Maryland District Court
Case #: 1:23-cr-00293
Case Filed:Aug 22, 2023
Last checked: Monday Nov 20, 2023 2:19 AM EST
Defendant
Brandon Isaiah Parker (1)
Represented By
Joseph Murtha
Rice, Murtha & Psoras, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jason Daniel Medinger
Office Of The United States Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/20/2023 2:22 AM EST
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
1 1 INDICTMENT as to Brandon Isaiah Parker (1) count(s) 1, 2-3. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION to Seal Indictment by USA as to Brandon Isaiah Parker. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER granting4 the Government's Motion to Seal Indictment as to Brandon Isaiah Parker (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 8/22/2023. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]