Tennessee Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:23-cr-00127
Case Filed:Oct 20, 2023
Terminated:Oct 20, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Nov 19, 2023 2:24 AM EST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Donald W Taylor
U S Department Of Justice (usao Greene)
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Brandin Travis Hyde (1)
Terminated: 10/20/2023


Docket last updated: 11/19/2023 3:32 AM EST
Friday, October 20, 2023
1 1 TRANSFER OF JURISDICTION for Supervision of Releasee Brandin Travis Hyde.. (LCK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 WDVA - Indictment,
Att: 2 WDVA - Amended Judgment,
Att: 3 WDVA - Docket Sheet