Saukville Municipal Water Utility v. The 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-05777 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Nov 09, 2023 |
Case in other court: | New York Southern, 7:23-cv-08682 |
Last checked: Tuesday May 07, 2024 5:44 AM EDT |
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
The 3M Company
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
E. I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1-20
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
as successor in interest to Sandoz Chemical Corporation 4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
as successor in interest to Ciba Inc. 100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma U.S. Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Plaintiff
Saukville Municipal Water Utility
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 29, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by BASF Corporation.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Holian, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, April 25, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice between Plaintiffs and Tyco, Chemguard, ChemDesign, and Released Parties by Tyco Fire Products LP.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Dukes, David) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by The 3M Company, 3M Company, The, 3M Company, The 3M Company, The 3M Company, 3M Company, The 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co). List of cases for dismissal)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Bulger, Richard) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, November 27, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Sunday, November 19, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 7:23-cv-08682. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Friday, November 17, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Sun 11/19 2:56 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern (associated as of 11/9/2023), 7:23-cv-08682, Saukville Municipal Water Utility v. The 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-05777-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
Thursday, November 09, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina.(vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/19/2023.] | ||
Wednesday, October 04, 2023 | ||
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/19/2023.] | ||
Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/19/2023.] | ||
Case Designated ECF. (vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 11/19/2023.] | ||
Tuesday, October 03, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |