Tennessee Western District Court
Judge:Thomas L Parker
Referred: Annie T Christoff
Case #: 2:23-cv-02736
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Nov 17, 2023
Terminated:Feb 21, 2024
Last checked: Thursday May 16, 2024 5:20 AM CDT
Defendant
Bailey Company Realty Corporation
Defendant
Javier Michael Bailey Sr
2623 Misty Brook Lane
Cordova, TN 38016
Defendant
Angela Campbell
2727 Fall Spring Drive
Olive Branch, MS 38654
Represented By
Robert L. J. Spence, Jr
Robert L. J. Spence, Jr.
contact info
Defendant
Reva Charboneau
Bailey Company Realty Corp 3540 Summer Ave.
Memphis, TN 38122
Plaintiff
Panoply Holdings INC
623 North Willett Street
Memphis, TN 38107
Represented By
Brie Danielle Wallace
Eskins King & Marney, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Michaelantonio Rivers
623 N. Willett St.
Memphis, TN 38107
Represented By
Brie Danielle Wallace
Eskins King & Marney, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
11 11 order Judgment Wed 02/21 9:47 AM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 2/21/2024. (Parker, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 19, 2024
10 10 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 02/19 12:22 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Panoply Holdings INC, Michaelantonio Rivers. (Wallace, Brie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
9 9 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Tue 01/23 4:30 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction proposed order submitted by Angela Campbell.(Spence, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/23 3:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L. J. Spence, Jr on behalf of Angela Campbell (Spence, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
7 7 service Summons Issued Fri 11/17 3:06 PM
Summons Issued as to Bailey Company Realty Corporation, Javier Michael Bailey Sr, Angela Campbell, Reva Charboneau. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service.(jae)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 summons,
Att: 2 summons,
Att: 3 summons
6 6 notice Notice LR 72.1 - Right to Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge Fri 11/17 3:05 PM
NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice LR 16.2 Fri 11/17 3:05 PM
NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice ADR Compliance Fri 11/17 3:04 PM
NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Courtesy Notice Fri 11/17 3:03 PM
COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document1 Complaint,, filed by Panoply Holdings INC, Michaelantonio Rivers has been filed. For future reference, please note : Civil cover sheet contains wet signature of attorney. All documents filed by attorneys must contain electronic signature. Please refer to the[LINK:ECF User Manual] and[LINK:ECF Policies and Procedures] . Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 11/17 2:56 PM
Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (jae)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 11/17 2:44 PM
COMPLAINT against Bailey Company Realty Corporation, Javier Michael Bailey Sr, Angela Campbell, Reva Charboneau (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-4283119), filed by Panoply Holdings INC, Michaelantonio Rivers.(Wallace, Brie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit EX A - WARRANTY DEED,
Att: 3 Exhibit EX B - TN CORP ANNUAL REPORT FORM,
Att: 4 Exhibit EX C - PROMISSORY NOTE,
Att: 5 Exhibit EX D - NOTICE OF LOAN SECURITY,
Att: 6 Exhibit EX E - SPECIAL TRUSTEES DEED,
Att: 7 Exhibit EX F - CORRECTED SPECIAL TRUSTEES DEED,
Att: 8 Summons SUMMONS - JAVIER BAILEY,
Att: 9 Summons SUMMONS - BAILEY COMPANY REALTY CORP,
Att: 10 Summons SUMMONS - ANGELA CAMPBELL,
Att: 11 Summons SUMMONS - REVA CHARBONEAU