New Jersey District Court
Judge:Jamel K Semper
Referred: Jessica S Allen
Case #: 2:23-cv-22507
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2023
Last checked: Sunday May 19, 2024 5:13 AM EDT
Defendant
SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA, INC.
Represented By
ANDREA MERYL KIRSHENBAUM
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
JENNIFER CAPOZZOLA
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Plaintiff
JASMIN GRAHAM
Represented By
JASON TRAVIS BROWN
Brown, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
PERRY MYLES
Represented By
JASON TRAVIS BROWN
Brown, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
CRAIG WILLIS
Represented By
JASON TRAVIS BROWN
Brown, LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
DERRICK CANNON
Terminated: 05/08/2024
Represented By
JASON TRAVIS BROWN
Brown, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
KATELYNN COONROOD
Terminated: 05/08/2024
Represented By
JASON TRAVIS BROWN
Brown, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
TANNER HALSEY
Terminated: 05/08/2024
Represented By
JASON TRAVIS BROWN
Brown, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
CHRISTOPHER SHACKELFORD
Terminated: 05/08/2024
Represented By
JASON TRAVIS BROWN
Brown, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
RANDOLPH ALEXANDER
Terminated: 05/07/2024
Represented By
JASON TRAVIS BROWN
Brown, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
CHARLES BUCHANAN
Terminated: 05/07/2024
Represented By
JASON TRAVIS BROWN
Brown, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
LAURA GEHO
Terminated: 05/07/2024
Represented By
JASON TRAVIS BROWN
Brown, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
JOHN GODSEY
Terminated: 05/07/2024
Represented By
JASON TRAVIS BROWN
Brown, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
BRADLEY LIVINGSTON
Terminated: 05/07/2024
Represented By
JASON TRAVIS BROWN
Brown, LLC
contact info

GPO Oct 02 2024
OPINION. Signed by Judge Jamel K. Semper on 10/2/2024. (sm)
GPO May 19 2025
LETTER OPINION AND ORDER granting 40 Motion for Leave to File the Second Amended Complaint in the form attached as ECF No. 40-3, except that all references to Cassie Gasper shall be deleted. No other changes to the proposed Second Amended Complaint are permitted. Within twenty-one (21) days of its filing, Defendant shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 5/19/2025. (ld)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
48 48 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 05/21 11:59 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended and Substituted Complaint against SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA, INC., filed by RACHEL BOWMAN.(BROWN, JASON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent Forms
Monday, May 19, 2025
47 47 8 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Mon 05/19 1:55 PM
LETTER OPINION AND ORDER granting40 Motion for Leave to File the Second Amended Complaint in the form attached as ECF No. 40-3, except that all references to Cassie Gasper shall be deleted. No other changes to the proposed Second Amended Complaint are permitted. Within twenty-one (21) days of its filing, Defendant shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 5/19/2025. (ld)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
46 46 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 12/04 5:01 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion filed by PERRY MYLES re40 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended and Substituted Complaint (BROWN, JASON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Exhibit Order from Gandy v. Securitas,
Att: 3 Exhibit Order from Sypniewski v. Securitas
Monday, November 25, 2024
45 45 order Stipulation and Order Tue 11/26 5:06 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED AND SUBSTITUTED COMPLAINT; that the time within which Plaintiff may Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended and Substituted Complaint is extended up to, through and including, December 4, 2024, and that the motion day shall be continued to December 16, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 11/25/2024. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
44 44 misc Stipulation Fri 11/22 5:34 PM
STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED AND SUBSTITUTED COMPLAINT by PERRY MYLES. (CONLON, NICHOLAS)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
43 43 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 11/18 7:08 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition filed by SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA, INC. re40 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended and Substituted Complaint (KIRSHENBAUM, ANDREA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-8,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, November 15, 2024
42 42 notice Notice (Other) Fri 11/15 3:11 PM
NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re40 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended and Substituted Complaint (CONLON, NICHOLAS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
41 41 notice Notice (Other) Tue 11/05 12:27 PM
NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re40 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended and Substituted Complaint (CONLON, NICHOLAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Myles v Securitas SAC with Tracked Changes
Monday, November 04, 2024
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 11/04 9:57 AM
