Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-11352

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Klinette H Kindred
Case #: 1:23-ap-01065
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2023
Terminated:Sep 24, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Skin Logic, LLC
2 Pidgeon Hill Drive Suite 100
Sterling, VA 20165
Represented By
Skin Logic, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Harry Kamin, individually and derivatively on behalf of BNG Group LLC
Bethune Benes, PLLC c/o Bethany Benes, Esq. 3975 Fair Ridge Drive, South Bldg Suite 246
Fairfax, VA 22033
Represented By
Tracey Michelle Ohm
Stinson LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
29 29 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Tue 09/24 11:08 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
28 28 court Pre-Trial Conference Held Tue 09/03 1:38 PM
Pre-Trial Conference Held; Removed as Moot; Adversary Dismissed Related [+] Appearances: Bethany R Benes, Maurice Belmont VerStandig (DaynaMace)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Harry Kamin
27 27 misc Stipulation Tue 09/03 9:39 AM
Plaintiff's Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding By Harry Kamin and Between Defendant Skin Logic, LLC Related [+] filed by Tracey Michelle Ohm of Stinson LLP on behalf of Harry Kamin. (Ohm, Tracey)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Harry Kamin,25 Answer to Complaint filed by Skin Logic, LLC
Friday, March 22, 2024
26 26 court BNC certificate of mailing of order Sat 03/23 12:15 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)24 Order Continuing/Rescheduling/Setting Hearing
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
25 25 answer None Wed 03/20 8:38 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Maurice Belmont VerStandig of The VerStandig Law Firm, LLC on behalf of Skin Logic, LLC. (VerStandig, Maurice)
Related: [-] 1
24 24 order Continuing/Rescheduling/Setting Hearing Wed 03/20 7:59 AM
Order Setting Final Pre-Trial Related [+] Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 9/3/2024 at 11:00 AM at Judge Kindred's Courtroom, 200 S. Washington Street, 3rd Floor, Courtroom III, Alexandria, VA. (Baumgartner, Cindy)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Harry Kamin
Thursday, March 14, 2024
23 23 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 03/14 11:08 AM
Order Denying Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+] (Ramirez-Lowe, Suzan)
Related: [-] 5
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
22 22 court Hearing held; motion denied. Tue 03/05 1:46 PM
Hearing held; Motion Denied; Order to be Submitted . Related [+] Appearances: Bethany R Benes, Tracey Michelle Ohm, Maurice Belmont VerStandig Order/Disposition due by 03/19/2024. (DaynaMace)
Related: [-] 5 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Skin Logic, LLC
21 21 court Hearing held; final hearing set Tue 03/05 1:45 PM
Pre-Trial Conference Held; Final Pre-Trial Conference Set; Court to Prepare Order Related [+] Appearances: Bethany R Benes, Tracey Michelle Ohm, Maurice Belmont VerStandig Final Pre-Trial Conference Set for 09/03/2024 at 11:00 AM at Judge Kindred's Courtroom, 200 S. Washington Street, 3rd Floor, Courtroom III, Alexandria, VA. (DaynaMace)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Harry Kamin
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
20 20 answer Response Wed 02/28 8:24 AM
Response to Related [+] filed by Angela L. Shortall on behalf of Angela L. Shortall. (Shortall, Angela)
Related: [-] related document(s)5 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Skin Logic, LLC
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
19 19 court Hearing continued Tue 02/20 1:47 PM
Hearing continued; Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 03/05/2024 at 11:00 AM at Judge Kindred's Courtroom, 200 S. Washington Street, 3rd Floor, Courtroom III, Alexandria, VA. (DaynaMace)
Related: [-] 5 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Skin Logic, LLC
18 18 court Pre-Trial Conference Continued Tue 02/20 1:46 PM
Pre-Trial Conference Continued; Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 03/05/2024 at 11:00 AM at Judge Kindred's Courtroom, 200 S. Washington Street, 3rd Floor, Courtroom III, Alexandria, VA, (DaynaMace)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Harry Kamin
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
17 17 order Continuing/Rescheduling/Setting Hearing Tue 02/13 8:47 AM
Order Continuing Pre-Trial Conference and Motion to Dismiss Related [+] Initial Pretrial Conference and Motion to Dismiss Hearing scheduled for 3/5/2024 at 11:00 AM at Judge Kindred's Courtroom, 200 S. Washington Street, 3rd Floor, Courtroom III, Alexandria, VA. (Baumgartner, Cindy)
Related: [-] related document(s)5 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Skin Logic, LLC,12 Order Cancelling/Continuing/Rescheduling/Setting Pre-Trial Conference
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Motion (if setting a hearing, do not use) Tue 02/06 11:45 AM
Notice of Motion Related [+] filed by Tracey Michelle Ohm of Stinson LLP on behalf of Harry Kamin. (Ohm, Tracey)
Related: [-] related document(s)15 Motion to Continue filed by Harry Kamin
15 15 motion Continue Tue 02/06 11:44 AM
Motion to Continue Related [+] filed by Tracey Michelle Ohm of Stinson LLP on behalf of Harry Kamin. (Ohm, Tracey)
Related: [-] related document(s)5 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Skin Logic, LLC,6 Notice of Hearing filed by Skin Logic, LLC,7 Objection to Motion/Application filed by Harry Kamin,12 Order Cancelling/Continuing/Rescheduling/Setting Pre-Trial Conference, 14 Pre-Trial Conference Continued
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
14 14 court Pre-Trial Conference Continued Tue 01/30 11:25 AM
Pre-Trial Conference Continued; Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 02/20/2024 at 11:00 AM at Judge Kindred's Courtroom, 200 S. Washington Street, 3rd Floor, Courtroom III, Alexandria, VA, (DaynaMace)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Harry Kamin
Monday, January 29, 2024
13 13 court Entry Modification Made: See entry Mon 01/29 12:06 PM
Entry Modification Made replaced order PDF with a locked version: See entry Related [+] (Sheridan, Michelle)
Related: [-] related document(s)12 Order Cancelling/Continuing/Rescheduling/Setting Pre-Trial Conference
12 12 order Cancelling/Continuing/Rescheduling/Setting Pre-Trial Conference Mon 01/29 11:18 AM
Order Continuing Pre-Trial Conference; Pre-Trial Conference set for 2/20/2024 at 11:00 AM at Judge Kindred's Courtroom, 200 S. Washington Street, 3rd Floor, Courtroom III, Alexandria, VA, (Mace, Dayna) Modified on 1/29/2024 replaced order PDF with a locked version. (Sheridan, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Fri 01/26 5:42 PM
Certificate of Service of Initial Scheduling Order Related [+] filed by Tracey Michelle Ohm of Stinson LLP on behalf of Harry Kamin. (Ohm, Tracey)
Related: [-] related document(s)9 Order Directing
Thursday, January 25, 2024
10 10 court BNC certificate of mailing of order Fri 01/26 12:19 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)9 Order Directing
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
9 9 order Directing Tue 01/23 2:04 PM
Initial Scheduling Order Related [+] (Baumgartner, Cindy)
Related: [-] related document(s)3 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
8 8 court Hearing rescheduled Tue 01/16 11:05 AM
Hearing Rescheduled Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 01/30/2024 at 11:00 AM at Judge Kindred's Courtroom, 200 S. Washington Street, 3rd Floor, Courtroom III, Alexandria, VA. (DaynaMace)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Harry Kamin
Thursday, January 11, 2024
7 7 answer Objection Thu 01/11 2:47 PM
Objection to Motion to Dismiss Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Related [+] filed by Tracey Michelle Ohm of Stinson LLP on behalf of Harry Kamin. (Ohm, Tracey)
Related: [-] related document(s)5 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Skin Logic, LLC
Thursday, December 21, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 12/21 9:30 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] filed by Maurice Belmont VerStandig of The VerStandig Law Firm, LLC on behalf of Skin Logic, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 2/20/2024 at 11:00 AM at Judge Kindred's Courtroom, 200 S. Washington Street, 3rd Floor, Courtroom III, Alexandria, VA. (VerStandig, Maurice)
Related: [-] related document(s)5 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Skin Logic, LLC
5 5 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 12/21 9:29 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+] filed by Maurice Belmont VerStandig of The VerStandig Law Firm, LLC on behalf of Skin Logic, LLC. (VerStandig, Maurice)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Harry Kamin
Monday, November 27, 2023
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Mon 11/27 12:09 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Related [+] filed by Tracey Michelle Ohm of Stinson LLP on behalf of Harry Kamin. (Ohm, Tracey)
Related: [-] related document(s)3 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
3 3 summon Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Tue 11/21 10:58 AM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference. Summons Issued to Skin Logic, LLC Answer Due 12/21/2023 Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/16/2024 at 11:00 AM at Judge Kindred's Courtroom, 200 S. Washington Street, 3rd Floor, Courtroom III, Alexandria, VA, (Baumgartner, Cindy)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Harry Kamin
Monday, November 20, 2023
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 11/20 9:50 AM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint([LINK 23-01065 KHK] ) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A35778391, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Mon 11/20 9:46 AM
Adversary case 23-01065 Complaint against Skin Logic, LLC filed by Harry Kamin. Nature of Suit: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)), (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)), (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 1:23-bk-11352 (Ohm, Tracey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) 2
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) 3
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) 4
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) 5
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) 6
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) 7
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) 8
Att: 9 Exhibit(s) 9
Att: 10 Exhibit(s) 10
Att: 11 Exhibit(s) 11
Att: 12 Exhibit(s) 12
Att: 13 Exhibit(s) 13
Att: 14 Exhibit(s) 14
Att: 15 Exhibit(s) 15
Att: 16 Exhibit(s) 16
Att: 17 Exhibit(s) 17
Att: 18 Exhibit(s) 18
Att: 19 Exhibit(s) 19
Att: 20 Exhibit(s) 20
Att: 21 Exhibit(s) 21
Att: 22 Exhibit(s) 22
Att: 23 Exhibit(s) 23
Att: 24 Exhibit(s) 24
Att: 25 Exhibit(s) 25
Att: 26 Exhibit(s) 26
Att: 27 Exhibit(s) 27
Att: 28 Exhibit(s) 28
Att: 29 Exhibit(s) 29