Nyvchik et al v. United States of America et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-05876 |
Nature of Suit | 240 Real Property - Torts to Land |
Cause | 42:6901 Environmental Cleanup Expenses |
Case Filed: | Nov 15, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Washington Eastern, 2:23-cv-00313 |
Last checked: Monday May 13, 2024 4:50 AM EDT |
Defendant
Department of the Air Force
|
|
Defendant
Fairchild Air Force Base
|
|
Defendant
United States of America
|
|
Plaintiff
Nikolay Nyvchik
103 E Indiana Ave Suite A
Spokane, WA 99207 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Valentina Nyvchik
103 E Indiana Ave Suite a
Spokane, WA 99207 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Sunday, November 19, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Case transferred in from District of Washington Eastern; Case Number 2:23-cv-00313. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Friday, November 17, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice Other
Sun 11/19 4:02 PM
NOTICE TO NEW COUNSEL : MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) is open as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. All counsel of record are directed to take the steps necessary to be registered as electronic filers in the District of South Carolina ( See CMO No. 3 pg. 17 Electronic Filing at 22. footnote 5 (ECF Multidistrict Litigation Attorney Registration Form - available at link at the end of this NOTICE). CMO Nos. 1 - 27, (including any supplemental CMO Nos. i.e., 2.A, etc.) govern all cases in the MDL proceedings and can be viewed in the Lead case. Counsel will be notified by Liaison Counsel re new Case Management Orders and other new documents posted in the lead case. Please also read CLERKS NOTICE (s) TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 and QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE (s) filed in the Lead case. NOTICE of Hearing: Next Monthly Status Conference TBD. See the District Court's website containing information on the MDL at[LINK:MDL-2873] (sshe, ) (Entered: 11/19/2023) |
|
8 | 8
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Sun 11/19 3:53 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Washington Eastern (associated as of 11/15/2023), 2:23-cv-00313, Nyvchik et al v. United States of America et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-05876-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
Monday, October 30, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Notice of Judge Assignment. Magistrate Judge James A. Goeke assigned to case. (REM, Case Administrator) [Transferred from Washington Eastern on 11/19/2023.] |