Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Sarah S Vance
Referred: Janis Van Meerveld
Case #: 2:23-cv-06939
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Nov 17, 2023
Case in other court:Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, 23-09628
Last checked: Thursday May 16, 2024 5:02 AM CDT
Defendant
Scottsdale Insurance Company
Represented By
Mark Emerson Hanna
Mouledoux Bland Legrand & Brackett LLC
contact info
Kathryn Lynn Briuglio
Mouledoux, Bland, Legrand & Brackett
contact info
Dominic John Carmello
contact info
Interested Party
Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Represented By
Francis Joseph Lobrano
Carver, Darden, Koretzky, Tessier, Finn, Blossman & Areaux
contact info
Plaintiff
Trashell Crawford
Represented By
Madison C. Pitre
Hair Shunnarah Trial Attorneys, LLC
contact info
Galen M. Hair
Hair Shunnarah Trial Attorneys, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 76 minutes ago
Thursday, January 16, 2025
11 11 21 pgs order Order Thu 01/16 3:39 PM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS: ORDER Regarding Settlement of Former MMA Cases. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/19/2024.(lag)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order Mon 12/23 10:13 AM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS: ORDERED that defendant/insurers, through counsel, immediately determine whether any of their settled Hurricane Ida cases remain on the docket of this Court and immediately file a Notice of Settlement in said case so that it can be dismissed by the District Judge. This process shall be completed in no more than 21 days of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/18/2024.(lag)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order Mon 06/24 9:27 AM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS - ORDER re Motions to Compel and Payment of Mediation Fees. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 06/17/2024.(lag)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 15, 2024
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal Mon 01/15 4:39 PM
ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal,, with Jury Demand by Scottsdale Insurance Company.(Hanna, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
7 7 30+ pgs order Order Wed 12/27 1:18 PM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Fourth Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/12/2023.(lag)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
6 6 misc Statement of Corporate Disclosure Mon 12/04 2:58 PM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Scottsdale Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Scottsdale Insurance Company (Hanna, Mark)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Compliance Mon 12/04 2:55 PM
Notice of Compliance Response to Court's 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) Directive by Scottsdale Insurance Company re1 Notice of Removal,,. (Hanna, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
4 4 1 pgs order Order Mon 11/20 1:51 PM
DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re1 Notice of Removal, filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company.(cs)
Related: [-]
3 3 30+ pgs order Order Mon 11/20 1:48 PM
HURRICANE IDA CASES Third Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 09/14/2023.(cs)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
2 2 misc Initial Case Assignment Fri 11/17 4:53 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (mb)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 11/17 4:12 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2023-09628 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10280093) filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company.Attorney Mark Emerson Hanna added to party Scottsdale Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Hanna, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Verification,
Att: 5 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice,
Att: 6 Certificate of Filing Notice of Removal,
Att: 7 State Court Notice of Removal,
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet