Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Michael H Watson
Referred: Chelsey M Vascura
Case #: 2:23-cv-03875
Nature of Suit448 Civil Rights - Education
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2023
Terminated:Mar 20, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 18, 2024 8:50 AM EDT
Defendant
Timothy Ryan Edwards
Individually and as former Principal of River Valley High School 2590 State Route 141
Gallipolis, OH 45631
Represented By
Trista Mara Turley
Isaac Wiles & Burkholder, LLC
contact info
Aaron Michael Glasgow
Isaac Wiles & Burkholder, LLC
contact info
Scott Oliver Sheets
Isaac Wiles & Burkholder LLC
contact info
Defendant
Gallia County Local Schools Board of Education
4836 State Route 325
Patriot, OH 45658
Represented By
Trista Mara Turley
Isaac Wiles & Burkholder, LLC
contact info
Aaron Michael Glasgow
Isaac Wiles & Burkholder, LLC
contact info
Scott Oliver Sheets
Isaac Wiles & Burkholder LLC
contact info
Defendant
Matthew Huck
Individually and as Teacher and Wrestling Coach at River Valley High School 1789 Addison Pike
Gallipolis, OH 45631
Represented By
Matthew Stephen Teetor
Teetor Westfall, LLC
contact info
Sky Pettey
Lavelle And Associates
contact info
Richard A Williams
Williams & Schoenberger Co., LLC
contact info
Susan Sheryl Petro
Williams & Schoenberger Co., LLC
contact info
John Philip Lavelle
contact info
Defendant
Michal Paige Huck
Individually and as former Teacher and Cheerleading Coach at River Valley High School 42B Hawthorn Lane
Bidwell, OH 45614
Defendant
James Michael Jacobs
Individually and as former Principal of River Valley High School 413 Buckthorne Drive
Lexington, SC 29072
Represented By
Trista Mara Turley
Isaac Wiles & Burkholder, LLC
contact info
Aaron Michael Glasgow
Isaac Wiles & Burkholder, LLC
contact info
Scott Oliver Sheets
Isaac Wiles & Burkholder LLC
contact info
Defendant
Jude Meyers
Individually and as former Superintendent of Gallia County Local Schools 229 Payne Road
Bidwell, OH 45614
Represented By
Trista Mara Turley
Isaac Wiles & Burkholder, LLC
contact info
Aaron Michael Glasgow
Isaac Wiles & Burkholder, LLC
contact info
Scott Oliver Sheets
Isaac Wiles & Burkholder LLC
contact info
Defendant
Otho Edward Moore
Individually and as former Administrator and/or Acting Principal of River Valley High School 2600 Addison Pike
Gallipolis, OH 45631
Represented By
Trista Mara Turley
Isaac Wiles & Burkholder, LLC
contact info
Aaron Michael Glasgow
Isaac Wiles & Burkholder, LLC
contact info
Scott Oliver Sheets
Isaac Wiles & Burkholder LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
John Doe
1 Leeseberg Tuttle 175 South Third Street Penthouse 1
Columbus, OH 43215
Represented By
Mark Anthony Weiker
Abdnour Weiker, LLP
contact info
Jessica Nicole Moore
Albeit Weiker, LLP
contact info
John Anthony Markus
Leeseberg & Valentine
contact info
Craig S Tuttle
Leeseberg Tuttle, Lpa
contact info

GPO Feb 26 2024
OPINION and ORDER - The Court sua-sponte CONSOLIDATES cases 2:23cv3875, 2:23cv3927, 2:23cv4008, 2:23cv4103, 2:24cv79 and 2:24cv184. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 2/26/2024. (jk)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, March 20, 2025
64 64 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 03/20 2:53 PM
Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 3/20/2025. (jk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
63 63 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 03/19 2:28 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff John Doe. (Tuttle, Craig)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
62 62 1 pgs order Order Fri 03/14 3:16 PM
ORDER - This matter is before the Court on Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (ECF No.61 .) Therein, Plaintiff attempts to dismiss his case under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A). (Id.) Because Defendants have filed answers (see ECF Nos.14 ,15 ) dismissal must be obtained via stipulation signed by all parties who have appeared under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) or via motion under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2). Accordingly, the Court STRIKES Plaintiffs Notice (ECF No.61 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 3/14/2025. (agm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
61 61 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 03/13 2:54 PM
***STRICKEN pursuant to ECF No. 62 Order*** NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff John Doe (Tuttle, Craig) Modified docket text on 3/14/2025 (agm)
Related: [-]
60 60 1 pgs order Order Thu 03/13 11:19 AM
ORDER - The parties reported on March 12, 2025, that they have reached a settlement in principle. The parties are ORDERED to file a joint written REPORT detailing the status of this case ON OR BEFORE APRIL 12, 2025, unless they have filed a dismissal entry in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A) in the interim. Status Report due by 4/12/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 3/13/2025. (agm)
Related: [-]