing by Danny Mizrahi (EG)
Related: [-]
3 3 COMMITMENT TO ANOTHER DISTRICT as to Danny Mizrahi. Defendant committed to the Eastern District of New York. Signed by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 11/14/2023. (EG)
Related: [-]
4 4 4 pgs Notice to Eastern District of New York of a Rule 5 Appearance as to Danny Mizrahi. Your case number is: 23-CR-461. Docket sheet and documents attached. (If you require certified copies of any documents, please send a request to caseadmins@nywd.uscourts.gov. If you wish to designate a different email address for future transfers, send your request to InterDistrictTransfer_TXND@txnd.uscourts.gov.) (EG)
Related: [-]