Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:David C Joseph
Referred: David J Ayo
Case #: 6:23-cv-01633
Nature of Suit490 Other Statutes - Cable/Sat TV
Cause47:0605 Unauthorized Publication or Use of Communications
Case Filed:Nov 17, 2023
Terminated:Jul 19, 2024
Last checked: Thursday May 16, 2024 4:48 AM CDT
Defendant
Daiq Supreme L L C
Defendant
James Opie
Plaintiff
Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Represented By
Dorothy L Tarver
Law Office Of Dorothy L Tarver
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Alfredo Diaz Del Valle
Terminated: 05/03/2024
937 Belllevue Plantation
Lafayette, LA 70503


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, July 19, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case/Party (LR41.3) Mon 07/22 9:32 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Clerk under LR41.3. Case may be reinstated within 30 days for good cause shown. Signed by Order of the Clerk on 7/19/2024. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Intent to Dismiss (Form Included) Tue 06/25 2:55 PM
NOTICE of Intent to dismiss CASE for Failure to take default 60 days after service. (crt,LaCombe, L)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension (Other) Tue 05/07 10:29 AM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Extension. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff, be and is hereby granted an extension of time, until the 5/30/2024, within which to file for a default judgement against Defendants Daiq Supreme, LLC d/b/a Daiquiris Supreme, Alfredo Diaz Del Valle, and James Opie in the above entitled and numbered suit. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 5/7/2024. (crt,Chicola, C)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
11 11 motion Extension (Other) Mon 05/06 12:09 AM
MOTION for Extension of Take Default by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. Motions referred to David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/6/2024.(aty,Tarver, Dorothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
Friday, May 03, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case/Party (LR41.3) Fri 05/03 10:45 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Clerk under LR41.3. IT IS ORDERED that this action be dismissed as to Alfredo Diaz Del Valle. Case may be reinstated within 30 days for good cause shown. Signed by Order of the Clerk on 5/3/2024. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Intent to Dismiss (Form Included) Fri 05/03 9:48 AM
NOTICE of Intent to dismiss Daiq Supreme LLC, James Opie for Failure to effect service within 90 days. (crt,LaCombe, L)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Intent to Dismiss (Form Included) Fri 04/19 1:53 PM
NOTICE of Intent to dismiss CASE for Failure to take default 60 days after service. (crt,LaCombe, L)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 16, 2023
7 7 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Sat 12/16 5:37 PM
SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Joe Hand Promotions Inc as to James Opie. (aty,Tarver, Dorothy)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Sat 12/16 5:36 PM
SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Joe Hand Promotions Inc as to Daiq Supreme L L C. (aty,Tarver, Dorothy)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Sat 12/16 5:34 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. Alfredo Diaz Del Valle served on 12/8/2023, answer due 12/29/2023. (aty,Tarver, Dorothy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 12/05 2:07 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Daiq Supreme L L C, Alfredo Diaz Del Valle, James Opie filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc.(aty,Tarver, Dorothy) Modified docket text on 12/5/2023 (Bunting, M)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued - All (Form Included) Mon 11/20 9:58 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Daiq Supreme L L C, Alfredo Diaz Del Valle, James Opie. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 11/17 8:07 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (aty,Tarver, Dorothy)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 11/17 8:06 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5766355) filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc..(Attorney Dorothy L Tarver added to party Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.(pty:pla))(aty,Tarver, Dorothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed summons/writ Summons-Alfredo Del Valle,
Att: 3 Proposed summons/writ Summons-Daiquiris Supreme,
Att: 4 Proposed summons/writ Summons-James Opie
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 11/20 9:24 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge David C Joseph and Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]