Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Solomon Oliver, Jr
Case #: 1:23-cv-02243
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2023
Terminated:Jul 26, 2024
Last checked: Saturday May 18, 2024 5:07 AM EDT
Defendant
Alexander Mann Solutions Corporation
Represented By
Mackenzie L. Rini
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff
contact info
Johanna Fabrizio Parker
Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff - Cleveland
contact info
Plaintiff
Deidra Ellington
Represented By
Sharon K. Cason-Adams
Agee, Clymer, Mitchell & Portman - Columbus
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, July 26, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 07/26 11:32 AM
Stipulation and Order of Case Dismissal, with prejudice. Each party to pay its own fees, costs and any other litigation expenses. Related documet16 . Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 7/26/2024. (R,Sh)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Dismissal Fri 07/26 9:55 AM
Joint Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) with prejudice filed by Alexander Mann Solutions Corporation. (Parker, Johanna)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
minutes ~Util - Terminate Referral 1 - Terminate Hearings Order Wed 07/03 11:24 AM
Order [non-document] The parties have informed the Court they have reached a settlement agreement. Plaintiff shall file a dismissal with prejudice by close of business (5:00 p.m.) on September 3, 2024. The mediation scheduled for July 10, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. is cancelled. Referral terminated. Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 7/3/24. (D,Ky)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
15 15 order Protective Order Thu 05/23 1:36 PM
Stipulated Protective Order regarding confidential documents. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 5/23/2024. (R,Sh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
14 14 oth_doc Proposed Order Tue 05/14 11:05 AM
Proposed Order filed by Alexander Mann Solutions Corporation. (Parker, Johanna)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
13 13 4 pgs order Order Fri 03/22 9:21 AM
Order scheduling mediation conference to be held on 7/10/2024 at 10:00 AM in Chambers 10B before Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. Confidential mediation statements are due to chambers by 7/3/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 3/22/24. (D,Ky)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
12 12 minutes ~Util - Case Referred to Judicial Officer for Mediation or Settlement Minute Order _ Case Management Conference Thu 03/21 12:17 PM
Minute Order of Case Management Conference held on 3/19/2024. Case is assigned to the standard track. Parties to be Joined and Pleading Amendments due by 5/3/2024. The cut-off date for discovery is 12/8/2024. Dispositive Motions are due by 2/7/2025. The court hereby refers the case to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg to conduct a mediation session as soon as possible after 7/1/2024. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 3/21/2024. Time: 1 hour. (M,CE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
11 11 notice Report of Parties Planning Meeting (atty event) Thu 03/14 4:39 PM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Deidra Ellington. (Cason-Adams, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
10 10 oth_evt Magistrate Consent Package Issued by Courtroom Deputy Thu 02/29 2:51 PM
Magistrate Consent Package issued. (R,Sh)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Case Management Conference Scheduling Order Thu 02/29 2:50 PM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 3/19/2024 at 11:30 PM telephonically before Judge Solomon Oliver Jr. Dial-in information will be issued separately. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 2/29/2024. (R,Sh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
8 8 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 02/22 11:29 AM
Answer to6 Amended complaint, and Affirmative Defenses filed by Alexander Mann Solutions Corporation. (Parker, Johanna)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
7 7 motion Extension (answer complaint) Fri 01/26 10:59 AM
Unopposed Motion for extension of time until February 22, 2024 to answer Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Alexander Mann Solutions Corporation. Related document(s)6 . (Parker, Johanna)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for extension of time to answer Fri 01/26 1:48 PM
Order [non-document] granting Defendant's7 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until February 22, 2024 to answer Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Alexander Mann Solutions Corporation answer due 2/22/2024. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 1/26/2024.(R,Sh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 01/18 4:00 PM
First Amended complaint against Alexander Mann Solutions Corporation. Filed by Deidra Ellington. (Cason-Adams, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - OCRC Ltr of Determ, Ntc of RTS, Withdrawal,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - EEOC Notice of Right to Sue 8-23-23
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
5 5 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Wed 01/10 2:11 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Alexander Mann Solutions Corporation. (Parker, Johanna)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 01/10 2:10 PM
Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Defendant Alexander Mann Solutions Corporation. Related document(s)1 .(Parker, Johanna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 11/21 2:51 PM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Deidra Ellington. Alexander Mann Solutions Corporation waiver sent on 11/20/2023, answer due 1/19/2024 filed on behalf of Deidra Ellington (Cason-Adams, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
2 2 oth_evt Magistrate Consent Form Issued by Intake Mon 11/20 10:17 AM
Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided, no summons issued. (R,AP)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 11/20 9:54 AM
Complaint with jury demand against Alexander Mann Solutions Corporation. Filing fee paid, $402.00. Receipt number AOHNDC-12281430. Filed by Deidra Ellington. (Cason-Adams, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judge Mon 11/20 10:14 AM
Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. assigned to case. (R,AP)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Mon 11/20 10:16 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (R,AP)
Related: [-]