Rhode Island District Court
Case #: 1:23-cr-00102
Case Filed:Nov 15, 2023
Last checked: Friday Nov 17, 2023 2:21 AM EST
Defendant
Gregory Lombardi (1)
Represented By
Joanne M. Daley
Ri Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Julie M. White
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/15/2024 6:20 PM EDT
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
Arrest of Gregory Lombardi (Noel, Jeannine) [1:23-mj-00072-LDA]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING DEFENDANT REQUEST as to Gregory Lombardi. Initial Appearance set for 11/8/2023 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom A before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond.(Noel, Jeannine) [1:23-mj-00072-LDA]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond:Initial Appearance as to Gregory Lombardi held on 11/8/2023, Detention Hearing as to Gregory Lombardi held on 11/8/2023 (White, Daley) USPO Miller; All present; Deft present; FPD appointed; Court informs Deft of rights and charges; Deft understands rights and charges; Due Process Act Order entered; Preliminary Exam scheduled; Court addresses parties concerning paragraph 28 of the affidavit; Govt addresses the Court; Deft Counsel addresses the Court; Govt requests detention; No bail argument; Deft reserves the right to argue for bail in the future; Deft remanded(Court Reporter FTR in Courtroom A at 4:04 pm.)(Noel, Jeannine) [1:23-mj-00072-LDA]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING DEFENDANT REQUEST as to Gregory Lombardi. Preliminary Hearing set for 11/16/2023 03:00 at PM in Courtroom A before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond.(Noel, Jeannine) [1:23-mj-00072-LDA]
Related: [-]
1 1 1 pgs COMPLAINT as to Gregory Lombardi (1).(Noel, Jeannine) [1:23-mj-00072-LDA]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 14 pgs Affidavit,
Att: 2 1 pgs Criminal Cover Sheet
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Gregory Lombardi. Joanne M. Daley for Gregory Lombardi appointed. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 11/8/2023. (Noel, Jeannine) [1:23-mj-00072-LDA]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER PURSUANT TO DUE PROCESS PROTECTIONS ACT as to Gregory Lombardi. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 11/8/2023. (Noel, Jeannine) [1:23-mj-00072-LDA]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Gregory Lombardi. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 11/8/2023.(Noel, Jeannine) [1:23-mj-00072-LDA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
7 7 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 11/8/2023 Providence, RI in case as to Gregory Lombardi. (Noel, Jeannine) [1:23-mj-00072-LDA]
Related: [-]
8 8 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on November 8, 2023 before Judge Lincoln D. Almond. Ordinary Transcript delivery selected. Transcript to be delivered in 30 days. (White, Julie) [1:23-mj-00072-LDA]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
9 9 TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT Entered re:8 Transcript Order. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Denise Veitch (Dias, Jennifer) [1:23-mj-00072-LDA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
NOTICE OF FORFEITURE ALLEGATION by USA as to Gregory Lombardi re10 Indictment.(Saucier, Martha)
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING DEFENDANT REQUEST as to Gregory Lombardi. In-Person Arraignment set for 11/16/2023 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom A before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond.(Noel, Jeannine)
Related: [-]
10 10 3 pgs INDICTMENT as to Gregory Lombardi (1) count(s) 1, 2.(Saucier, Martha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Criminal Cover Sheet