Cammeron v. DMG Media LTD et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Ronnie Abrams |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-10137 |
Nature of Suit | 751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act |
Cause | 29:2601 FMLA: Family and Medical Leave Act (Findings and Purposes) |
Case Filed: | Nov 17, 2023 |
Last checked: Thursday May 16, 2024 6:10 AM EDT |
Defendant
DMG Media LTD
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mail Media Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robin Raven
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brenna Cammeron
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, April 28, 2025 | ||
37 | 37
![]() NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 4/22/2025 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly) |
|
36 | 36
![]() TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 4/22/2025 before Judge Ronnie Abrams. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Tracy Groth, (212) 805-0320. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/19/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/29/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2025..(McGuirk, Kelly) |
|
Wednesday, April 23, 2025 | ||
35 | 35
![]() CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). The parties have engaged in settlement discussions. This case is to be tried to a jury. No additional parties may be joined after May 22, 2025 without leave of the Court. No amendments to the pleadings may be made after May 22, 2025 without leave of the Court. Depositions shall be completed by September 5, 2025. Unless the parties request otherwise, the Court will hold this conference by telephone. The parties shall use the following dial-in information to call in to the conference: Call-in Number: (855) 244-8681; Meeting ID: 2305 542 4735. Counsel for the parties propose the following alternative dispute resolution mechanism for this case: Referral to the Southern District's Mediation Program. Estimate length of trial 5 days. SO ORDERED. Amended Pleadings due by 5/22/2025. Joinder of Parties due by 5/22/2025. Expert Deposition due by 11/21/2025. Fact Discovery due by 9/5/2025. Expert Discovery due by 11/21/2025. Discovery due by 11/21/2025. Telephone Conference set for 9/5/2025 at 11:30 AM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/23/2025) (tg) |
|
Tuesday, April 22, 2025 | ||
minutes
Status Conference
Tue 04/22 3:58 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronnie Abrams: Status Conference held on 4/22/2025. (Court Reporter Tracy Groth) (arc) |
||
Thursday, April 17, 2025 | ||
34 | 34
![]() PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by DMG Media LTD, Mail Media Inc., Robin Raven(in his individual capacity), Robin Raven(in his professional capacity)..(Liao, Katharine) |
|
33 | 33
![]() JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Katharine J. Liao dated April 17, 2025 re: April 2, 2025 Order and Notice of Initial Conference. Document filed by DMG Media LTD, Mail Media Inc., Robin Raven(in his professional capacity)..(Liao, Katharine) |
|
Wednesday, April 02, 2025 | ||
32 | 32
![]() ORDER granting31 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application granted. The conference previously scheduled for April 10, 2025 is hereby adjourned to April 22, 2025 at 2:30 p.m. The parties shall submit a joint letter and proposed case management plan no later than April 17, 2025. SO ORDERED. Status Conference set for 4/22/2025 at 02:30 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/2/2025) (tg) |
|
Tuesday, April 01, 2025 | ||
31 | 31
![]() LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Alex J. Hartzband, Counsel for Plaintiff dated April 1, 2025. Document filed by Brenna Cammeron..(Hartzband, Alex) |
|
Monday, March 31, 2025 | ||
30 | 30
![]() ORDER granting in part and denying in part25 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part19 Motion to Dismiss. Pending before the Court is Defendants' motion to dismiss the complaint in this action. For reasons the Court will provide on the record at a conference on April 10, 2025 at 2:00 p.m., the motion to dismiss is granted in part and denied in part. The conference will be held in Courtroom 1506 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, NY, 10007. If the parties are amenable to having a settlement conference prior to the conference with the Court, they shall advise the Court no later than April 7, 2025. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions pending at ECF Nos. 19 and 25. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 3/31/2025) (jca) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 03/31 1:13 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 4/10/2025 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1506, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (jca) |
||
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
notice
Notice of Redesignation to Magistrate Judge
Fri 08/30 5:13 PM
NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Ricardo to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. (vba) |
||
Tuesday, May 28, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
![]() REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:25 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by DMG Media LTD, Mail Media Inc., Robin Raven(in his individual capacity), Robin Raven(in his professional capacity)..(Liao, Katharine) |
|
Tuesday, May 21, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
![]() DECLARATION of Scott G. Grubin in Opposition re:25 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Brenna Cammeron..(Grubin, Scott) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
27 | 27
![]() MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:25 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Brenna Cammeron..(Grubin, Scott) |
|
Tuesday, May 07, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
![]() MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:25 MOTION to Dismiss . /Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint . Document filed by DMG Media LTD, Mail Media Inc., Robin Raven(in his individual capacity), Robin Raven(in his professional capacity)..(Liao, Katharine) |
|
25 | 25
![]() MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by DMG Media LTD, Mail Media Inc., Robin Raven(in his individual capacity), Robin Raven(in his professional capacity). Responses due by 5/21/2024.(Liao, Katharine) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
![]() FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending9 Complaint against DMG Media LTD, Mail Media Inc., Robin Raven(in his individual capacity), Robin Raven(in his professional capacity) with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Brenna Cammeron. Related document:9 Complaint..(Grubin, Scott) |
|
23 | 23
![]() ORDER granting22 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Application granted. Plaintiff shall file the Amended Complaint no later than April 25, 2024. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/23/2024) (ate) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 04/23 4:53 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/25/2024. (ate) |
||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
![]() LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Plaintiff's Counsel dated April 18, 2024. Document filed by Brenna Cammeron..(Hartzband, Alex) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
Wed 04/17 2:50 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Scott G. Grubin re: Document No. 21 Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading is amended more than 21 days after service of a responsive pleading; opposing party did not consent to the amendment of the pleading; the order granting permission to file the pleading was not attached; Court's leave has not been granted.. File the Exhibit to Pleading event found under the event list Other Documents and attach either opposing party's written consent or Court's leave. (jgo) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
![]() AMENDED COMPLAINT amending9 Complaint against DMG Media LTD, Mail Media Inc., Robin Raven(in his individual capacity), Robin Raven(in his individual and professional capacities) with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Brenna Cammeron. Related document:9 Complaint..(Grubin, Scott) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
Mon 04/15 10:19 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Judge Paul A. Crotty is no longer assigned to the case..(kgo) |
||
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
![]() MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:19 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by DMG Media LTD, Mail Media Inc., Robin Raven(in his individual capacity), Robin Raven(in his individual and professional capacities)..(Liao, Katharine) |
|
19 | 19
![]() MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by DMG Media LTD, Mail Media Inc., Robin Raven(in his individual capacity), Robin Raven(in his individual and professional capacities). Responses due by 4/26/2024.(Liao, Katharine) |
|
Thursday, February 22, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
![]() MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:17 Letter filed by Robin Raven, Mail Media Inc., DMG Media LTD, ENDORSEMENT: The proposed schedule is adopted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 2/22/2024) ( Motions due by 3/25/2024., Replies due by 5/10/2024., Responses due by 4/26/2024) (ks) |
|
Wednesday, February 21, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
![]() LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Katharine J. Liao dated February 21, 2024 re: Proposed Briefing Schedule. Document filed by DMG Media LTD, Mail Media Inc., Robin Raven(in his individual capacity)..(Liao, Katharine) |
|
Thursday, February 15, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Conference
Thu 02/15 3:06 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Conference re:15 . There is no need for a conference at this time, defendants can make their motion. The parties are directed to meet and confer on a mutual briefing schedule. Proposed briefing schedule is due by Wednesday, February 21, 2024. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (dgo) |
|
Monday, February 12, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
![]() LETTER MOTION for Conference /pre-motion conference re: motion to dismiss addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Katharine J. Liao dated February 12, 2024. Document filed by DMG Media LTD, Mail Media Inc., Robin Raven(in his individual capacity)..(Liao, Katharine) |
|
14 | 14
![]() RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Daily Mail and General Holdings Ltd, Corporate Parent Associate Newspapers North America, Inc. for Mail Media Inc.. Document filed by Mail Media Inc...(Liao, Katharine) |
|
13 | 13
![]() RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Daily Mail and General Holdings Ltd for DMG Media LTD. Document filed by DMG Media LTD..(Liao, Katharine) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
![]() STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by Plaintiff BRENNA CAMMERON ("Plaintiff") and Defendants DMG MEDIA LTD., MAIL MEDIA INC. d/b/a MAILONLINE, and ROBIN RAVEN (collectively, "Defendants"), by and through undersigned counsel, that Defendants have authorized their undersigned counsel to accept service of Plaintiff's Summons and Complaint and that counsel accepted such service on behalf of Defendants; IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that the time for Defendants to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be extended up to and including February 12, 2024; IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that Defendants reserve all defenses and objections to the lawsuit, the Court's jurisdiction, and the venue of this action, except that Defendants waive defenses based upon insufficient service of process; and IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that this Stipulation maybe executed in counterparts, each of which shall be deemed an original. A faxed, conformed, or electronically scanned signature shall be deemed an original for purposes of this Stipulation. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 12/19/2023) DMG Media LTD answer due 2/12/2024; Mail Media Inc. answer due 2/12/2024; Robin Raven(in his individual capacity) answer due 2/12/2024; Robin Raven(in his individual and professional capacities) answer due 2/12/2024. (ks) |
|
Thursday, December 14, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
![]() PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by DMG Media LTD, Mail Media Inc., Robin Raven(in his individual capacity), Robin Raven(in his individual and professional capacities)..(Liao, Katharine) |
|
Friday, November 17, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Hartzband, Alex) |
|
4 | 4
![]() REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Robin Raven, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Brenna Cammeron..(Hartzband, Alex) |
|
3 | 3
![]() REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mail Media Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Brenna Cammeron..(Hartzband, Alex) |
|
2 | 2
![]() REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to DMG Media Ltd., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Brenna Cammeron..(Hartzband, Alex) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against DMG Media LTD, Mail Media Inc., Robin Raven. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28585704)Document filed by Brenna Cammeron..(Hartzband, Alex) |