Set Deadlines as to40 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended and Substituted Complaint . Motion set for 12/2/2024 before Judge Jamel K. Semper. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
40 40 motion Leave to File Document Fri 11/01 6:01 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended and Substituted Complaint by PERRY MYLES.(CONLON, NICHOLAS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Brief in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1- SAC Clean Copy,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2- Bowman CTJ,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3- Gasper CTJ
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
39 39 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Strike Order on Motion to Compel Arbitration Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 10/03 2:35 PM
ORDER that Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss the Complaint9 ) is ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATED; that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint20 is GRANTED; the First Amended Complaint13 is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; that Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike31 is DENIED; Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint addressing the deficiencies identified in the Opinion within thirty (30) days. Signed by Judge Jamel K. Semper on 10/2/2024. (sm)
Related: [-]
38 38 7 pgs order Opinion Thu 10/03 2:30 PM
OPINION. Signed by Judge Jamel K. Semper on 10/2/2024. (sm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added Thu 08/01 5:08 PM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, COLBY QUALLS, ESQ., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
37 37 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Wed 07/31 9:59 AM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Colby Qualls to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-15555728.) (BROWN, JASON)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
36 36 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 07/29 4:53 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion filed by JASMIN GRAHAM, PERRY MYLES, CRAIG WILLIS re31 MOTION to Strike30 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion, (BROWN, JASON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief In Support of Reply
Monday, July 22, 2024
35 35 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Mon 07/22 2:06 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA, INC. re31 MOTION to Strike30 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion, (KIRSHENBAUM, ANDREA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, July 12, 2024
34 34 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 07/12 1:22 PM
ORDER granting33 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Colby Qualls, Esq.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 7/12/2024. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 07/10 10:55 AM
Set Deadlines as to33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Colby Qualls . Motion set for 8/5/2024 before Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
33 33 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 07/09 4:26 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Colby Qualls by JASMIN GRAHAM, PERRY MYLES, CRAIG WILLIS.(BROWN, JASON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
utility Motions No Longer Referred Tue 07/09 5:24 PM
31 MOTION to Strike30 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion, no longer referred to the Magistrate Judge. Motion to be decided by the District Judge. (jbb)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
32 32 notice Notice (Other) Mon 07/01 5:24 PM
NOTICE by JASMIN GRAHAM, PERRY MYLES, CRAIG WILLIS of Filing Consent to Join Forms(BROWN, JASON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent Forms
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 07/01 10:02 AM
Set Deadlines as to31 MOTION to Strike30 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion, . Motion set for 8/5/2024 before Judge Jamel K. Semper. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
31 31 motion Strike Thu 06/27 2:02 PM
MOTION to Strike30 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion, by JASMIN GRAHAM, PERRY MYLES, CRAIG WILLIS.(BROWN, JASON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support of Motion to Strike,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, June 17, 2024
30 30 respm Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion Mon 06/17 2:09 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA, INC. re20 MOTION to Dismiss the Claims of Plaintiffs Willis and Graham, Dismiss the First Amended and Substituted Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and, to Compel Arbitration as to Buchanan, Geho, Godsey, Alexander and Livingston (KIRSHENBAUM, ANDREA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Thursday, June 13, 2024
29 29 notice Notice (Other) Thu 06/13 10:58 AM
NOTICE by PERRY MYLES, JAMES ROBINSON, BRIAN WATSON of Filing Consent to Join Forms(BROWN, JASON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent Forms
Monday, June 10, 2024
28 28 2 pgs order Order Mon 06/10 3:50 PM
JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER that the time within which Defendant may Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Claims of Plaintiffs Willis and Graham, Dismiss the First Amended and Substituted Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and, Alternatively, Compel Arbitration as to Plaintiffs Buchanan, Geho, Godsey, Alexander and Livingston is extended up to, through and including, June 17, 2024, and that the motion day shall be continued to July 1, 2024. Signed by Judge Jamel K. Semper on 6/10/2024. (sm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
27 27 misc Stipulation Wed 06/05 1:43 PM
STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE CLAIMS OF PLAINTIFFS WILLIS AND GRAHAM, DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED AND SUBSTITUTED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND, ALTERNATIVELY, COMPEL ARBITRATION AS TO PLAINTIFFS BUCHANAN, GEHO, GODSEY, ALEXANDER AND LIVINGSTON by SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA, INC..(KIRSHENBAUM, ANDREA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, June 03, 2024
26 26 respm Response to Motion Mon 06/03 4:04 PM
RESPONSE to Motion filed by JASMIN GRAHAM, PERRY MYLES, CRAIG WILLIS re20 MOTION to Dismiss the Claims of Plaintiffs Willis and Graham, Dismiss the First Amended and Substituted Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and, to Compel Arbitration as to Buchanan, Geho, Godsey, Alexander and Livingston (BROWN, JASON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Response to Motion to Dismiss
Friday, May 31, 2024
25 25 notice Notice (Other) Fri 05/31 5:34 PM
NOTICE by PERRY MYLES, BRIAN WATSON, JAMES ROBINSON of Filing Consent to Join Forms(BROWN, JASON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent Forms
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 05/28 1:42 PM
Reset Deadlines as to20 MOTION to Dismiss the Claims of Plaintiffs Willis and Graham, Dismiss the First Amended and Substituted Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and, to Compel Arbitration as to Buchanan, Geho, Godsey, Alexander and Livingston . Motion reset for 6/17/2024 before Judge Jamel K. Semper. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
24 24 order Stipulation and Order Tue 05/21 4:35 PM
JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Plaintiffs to Respond to Defendants Motion to Dismiss; that the timewithin which Plaintiffs may respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Claims of Plaintiffs Willis and Graham, Dismiss the First Amended and Substituted Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and, Alternatively, Compel Arbitration as to Plaintiffs Buchanan, Geho, Godsey, Alexander and Livingston is extended up to, through and including, June 3, 2024, and that the originallynoticed motion day of June 3, 2024, shall be continued to June 17, 2024. Signed by Judge Jamel K. Semper on 5/21/2024. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
23 23 misc Stipulation Thu 05/16 5:18 PM
STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Extending Time for Plaintiffs to Respond to Defendants MTD by JASMIN GRAHAM, PERRY MYLES, CRAIG WILLIS. (BROWN, JASON)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Thu 05/16 10:38 AM
NOTICE by SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA, INC. Notice of Updated Caption(CAPOZZOLA, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
21 21 order Stipulation and Order Tue 05/07 5:08 PM
JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFFS HALSEY,CANNON, SHACKELFORD, COONROD, BUCHANAN, GEHO, GODSEY, ALEXANDER AND LIVINGSTON FROM THE ACTION; Charles Buchanan, Laura Geho, John Godsey, Randolph Alexander and Bradley Livingston are hereby removed from the caption of this case. Signed by Judge Jamel K. Semper on 5/7/2024. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 05/02 3:55 PM
Set Deadlines as to20 MOTION to Dismiss the Claims of Plaintiffs Willis and Graham, Dismiss the First Amended and Substituted Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and, to Compel Arbitration as to Buchanan, Geho, Godsey, Alexander and Livingston . Motion set for 6/3/2024 before Judge Jamel K. Semper. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
20 20 motion Dismiss Wed 05/01 4:19 PM
MOTION to Dismiss the Claims of Plaintiffs Willis and Graham, Dismiss the First Amended and Substituted Complaint for Failure to State a Claim and, to Compel Arbitration as to Buchanan, Geho, Godsey, Alexander and Livingston by SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA, INC.. Responses due by 5/20/2024.(KIRSHENBAUM, ANDREA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 -Declaration of Melissa Wigger,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Sheree Ross,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Nicole Fredericks,
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 6 Certificate of Service
19 19 misc Stipulation Wed 05/01 3:54 PM
STIPULATION (Joint) to Dismiss Plaintiffs Halsey, Cannon, Shackelford, Coonrod, Buchanan, Geho, Godsey, Alexander, and Livingston from the Action by SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA, INC..(KIRSHENBAUM, ANDREA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, April 25, 2024
18 18 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/25 10:34 AM
NOTICE by RANDOLPH ALEXANDER, CHARLES BUCHANAN, LAURA GEHO, JOHN GODSEY, JASMIN GRAHAM, BRADLEY LIVINGSTON, PERRY MYLES, CRAIG WILLIS of Filing Consent to Join Forms(BROWN, JASON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent Forms
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/03 4:04 PM
NOTICE by RANDOLPH ALEXANDER, CHARLES BUCHANAN, LAURA GEHO, JOHN GODSEY, JASMIN GRAHAM, BRADLEY LIVINGSTON, PERRY MYLES, CRAIG WILLIS of Filing Consent to Join Forms(BROWN, JASON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent Forms
Monday, March 25, 2024
16 16 2 pgs order Order Mon 03/25 4:52 PM
JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED AND SUBSTITUTED COMPLAINT through and including 5/1/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 3/25/2024. (sm)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Mon 03/25 4:54 PM
Answer Due Deadline Update - The document submitted by SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/1/2024. (sm)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 03/22 10:00 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA, INC.. (CAPOZZOLA, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
14 14 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 03/18 7:48 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition filed by RANDOLPH ALEXANDER, CHARLES BUCHANAN, LAURA GEHO, JOHN GODSEY, JASMIN GRAHAM, BRADLEY LIVINGSTON, PERRY MYLES, CRAIG WILLIS re9 MOTION to Compel Arbitraton (BROWN, JASON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief
13 13 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/18 5:38 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT AND SUBSTITUTED COMPLAINT against SECURITAS SECURITY SERVICES USA, INC., filed by CHARLES BUCHANAN, LAURA GEHO, BRADLEY LIVINGSTON, JOHN GODSEY, PERRY MYLES, JASMIN GRAHAM, CRAIG WILLIS, RANDOLPH ALEXANDER.(BROWN, JASON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff Grahams consent to become a party plaintiff,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff Livingstons consent to become a party plaintiff
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
12 12 order Stipulation and Order Tue 03/12 4:50 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER substituting proper defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 3/12/2024. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/06 2:28 PM
NOTICE by DERRICK CANNON, KATELYNN COONROOD, TANNER HALSEY, CHRISTOPHER SHACKELFORD of Filing Consent to Join Forms(BROWN, JASON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent Forms
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 03/06 2:36 PM
Set Deadlines as to9 MOTION to Compel Arbitraton . Motion set for 4/1/2024 before Judge Jamel K. Semper. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
10 10 misc Stipulation Tue 03/05 1:47 PM
STIPULATION TO SUBSTITUTE PROPER DEFENDANT (JOINT) by SECURITAS CRITICAL INFRASTRUCTURE SERVICES, INC..(KIRSHENBAUM, ANDREA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
9 9 motion Compel Arbitration Tue 03/05 11:07 AM
MOTION to Compel Arbitraton by SECURITAS CRITICAL INFRASTRUCTURE SERVICES, INC..(KIRSHENBAUM, ANDREA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Tue 03/05 10:58 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by SECURITAS CRITICAL INFRASTRUCTURE SERVICES, INC..(KIRSHENBAUM, ANDREA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/05 10:55 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREA KIRSHENBAUM on behalf of SECURITAS CRITICAL INFRASTRUCTURE SERVICES, INC.(KIRSHENBAUM, ANDREA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/05 10:08 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER CAPOZZOLA on behalf of SECURITAS CRITICAL INFRASTRUCTURE SERVICES, INC.(CAPOZZOLA, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, February 01, 2024
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Thu 02/01 4:12 PM
NOTICE by DERRICK CANNON, KATELYNN COONROOD, TANNER HALSEY, CHRISTOPHER SHACKELFORD of Filing Consent to Join Forms(BROWN, JASON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent Forms
Friday, December 22, 2023
4 4 order Order Reassigning Case Fri 12/22 1:40 PM
TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jamel K. Semper for all further proceedings. Judge Susan D. Wigenton no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 12/22/2023. (smf)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 11/27 3:34 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to SECURITAS CRITICAL INFRASTRUCTURE SERVICES, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
2 2 2 pgs notice Notice (Other) Mon 11/20 2:40 PM
NOTICE by DERRICK CANNON, KATELYNN COONROOD, TANNER HALSEY, CHRISTOPHER SHACKELFORD of Filing of Additional Consents(BROWN, JASON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Laura Geho,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - John Godsey,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Randolph Alexander
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 11/20 2:32 PM
COMPLAINT against SECURITAS CRITICAL INFRASTRUCTURE SERVICES, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14884341) with JURY DEMAND, filed by TANNER HALSEY, KATELYNN COONROOD, CHRISTOPHER SHACKELFORD, DERRICK CANNON.(BROWN, JASON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit A - Plaintiff Halseys consent to become a party plaintiff,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff Cannons consent to become a party plaintiff,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Plaintiff Shackelfords consent to become a party plaintiff,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Plaintiff Coonroods consent to become a party plaintiff,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 6 Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 11/20 3:23 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Susan D. Wigenton and Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. (ak, )
Related: [-]