Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Bridget Meehan Brennan
Case #: 1:23-cv-02240
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Nov 17, 2023
Last checked: Thursday May 16, 2024 5:57 AM EDT
Defendant
Burntwood Tavern Brecksville, LLC
Represented By
Jessica L. MacKeigan
Walter Haverfield
contact info
Mark S. Fusco
Walter Haverfield
contact info
Defendant
Burntwood Tavern Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Jessica L. MacKeigan
Walter Haverfield
contact info
Mark S. Fusco
Walter Haverfield
contact info
Plaintiff
William Claridge
Represented By
Matthew S. Grimsley
Lazzaro Law
contact info
Lori M. Griffin
Lazzaro Law
contact info
Anthony J. Lazzaro
Lazzaro Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
48 48 motion Judgment on the Pleadings Thu 04/24 2:40 PM
Motion for judgment on the pleadings filed by Burntwood Tavern Brecksville, LLC, Burntwood Tavern Holdings, LLC. (Fusco, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
order Order on Motion to extend deadlines Tue 04/01 9:07 AM
Order [non-document]: The parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Deadlines (Doc.47 ) is GRANTED in part. The new deadlines are as follows: non-expert discovery: June 30, 2025; and dispositive motions: July 31, 2025. IT IS SO ORDERED. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 4/1/25. (T,A)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
47 47 motion Extension (of deadlines) Mon 03/17 3:06 PM
Joint Motion for extension of Discovery until August 31, 2025 filed by Plaintiff William Claridge. Related document(s)18 . (Griffin, Lori)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
46 46 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Wed 12/11 2:26 PM
Attorney Appearance by Lorraine M. Catalusci filed by on behalf of Burntwood Tavern Holdings, LLC, Burntwood Tavern Brecksville, LLC. (Catalusci, Lorraine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
45 45 notice Notice (atty event) Tue 10/08 4:20 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by William Claridge.(Griffin, Lori)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Ashton Jones Consent Form,
Att: 2 Jeana Penland Consent Form
Friday, October 04, 2024
44 44 notice Notice (atty event) Fri 10/04 1:34 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by William Claridge.(Griffin, Lori)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Sereno Fricano Consent Form,
Att: 2 Gina Vitale Consent Form
Thursday, October 03, 2024
43 43 notice Notice (atty event) Thu 10/03 5:02 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by William Claridge.(Griffin, Lori)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Taylor Adamczak Consent Form,
Att: 2 Lisa Gerrity Consent Form,
Att: 3 Connor Hutzell Consent Form,
Att: 4 Sophia Lariche Consent Form,
Att: 5 David Marques Consent Form
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
42 42 notice Notice (atty event) Wed 10/02 4:16 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Form filed by William Claridge.(Griffin, Lori)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Melissa Coleman Consent Form
Monday, September 30, 2024
41 41 notice Notice (atty event) Mon 09/30 4:50 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by William Claridge.(Griffin, Lori)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Ireland Gerhardt Consent Form,
Att: 2 Amber Johnson Consent Form,
Att: 3 Lauren McCready Consent Form
Friday, September 27, 2024
40 40 notice Notice (atty event) Fri 09/27 4:18 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Form filed by William Claridge.(Griffin, Lori)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Alicia Cooper Consent Form
Monday, September 23, 2024
39 39 notice Notice (atty event) Mon 09/23 4:42 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by William Claridge.(Griffin, Lori)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Julia Candow Consent Form,
Att: 2 Shacarra Herbin Consent Form
Friday, September 20, 2024
38 38 notice Notice (atty event) Fri 09/20 4:40 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Form filed by William Claridge.(Griffin, Lori)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Stephanie Fuerst Consent Form
Thursday, September 19, 2024
37 37 notice Notice (atty event) Thu 09/19 4:47 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by William Claridge.(Griffin, Lori)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Sara August Consent Form,
Att: 2 Carl Barry Consent Form,
Att: 3 Taylor Bocciarelli Consent Form,
Att: 4 Clare Chufar Consent Form,
Att: 5 Luca Rizi Consent Form
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
36 36 notice Notice (atty event) Tue 09/17 5:07 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by William Claridge.(Griffin, Lori)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Caitlyn Collins Consent Form,
Att: 2 Ambria Didion Consent Form,
Att: 3 Dymond Moore Consent Form,
Att: 4 Christian Parsons Consent Form,
Att: 5 Adrienne White Consent Form,
Att: 6 Larry White Consent Form
Monday, September 16, 2024
35 35 notice Notice (atty event) Mon 09/16 4:21 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by William Claridge.(Griffin, Lori)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Hallie Powell Consent Form,
Att: 2 Angelina Vincifora Consent Form,
Att: 3 Kaitlin Wagner Consent Form,
Att: 4 Helena Wilson Consent Form
Friday, September 13, 2024
34 34 notice Notice (atty event) Fri 09/13 3:38 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by William Claridge.(Griffin, Lori)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Heather Parsons Consent Form,
Att: 2 Hunter Wooldridge Consent Form
Thursday, September 12, 2024
33 33 notice Notice (atty event) Thu 09/12 4:25 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Form filed by William Claridge.(Griffin, Lori)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Katelyn Catalano Consent Form
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
32 32 notice Notice (atty event) Tue 09/10 5:39 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by William Claridge.(Griffin, Lori)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Erin Anderson Consent Form,
Att: 2 Lynley Baker Consent Form,
Att: 3 Stephanie Celik Consent Form,
Att: 4 Daniel Clement Consent Form,
Att: 5 Jovan Cox Consent Form,
Att: 6 Jessica DeJesus Consent Form,
Att: 7 Holden Fegan Consent Form,
Att: 8 Ellijah Fragnoli Consent Form,
Att: 9 Brittany Gielas Consent Form,
Att: 10 Muzzette Hadley Consent Form,
Att: 11 Austin Haig Consent Form,
Att: 12 Kaitlin Hardesty Consent Form,
Att: 13 Katherine Herron Consent Form,
Att: 14 Leslie Holstein Consent Form,
Att: 15 Matt Janecek Consent Form,
Att: 16 Savannah Kassay Consent Form,
Att: 17 Colin Masterson Consent Form,
Att: 18 Ryan McCurdy Consent Form,
Att: 19 Caroline Morck Consent Form,
Att: 20 Shawn Nicholas Consent Form,
Att: 21 Bridget Patterson Consent Form,
Att: 22 Danielle Silver Consent Form,
Att: 23 Emily Smith Consent Form,
Att: 24 Adam Stevens Consent Form,
Att: 25 Taydra Summers Consent Form,
Att: 26 Tara Summerson Consent Form,
Att: 27 Mark Torisky Consent Form,
Att: 28 Natasha Walker Consent Form,
Att: 29 Sophia Ward Consent Form,
Att: 30 Liana Wiemels Consent Form,
Att: 31 Hannah Wilson Consent Form,
Att: 32 Hannah Wong Consent Form,
Att: 33 Amy Zeleznik Consent Form
Thursday, September 05, 2024
31 31 notice Notice (atty event) Thu 09/05 6:38 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by William Claridge.(Griffin, Lori)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Casey Bogus Consent Form,
Att: 2 Riley Bogus Consent Form,
Att: 3 Mark Campo Consent Form,
Att: 4 Jayonna Culver Consent Form,
Att: 5 Mike Piccone Consent Form,
Att: 6 Marissa Turner Consent Form
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
30 30 notice Notice (atty event) Tue 09/03 6:23 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by William Claridge.(Griffin, Lori)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Belynda Cooper Consent Form,
Att: 2 Alana DeFranco Consent Form,
Att: 3 Cassandra Dull Consent Form,
Att: 4 Julius Fout Consent Form,
Att: 5 Carrie Hejduk Consent Form,
Att: 6 Makenzie Kaisk Consent Form,
Att: 7 Aubrey Martinez Consent Form,
Att: 8 Lea McDaniels Consent Form,
Att: 9 Kendal Rumplik Consent Form,
Att: 10 Sonye Savoldi Consent Form
Thursday, August 29, 2024
29 29 notice Notice (atty event) Thu 08/29 7:12 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by William Claridge.(Griffin, Lori)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Paris Bell Consent Form,
Att: 2 Renee Conte Consent Form,
Att: 3 Connor Hennessey Consent Form,
Att: 4 Chaz Rollins Consent Form,
Att: 5 Kaylee Sypolt Consent Form,
Att: 6 Les Wagenheim Consent Form,
Att: 7 Christine Wallace Consent Form,
Att: 8 David Wilson Consent Form
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
28 28 notice Notice (atty event) Tue 08/27 5:20 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by William Claridge.(Griffin, Lori)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Claudia Fleming Consent Form,
Att: 2 Davonna Robertson Consent Form
Monday, August 26, 2024
27 27 notice Notice (atty event) Mon 08/26 7:02 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by William Claridge.(Griffin, Lori)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Olivia Gliatta Consent Form,
Att: 2 Jordan Grof Consent Form,
Att: 3 Madisen Ivy Consent Form,
Att: 4 Tiffany Knox Consent Form,
Att: 5 Kacey Kokinda Consent Form,
Att: 6 Jaime McMahan Consent Form,
Att: 7 Vahyn Pierce Consent Form,
Att: 8 Alliyah Rhoden Consent Form,
Att: 9 Jada Tuggle Consent Form
Friday, August 23, 2024
26 26 notice Notice (atty event) Fri 08/23 4:58 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Form filed by William Claridge.(Griffin, Lori)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Kamelah Ganaway Consent Form
Thursday, August 22, 2024
25 25 notice Notice (atty event) Thu 08/22 8:59 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by William Claridge.(Griffin, Lori)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Lindsay Beatty Consent Form,
Att: 2 Charles Clemens Consent Form,
Att: 3 Schay Hurdy Consent Form,
Att: 4 Dylan Kretch Consent Form,
Att: 5 Julieanna Miller Consent Form,
Att: 6 Jennifer Short Consent Form,
Att: 7 Audrey Smith Consent Form,
Att: 8 Devan Ternai Consent Form
Monday, August 19, 2024
24 24 notice Notice (atty event) Mon 08/19 6:12 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by William Claridge.(Griffin, Lori)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cassandra Adamov Consent Form,
Att: 2 Macy Boger Consent Form,
Att: 3 Shannon Carr Consent Form,
Att: 4 Emily Cook Consent Form,
Att: 5 Tayler Downs Consent Form,
Att: 6 Aleah Edmondson Consent Form,
Att: 7 Anna Geisler Consent Form,
Att: 8 Roseanna Geisler Consent Form,
Att: 9 Erin Golding Consent Form,
Att: 10 Brittany Hatchette Consent Form,
Att: 11 Grace Hunt Consent Form,
Att: 12 Allison Kurasz Consent Form,
Att: 13 Lexie Phillips Consent Form,
Att: 14 Kamryn Potter Consent Form,
Att: 15 Julia Ranallo Consent Form,
Att: 16 Jessica Reed Consent Form,
Att: 17 Jerome Scaletta Consent Form,
Att: 18 Lauren Sienkiewicz Consent Form,
Att: 19 Jayla Strickland Consent Form,
Att: 20 Jasmine Torres Consent Form,
Att: 21 Jessica Urbanawiz Consent Form,
Att: 22 Amanda Wade Consent Form,
Att: 23 Alyson Wanner Consent Form,
Att: 24 Jennifer Williams Consent Form,
Att: 25 Peyton Williams Consent Form
Monday, August 05, 2024
23 23 2 pgs order Order Mon 08/05 3:15 PM
Order: For the reasons state herein, the Parties' Joint Stipulation to Court-Supervised Notice (Doc. No.20 ) is APPROVED. Defendants shall provide the list of information specified in Paragraph 3 of the Order to Plaintiff on or before 8/13/2024 . Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 8/5/2024. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
22 22 notice Notice (atty event) Mon 07/15 5:04 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Form filed by William Claridge.(Griffin, Lori)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Alexandra Bucio Consent Form
Friday, June 28, 2024
21 21 notice Notice (atty event) Fri 06/28 4:23 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel filed by Burntwood Tavern Brecksville, LLC, Burntwood Tavern Holdings, LLC. (Fusco, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
20 20 notice Stipulation (atty event) Thu 05/09 3:01 PM
Joint Proposed Stipulation to Court-Supervised Notice filed by William Claridge.(Griffin, Lori)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Ex. 1 - Proposed Notice,
Att: 2 Ex. 2 - Proposed Order
Friday, May 03, 2024
19 19 notice Stipulation (atty event) Fri 05/03 11:37 AM
Proposed Proposed Stipulation Protective Order filed by William Claridge.Related document(s)18 .(Griffin, Lori)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Comparison Document
Monday, April 29, 2024
18 18 order Case Management Conference Plan/Order Mon 04/29 4:25 PM
Case Management Conference Order: The parties are instructed to read the attached Order in its entirety. Case is designated Standard Track. The following deadlines were established: submission of draft proposed protective order: 5/3/2024; and submission of signed stipulation as to opt-in notice: 5/10/2024. The following proposed deadlines were adopted: amended pleadings/joinder of parties without leave of Court: two months after the end of the first-tier (court-supervised) notice period; close of non-expert discovery: six months after the end of the first-tier (court-supervised) notice period; dispositive motions: 30 days after the close of fact discovery; expert reports for party bearing the burden of proof: two months after the resolution of dispositive motions; responsive expert reports: one month after the disclosure of expert reports; close of expert discovery: three months after the resolution of dispositive motions. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 4/29/2024. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Preliminary Estimate/Budget of Amount of Fees and Expenses (atty event) Mon 04/29 9:27 AM
Preliminary Estimate/Budget of Amount of Fees and Expenses filed by William Claridge. (Griffin, Lori)
Related: [-]
minutes Case Management Conference Mon 04/29 4:05 PM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan. A telephonic Case Management Conference was held on 4/29/2024. Attorney Lori Griffin participated on behalf of the Plaintiff. Attorney Jessica MacKeigan participated on behalf of the Defendants. The parties informed the Court that they are nearing completion of a joint stipulation for notice to potential opt-in plaintiffs. The parties confirmed that initial disclosures were exchanged. The Court assigned this case to the Standard Track. The parties did not consent to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge. The parties agreed to follow the default standard for discovery of electronically stored information as set forth in Appendix K to the Courts Local Civil Rules. The parties will submit a proposed protective order. The Court will schedule a status conference to occur approximately 30 days after the close of the notice period. Both counsel indicated an interest in a referral to the assigned magistrate judge for mediation. The Court will issue the necessary referral to coincide with the parties' request that it not occur until approximately 90 days after the notice period expires. The Court set dates as stated in the Case Management Order. (Court reporter: none.) Time: 20 minutes. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
16 16 notice Report of Parties Planning Meeting (atty event) Wed 04/24 12:44 PM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by William Claridge. (Griffin, Lori)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
15 15 order Case Management Conference Scheduling Order Wed 04/03 1:26 PM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order: A telephonic Case Management Conference is set for April 29, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. The Court will host the conference call and inform counsel by way of email of the telephone number for the conference. The parties shall dial into the Court's bridge line at least five minutes prior to the hearing. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 4/3/2024. (H,AR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting,
Att: 2 Letter from Chief Judge Lioi,
Att: 3 Magistrate Consent Form,
Att: 4 Standard for Discovery of Electronically Stored Information,
Att: 5 Rule 30.1
minutes Status Conference Wed 04/03 1:12 PM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan. A telephonic status conference was held on 4/3/2024. Attorney Lori Griffin participated on behalf of the Plaintiff. Attorney Jessica MacKeigan participated on behalf of the Defendants. The parties informed the Court that they are negotiating the language of a stipulation for notice. The parties both indicated that they do not see a need for a tolling agreement at this time, though they acknowledged that this may change if they are not able to reach agreement expeditiously with respect to notice. The Court set a Case Management Conference for April 29, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. (Court Reporter: none.) Time: 15 minutes. (H,AR)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
14 14 notice Status Report (atty event) Mon 04/01 2:26 PM
Joint Status Report filed by Burntwood Tavern Brecksville, LLC, Burntwood Tavern Holdings, LLC. (MacKeigan, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
order Order Mon 03/18 1:19 PM
Order [non-document]: In light of the Sixth Circuit's ruling in Clark, et al. v. A&L Homecare, et al , 68 F.4th 1003 (6th Cir. 2023), the Court sets a telephonic status conference for April 3, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. to discuss the procedure for promptly addressing any potential Motion for Court-Approved Notice to Other Employees. Prior to the status conference, the parties are directed to meet and confer regarding: (1) whether Plaintiff intends to move for Court-Approved Notice to Other Employees and/or whether Defendant intends to stipulate to or oppose Plaintiff's proposed collective action; (2) whether Plaintiff intends to move for Court-Approved Notice to Other Employees, proposed expedited discovery dates, a proposed briefing schedule for Plaintiff's Motion for Court-Approved Notice to Other Employees, and a proposed hearing date; and (3) any other matters the parties wish to bring to the attention of the Court. The Court will host the conference call and inform counsel by way of email of the telephone number for the conference. The parties shall dial into the Court's bridge line at least five minutes prior to the scheduled conference time. The parties are ordered to file a joint status report summarizing their meet-and-confer and proposing the dates listed above no later than two (2) business days prior to the status conference. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 3/18/2024. (H,AR)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/04 12:36 PM
Answer to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses filed by Burntwood Tavern Brecksville, LLC, Burntwood Tavern Holdings, LLC. (Fusco, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
12 12 service Return of Service Unexecuted Fri 01/26 2:48 PM
Return of Service by Clerk unexecuted upon Burntwood Tavern Brecksville, LLC c/o Statutory Agent Bret Adams. Service attempted by certified mail on 1/17/24 filed on behalf of William Claridge. Related document(s)3 . (L,Br)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 01/05 3:37 PM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by William Claridge. Burntwood Tavern Brecksville, LLC waiver sent on 1/4/2024, answer due 3/4/2024 filed on behalf of William Claridge (Griffin, Lori)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 01/05 3:35 PM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by William Claridge. Burntwood Tavern Holdings, LLC waiver sent on 1/4/2024, answer due 3/4/2024 filed on behalf of William Claridge (Griffin, Lori)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
9 9 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Wed 01/03 3:06 PM
Attorney Appearance of Additional Counsel by Jessica L. MacKeigan filed by on behalf of Burntwood Tavern Brecksville, LLC, Burntwood Tavern Holdings, LLC. (MacKeigan, Jessica)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Wed 01/03 3:00 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Burntwood Tavern Brecksville, LLC. (Fusco, Mark)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Wed 01/03 2:57 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Burntwood Tavern Holdings, LLC. (Fusco, Mark)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Wed 01/03 2:52 PM
Attorney Appearance by Mark S. Fusco filed by on behalf of Burntwood Tavern Brecksville, LLC, Burntwood Tavern Holdings, LLC. (Fusco, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
5 5 service Return of Service Unexecuted Thu 12/28 2:33 PM
Return of Service by Clerk unexecuted upon Burntwood Tavern Holdings, LLC. Service attempted by certified mail. Filed on behalf of William Claridge. Related document(s)3 . (M,CE)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
oth_evt Service by Clerk Mon 11/27 12:28 PM
Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Burntwood Tavern Brecksville, LLC (7020 1290 0000 0865 1212) and Burntwood Tavern Holdings, LLC (7020 1290 0000 0865 1205) placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (S,HR)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
4 4 order Initial Order Mon 11/20 2:55 PM
Initial Standing Order signed by Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 11/20/2023. (H,AR)
Related: [-]
3 3 oth_evt Summons Issued Mon 11/20 9:42 AM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Burntwood Tavern Brecksville, LLC, Burntwood Tavern Holdings, LLC. (R,AP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
utility Add and Terminate Judge Mon 11/20 9:27 AM
Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan assigned to case. (R,AP)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Mon 11/20 9:28 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (R,AP)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
2 2 notice Notice (atty event) Fri 11/17 5:00 PM
Notice of Filing Consent Forms filed by William Claridge.(Griffin, Lori)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Allison Christman Consent Form,
Att: 2 William Claridge Consent Form,
Att: 3 Dominic Hahner Consent Form,
Att: 4 Thomas Schrenk Consent Form,
Att: 5 Valerie Steele Consent Form,
Att: 6 Daniel Tamayo Consent Form,
Att: 7 Rosailia Wagner Consent Form
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 11/17 4:57 PM
Complaint with jury demand against Burntwood Tavern Brecksville, LLC, Burntwood Tavern Holdings LLC d/b/a Burntwood Tavern. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-12280595.. Filed by William Claridge. (Griffin, Lori)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons to Burntwood Tavern Holdings d/b/a Burntwood Tavern,
Att: 3 Summons to Burntwood Tavern Brecksville, LLC