Florida Middle District Court
Case #: 3:23-cr-00153
Case Filed:Nov 15, 2023
Terminated:Jun 25, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 18, 2023 5:11 AM EST
Defendant
Nicole Danielle Devilbiss (1)
Represented By
Kathryn E Sheldon
Federal Defender'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Ashley Washington
Us Attorney'S Office - Flm
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/28/2025 8:38 PM EDT
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
Arrest of Nicole Danielle Devilbiss on 10/31/2023. (NK) [3:23-mj-01520-LLL]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Nicole Danielle Devilbiss(1). (NK) [3:23-mj-01520-LLL]
Related: [-]
7 7 MINUTE Entry for In Person proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert: Initial Appearance as to Nicole Danielle Devilbiss held on 10/31/2023. (DIGITAL) (NK) [3:23-mj-01520-LLL]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORAL MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Nicole Danielle Devilbiss. (NK) [3:23-mj-01520-LLL]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORAL MOTION for Detention by USA as to Nicole Danielle Devilbiss. (NK) [3:23-mj-01520-LLL]
Related: [-]
10 10 ***CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Nicole Danielle Devilbiss (filed in open court). (NK) [3:23-mj-01520-LLL]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORAL MOTION to Continue Detention Hearing by Nicole Danielle Devilbiss. (NK) [3:23-mj-01520-LLL]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
3 3 ORDER suspending Local Rule 7.02(a) for the limited purpose of allowing Anne Schindler to bring a laptop into the building on 11/1/2023 for the detention hearing at 1:00 in courtroom 5B. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 11/1/2023. (ASL) [3:23-mj-01520-LLL]
Related: [-]
14 14 MINUTE entry for the in person proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale: DETENTION HEARING as to Nicole Danielle Devilbiss held on 11/1/2023. (digital) (ASL) [3:23-mj-01520-LLL]
Related: [-]
15 15 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Nicole Danielle Devilbiss. The detention hearing is scheduled for 11/2/2023 at 03:00 PM in Jacksonville Courtroom 5B before Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 11/1/2023. (ASL) [3:23-mj-01520-LLL]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
4 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kathryn E Sheldon appearing for Nicole Danielle Devilbiss (Sheldon, Kathryn) [3:23-mj-01520-LLL]
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE of Filing Memorandum in Support of Release on Bail by Nicole Danielle Devilbiss (Sheldon, Kathryn) Modified on 11/2/2023 (SPM). [3:23-mj-01520-LLL]
Related: [-]
6 6 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Supplemental Briefing in Support of Detention by USA as to Nicole Danielle Devilbiss. (Washington, Ashley) Modified on 11/2/2023 (SPM). [3:23-mj-01520-LLL]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER (granting 8 ORAL Motion to Appoint Counsel) as to Nicole Danielle Devilbiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert on 11/2/2023. (NK) [3:23-mj-01520-LLL]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION (granting 11 ORAL Motion to Continue Detention Hearing) as to Nicole Danielle Devilbiss. Detention Hearing set for 11/1/2023 at 01:00 PM in Jacksonville Courtroom 5B before Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert on 11/2/2023. (NK) [3:23-mj-01520-LLL]
Related: [-]
16 16 MINUTE entry for the in person proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale: DETENTION HEARING as to Nicole Danielle Devilbiss held on 11/2/2023. (digital) (ASL) [3:23-mj-01520-LLL]
Related: [-]
17 17 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release (CONDITIONS HAVE NOT BEEN MET). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 11/2/2023. (ASL) [3:23-mj-01520-LLL]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
20 20 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Nicole Danielle Devilbiss: Preliminary Hearing set for 11/14/2023 at 03:00 PM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12A before Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert. (NK) [3:23-mj-01520-LLL]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
21 21 MINUTE Entry for In Person proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert: Preliminary Hearing as to Nicole Danielle Devilbiss held on 11/14/2023. (DIGITAL) (NK) (NK). [3:23-mj-01520-LLL]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (11/15/2023) Government Exhibit List,
Att: 2 (11/15/2023) Government Exhibit 1
22 22 ORDER Finding Probable Cause as to Nicole Danielle Devilbiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert on 11/14/2023. (NK) [3:23-mj-01520-LLL]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
23 23 INDICTMENT returned in open court as to Nicole Danielle Devilbiss (1) count(s) 1. (BD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Restricted Unredacted Indictment