California Central District Court
Judge:Michael W Fitzgerald
Referred: Brianna Fuller Mircheff
Case #: 2:23-cv-09698
Nature of Suit371 Torts - Personal Property - Truth in Lending
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Nov 10, 2023
Terminated:Sep 18, 2024
Last checked: Saturday May 11, 2024 2:37 AM PDT
Defendant
Bank of America N.A.
Represented By
Austin Benjamin Kenney
Severson And Werson Apc
contact info
Abinaya Prabakar
Severson And Werson
contact info
Joel Christopher Spann
Severson And Werson Apc
contact info
Plaintiff
Lin Hui Chen
Private woman and Agent 19801 Mariposa Pines Way
Northridge, CA 91326
Represented By
Safora Nowrouzi
Vortex Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
27 27 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Thu 09/19 4:08 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The action is DISMISSED without prejudice. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
26 26 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 08/13 8:33 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. Failure to respond to the Order to Show Cause by AUGUST 26, 2024, will result in the dismissal of this action. (iv)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
25 25 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Mon 04/29 4:00 PM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Plaintiffs amending Amended Complaint8 , filed by Plaintiff Lin Hui Chen(Nowrouzi, Safora)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
24 24 order Leave to File Document Fri 04/19 11:34 AM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION RE: FILING OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND RESPONSIVE PLEADING DEADLINE; ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT17 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Plaintiff is granted leave to electronically file a Second Amended Complaint within ten (10) days of entry of this Order. (iv)
Related: [-]
23 23 stip Leave Thu 04/18 2:01 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Bank of America N.A..(Prabakar, Abinaya)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Wed 04/17 2:10 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Abinaya Prabakar counsel for Defendant Bank of America N.A.. Adding Abinaya Prabakar as counsel of record for BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. (erroneously sued as BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. c/o NBS DEFAULT SERVICES, LLC,) for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Bank of America, N.A.. (Attorney Abinaya Prabakar added to party Bank of America N.A.(pty:dft))(Prabakar, Abinaya)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
21 21 misc Declaration Wed 03/27 11:14 AM
DECLARATION of Safora Nowrouzi, Esq. re Order to Show Cause,16 filed by Plaintiff Lin Hui Chen.(Nowrouzi, Safora)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Waiver of Service of Summons
20 20 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 03/27 10:53 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Lin Hui Chen. upon Bank of America N.A. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/20/2024, answer due 4/22/2024. Waiver of Service signed by Abinaya Prabakar. (Nowrouzi, Safora)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
19 19 respm Motion Related Document Mon 03/25 3:07 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint 17 [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Plaintiff Lin Hui Chen. (Nowrouzi, Safora)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
18 18 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Fri 03/22 10:19 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Motion for Leave17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
17 17 motion Leave to File Document Thu 03/21 9:56 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Lin Hui Chen. Motion set for hearing on 4/29/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Nowrouzi, Safora)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law
Thursday, March 14, 2024
16 16 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 03/15 8:20 AM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. Failure to respond to the Order to Show Cause by MARCH 29, 2024, will result in the dismissal of this action. (iv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
15 15 misc Miscellaneous Document Thu 02/08 5:14 PM
Notice of withdrawal of Ex Parte filed by Plaintiff Lin Hui Chen re: First EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to TO ENJOIN DEFENDANT FROM SELLING PLAINTIFFS PROPERTY PURSUANT TO A TRUSTEES SALE SET FOR February 13, 2024 13 , Text Only Scheduling Notice,,,, 14 (Nowrouzi, Safora)
Related: [-]
14 14 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 02/08 2:03 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE and ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Court has received Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for (1) a Temporary Restraining Order, and (2) an Order to Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction13 (the "EPA"). As set forth in the Court's procedures, ex parte applications are considered on the papers and are not usually set for hearing. Therefore, Plaintiff's request for a hearing on 2/9/2024 is DENIED. Defendant shall file Opposition to the EPA for a Temporary Restraining Order no later than 5:00 p.m. on 2/9/2024. Alternatively, the parties may stipulate to a Temporary Restraining Order through 2/23/2024, including a briefing schedule to allow the parties additional time to fully brief the Order to Show Cause. Although Defendant has not entered an appearance, the Court has received email from attorney Shannon Williams (shannon.williams@bonialpc.com) on behalf of Defendant; that attorney will be copied when this Order is docketed. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smom)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
13 13 motion Temporary Restraining Order Wed 02/07 10:19 PM
First EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to TO ENJOIN DEFENDANT FROM SELLING PLAINTIFFS PROPERTY PURSUANT TO A TRUSTEES SALE SET FOR February 13, 2024 filed by plaintiff Lin Hui Chen. (Attorney Safora Nowrouzi added to party Lin Hui Chen(pty:pla)) (Nowrouzi, Safora)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Plaintiff,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Safora Nowrouzi,
Att: 3 Declaration Declaration of Telephonic Notice,
Att: 4 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
12 12 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 01/18 11:59 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lin Hui Chen, upon Defendant Bank of America N.A. served on 1/16/2024, answer due 2/6/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Cherrae Stringfield in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (iv)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
11 11 notice Clerical Error (G-11) Mon 01/08 3:48 PM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Corrected Complaint10 . Late docketing due to clerical error. The filer submitted a corrected (signed) First Amended Complaint on November 27, 2023. The corrected FAC is now on the docket as entry number 10. (iv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
9 9 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Thu 11/30 11:02 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: Amended Complaint8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 11-3.8 title page is missing, incomplete, or incorrect. Document lacks required signature. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (iv)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
10 10 misc Errata Mon 01/08 3:08 PM
CORRECTED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Lin Hui Chen correcting Amended Complaint8 [Late Docketing Due to Clerk's Office Error]. (iv)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 26, 2023
8 8 othcmp Amended Complaint Thu 11/30 11:00 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending Complaint - (Discovery),1 , filed by Plaintiff Lin Hui Chen. (iv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
7 7 9 pgs order Order Tue 11/21 8:45 PM
SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 19, 2023
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Sun 11/19 9:12 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Sun 11/19 9:11 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Sun 11/19 9:11 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. (sh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Sun 11/19 9:10 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),1 as to Defendant Bank of America N.A.. (sh)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 10, 2023
2 2 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Sun 11/19 9:08 AM
Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Lin Hui Chen, (sh)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Sun 11/19 9:07 AM
COMPLAINT against Defendant Bank of America N.A..Case assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff.(Filing fee $ 402 FEE PAID), filed by Plaintiff Lin Hui Chen. (sh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet