Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Mary S Scriven
Referred: Anthony E Porcelli
Case #: 8:23-cv-02649
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2023
Terminated:Aug 09, 2024
Case in other court:Circuit Court of Sixth Judicial Circuit, 2023CA004038CAAXEX
Last checked: Saturday May 18, 2024 7:54 AM EDT
Defendant
East Pasco Materials, LLC
Represented By
Colin G. Bell
contact info
Colin Geoffrey Bell
Hankin Sandman Palladino Weintrob & Bell
contact info
John F. Palladino
Hankin Sandman Palladino & Weintrob
contact info
Mediator
Travis R. Hollifield
Represented By
Travis R. Hollifield
Hollifield Legal Centre
contact info
Plaintiff
Virgil Bolds
Represented By
Nikole Miller
Wenzel Fenton Cabassa, P.A.
contact info
Amanda E. Heystek
Wenzel Fenton Cabassa, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, August 12, 2024
29 29 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 08/12 2:53 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LSS)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
28 28 order Order Dismissing Case Fri 08/09 3:30 PM
ENDORSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL. It is ORDERED that, pursuant to Rule 3.09(b) of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida, and upon review of 27 Plaintiff's Notice of Settlement, this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, subject to the right of the settling Parties, within sixty (60) calendar days from the date of this Order, to submit a final stipulation of dismissal, should they so choose, or for any party to reopen the case, upon good cause shown. After the sixty (60)-day period, the dismissal shall be with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/9/2024. (KBC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
27 27 notice Notice of settlement Thu 08/08 9:16 AM
NOTICE of settlement by Virgil Bolds (Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
26 26 order Case Management Scheduling Order Thu 06/27 2:08 PM
AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial statement due by 3/14/2025. Jury Trial set on the MAY 2025 Trial Term, which commences 5/5/2025, with a more precise trial date to follow. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 6/27/2024. (KBC)
Related: [-]
utility Set/reset scheduling order deadlines - PUBLIC Fri 06/28 9:28 AM
Set scheduling order deadlines: Discovery due by 10/4/2024 Dispositive motions due by 11/1/2024 Pretrial statement due by 3/14/2025 All other motions due by 3/21/2025 (AJS)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
25 25 service Waiver of service executed Mon 06/24 4:36 PM
WAIVER of service returned executed on June 24, 2024 by Virgil Bolds as to Asphalt Paving Systems, Inc.. (Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 06/24 3:17 PM
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING 21 the Parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time of Discovery Deadline for Sixty Days. An amended case management and scheduling order will be issued via separate notice. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 6/24/2024. (KBC)
Related: [-]
23 23 service Summons issued Mon 06/24 10:27 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Asphalt Paving Systems, Inc. (JOS)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
22 22 adr Mediation report Fri 06/21 2:50 PM
MEDIATION report Hearing held on 6/5/24. Hearing outcome: Impasse.. (Hollifield, Travis)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 06/21 1:37 PM
Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Motion to Extend Case Management Deadlines by Virgil Bolds. (Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Proposed summons Fri 06/21 1:27 PM
PROPOSED summons to be issued by Virgil Bolds. (Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
19 19 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 06/21 1:18 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Virgil Bolds.(Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of a Related Action Thu 06/06 1:00 PM
NOTICE of a related action (Amended) per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Virgil Bolds. Related case(s): Yes (Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
17 17 order Order on Motion to Appear Telephonically / Video Tue 02/27 9:08 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 16 Motion to Appear by video at Mediation. The parties are permitted to appear remotely via Zoom at the Mediation with Travis Hollifield scheduled for June 5, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 2/27/2024. (SEC)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
16 16 motion Appear Telephonically / Video Mon 02/26 12:54 PM
Joint MOTION for Amanda E. Heystek and John F. Palladino to appear by video at Mediation by Virgil Bolds. (Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Tue 01/30 3:27 PM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on June 5, 2024 at 10:00am before Travis Hollifield. (Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
14 14 order Case Management Scheduling Order Wed 01/17 2:22 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 1/19/2024 Discovery due by 8/5/2024 Dispositive motions due by 9/3/2024 Pretrial statement due by 1/13/2025 All other motions due by 1/20/2025 Jury Trial set for the March 2025 Trial Term, which is set to commence on 3/3/2025 at 09:00 AM, with a more precise trial date to follow. Conduct mediation hearing by 8/2/2024. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/17/2024. (BCH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
13 13 notice Compliance notice Tue 01/09 11:50 AM
NOTICE of compliance re 12 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by East Pasco Materials, LLC (Bell, Colin)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 29, 2023
12 12 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 12/29 10:51 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Colin G. Bell may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant. Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this order, counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 12/29/2023. (SEC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 12/28 7:11 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Colin G. Bell to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21605798 for $150 by East Pasco Materials, LLC.(Palladino, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Main Document Colin Bell Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Monday, December 11, 2023
10 10 misc Case Management Report Mon 12/11 4:27 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
9 9 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 12/05 3:41 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Virgil Bolds. (Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Tue 11/28 2:47 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Amanda E. Heystek on behalf of Virgil Bolds. Lead Counsel: Amanda E. Heystek. (Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 11/27 12:24 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by East Pasco Materials, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Asphalt Paving Systems, Inc. for East Pasco Materials, LLC.. (Palladino, John)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/27 12:18 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by East Pasco Materials, LLC.(Palladino, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 11/21 2:13 PM
NOTICE to Counsel of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BCH)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Tue 11/21 12:03 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by John F. Palladino on behalf of East Pasco Materials, LLC. Lead Counsel: John F. Palladino. (Palladino, John)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 11/21 10:56 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CTR)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 11/20 2:40 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:23-cv-2649-MSS-AEP. (ARC)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 11/20 12:22 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Sixth Judicial Circuit in and for Pasco County, Florida, case number 2023CA004038CAAXES filed in State Court on 08 03-2023 Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-21481608 filed by EAST PASCO MATERIALS, LLC.(Palladino, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court COMPLAINT State Court Complaint,
Att: 2 State Court Docket Sheet State Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 3 State Court Other Documents State Court Other Documents,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet