Montana District Court
Judge:Dana L Christensen
Referred: Kathleen L Desoto
Case #: 9:23-cv-00140
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Nov 17, 2023
Terminated:Oct 21, 2024
Last checked: Thursday May 16, 2024 3:49 AM MDT
Defendant
James Lapotka
Represented By
Mitchell A. Young
Montana Association Of Counties
contact info
Defendant
Justin Kalmbach
Represented By
Justin Kalmbach
Kalmbach Law Office, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ronald P. Melvin
4201 South Ave. W.
Polson, MT 59804

GPO Dec 05 2023
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that on or before December 19, 2023, Plaintiff must file a signed copy of his Complaint. Plaintiff is cautioned that if he fails to comply with this Order, his Complaint will be stricken from the record and this matter may be dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) for failure to comply with the Courts orders and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 12/5/2023. (SGN) Copy mailed to Melvin.
GPO Dec 12 2023
ORDER finding as moot 5 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 12/12/2023. (APP) Copy mailed to Melvin
GPO Jan 10 2024
Order Withholding Consent. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U.S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Judge Christensen. The case remains REFERRED to the Honorable Judge DeSoto. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 1/10/2024. (APP) copy mailed to Melvin
GPO Oct 21 2024
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 10/21/2024. (ASG) Modified on 10/21/2024 to relfect copy mailed to Melvin. (ASG).
GPO Oct 21 2024
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Copy to Melvin. (SGN)

Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Monday, October 21, 2024
29 29 misc Judgment - Clerk Mon 10/21 3:09 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Copy to Melvin. (SGN)
Related: [-]
28 28 5 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 10/21 2:34 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 10/21/2024. (ASG) Modified on 10/21/2024 to relfect copy mailed to Melvin. (ASG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
27 27 respoth Objection to Findings and Recommendations - SDM Thu 09/26 1:18 PM
OBJECTION to23 Findings and Recommendations filed by Ronald P. Melvin. (APP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
26 26 respm Brief/Response to Order - MT Tue 09/24 11:14 AM
Response to Order re25 Order filed by Ronald P. Melvin. (APP)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
25 25 2 pgs order Order Setting - MT Mon 09/16 2:08 PM
ORDER. Plaintiff shall have until October 7, 2024, to file a notice informing the Clerk of Court of his current address. Plaintiff is cautioned that if he fails to comply with this order and does not file a notice of updated address on or before October 7, 2024, this case will be dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/16/2024. Mailed to Melvin as directed (TAG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
24 24 misc Mail Returned Thu 09/05 10:51 AM
Mail re23 sent to Melvin Returned as Undeliverable. (TAG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 09/03 4:51 PM
Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto no longer assigned to case. (APP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
23 23 motion Findings and Recommendations - SDM Wed 08/21 9:43 AM
FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Justin Kalmbach.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 8/21/2024. (HMJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
22 22 respm Response to Motion Thu 01/11 1:44 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ,9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Ronald P. Melvin. (APP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Response Duplicate
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
21 21 2 pgs order Order Withholding Consent - MT ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Wed 01/10 10:30 AM
Order Withholding Consent. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U.S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Judge Christensen. The case remains REFERRED to the Honorable Judge DeSoto. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 1/10/2024. (APP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
20 20 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 01/03 9:47 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Justin Kalmbach. (Kalmbach, Justin)
Related: [-]
19 19 limited Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party Wed 01/03 8:39 PM
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
18 18 respm Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT Wed 12/27 4:53 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support re9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by James Lapotka. (Young, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
17 17 limited Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party Wed 12/20 4:49 PM
Related: [-]
16 16 respm Response to Motion Wed 12/20 1:36 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ,9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Ronald P. Melvin. (APP)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
15 15 respm Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT Mon 12/18 9:19 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support re14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ,9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ,1 Complaint,11 Complaint filed by Justin Kalmbach. (Kalmbach, Justin)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 12/18 9:17 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Justin Kalmbach appearing for Defendant Justin Kalmbach. Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Kalmbach, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
13 13 notice Mailing of Consent - MT Wed 12/13 11:14 AM
Service of Consent to Magistrate Judge as Presiding Judge form. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 1/2/2024. (APP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Strike Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Tue 12/12 9:52 AM
ORDER finding as moot5 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 12/12/2023. (APP)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
11 11 cmp Complaint - SDM Mon 12/11 9:35 AM
COMPLAINT (Signed) against All Defendants, filed by Ronald P. Melvin. (APP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
10 10 respm Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT Thu 12/07 11:44 AM
Brief/Memorandum in Support re9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ,1 Complaint filed by James Lapotka. (Young, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 12/07 11:43 AM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Mitchell A. Young appearing for Defendant James Lapotka. Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Young, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/07 11:41 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mitchell A. Young on behalf of James Lapotka (Young, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
7 7 2 pgs order Order Tue 12/05 1:48 PM
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that on or before December 19, 2023, Plaintiff must file a signed copy of his Complaint. Plaintiff is cautioned that if he fails to comply with this Order, his Complaint will be stricken from the record and this matter may be dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) for failure to comply with the Courts orders and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 12/5/2023. (SGN)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 12/05 10:03 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronald P. Melvin. James Lapotka served on 11/22/2023, answer due 12/13/2023; Justin Kalmbach served on 11/22/2023, answer due 12/13/2023. (SGN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Returned Summons James LaPotka
Monday, November 27, 2023
5 5 motion Amend/Correct Mon 11/27 1:55 PM
Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct4 MOTION to Strike1 Complaint . Justin Kalmbach appearing for Defendant Justin Kalmbach. Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Kalmbach, Justin)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Strike - SDM Mon 11/27 9:46 AM
MOTION to Strike1 Complaint . Justin Kalmbach appearing for Defendant Justin Kalmbach. Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Kalmbach, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Friday, November 17, 2023
3 3 notice Notice of Case Opening - MT Fri 11/17 2:30 PM
NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re1 Complaint. Mailed to Melvin (TAG)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 11/17 11:29 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (TAG)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - SDM Fri 11/17 11:28 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ronald P. Melvin. (TAG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits
misc Filing Fee Received Fri 11/17 11:29 AM
Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number MTX9-18289 (TAG)
Related: [-]