Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Judge:Nancy Joseph
Case #: 2:23-cv-01555
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2023
Terminated:Jan 24, 2024
Case in other court:Waukesha County Circuit Court, 23-CV-1651
Last checked: Saturday May 18, 2024 4:37 AM CDT
Defendant
Rotech Healthcare Inc
Represented By
Steven W Jelenchick
Beck Chaet Bamberger & Polsky Sc
contact info
Matthew S Vignali
Beck Chaet Bamberger & Polsky Sc
contact info
Plaintiff
Dale Boehm
Represented By
Jonathan R Ingrisano
Godfrey & Kahn Sc
contact info
Sarah K Mueller
Godfrey & Kahn Sc
contact info
Plaintiff
Caspian Technology Concepts LLC
Represented By
Jonathan R Ingrisano
Godfrey & Kahn Sc
contact info
Sarah K Mueller
Godfrey & Kahn Sc
contact info
Plaintiff
ArmorStack LLC
Represented By
Jonathan R Ingrisano
Godfrey & Kahn Sc
contact info
Sarah K Mueller
Godfrey & Kahn Sc
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order Approving Stipulation Wed 01/24 12:37 PM
ORDER Approving15 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Rotech Healthcare Inc signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 1/24/2023. (cc: all counsel)(llc)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 01/24 11:07 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Rotech Healthcare Inc.(Jelenchick, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
utility Terminate Case - Notice Attorneys Thu 01/25 9:44 AM
Case Terminated pursuant to15 Stipulation and16 Order. (edr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
14 14 misc Stipulation Wed 01/17 1:27 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Deadline to Answer Counterclaim by ArmorStack LLC, Dale Boehm, Caspian Technology Concepts LLC.(Mueller, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order Order Approving Stipulation Wed 01/17 4:17 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER Approving Stipulation14 filed by ArmorStack LLC, Dale Boehm, Caspian Technology Concepts LLC signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 1/17/2024. The time by which Plaintiffs, Caspian Technology Concepts, LLC, ArmorStack LLC, and Dale Boehm, may serve their answer to Defendant's Counterclaim is extended to and including February 14, 2024. (cc: all counsel)(llc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
order Order Approving Stipulation Tue 12/19 10:48 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER Approving Stipulation13 filed by ArmorStack LLC, Dale Boehm, Caspian Technology Concepts LLC signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 12/19/2023. Caspian Technology Concepts, LLC, Armorstack LLC, and Dale Boehm, may serve their answer to Defendant's Counterclaim by January 17, 2024. (cc: all counsel)(llc)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
13 13 misc Stipulation Mon 12/18 4:07 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Deadline to Answer Counterclaim by ArmorStack LLC, Dale Boehm, Caspian Technology Concepts LLC.(Mueller, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
12 12 misc Letter Wed 12/13 9:47 AM
LETTER from Attorney Jonathan R. Ingrisano Regarding Rule 16 Scheduling Conference . (Ingrisano, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
utility Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Tue 12/12 8:25 AM
Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (rcm)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
11 11 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Mon 12/11 10:46 AM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Rotech Healthcare Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Jelenchick, Steven)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Mon 12/11 9:38 AM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Mueller, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
9 9 respoth Answer and Counterclaim Mon 11/27 3:00 PM
ANSWER to Complaint AND COUNTERCLAIM against Plaintiffs, Caspian Technology Concepts, LLC, ArmorStack,LLC, and Dale Boehm with Jury Demand filed by Rotech Healthcare Inc and Affirmative Defenses .(Jelenchick, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Caspian MSA,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - NOC SOW,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - NDA,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Policies Acknowledgement Form,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Teleworking Agreement,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - 1.1.9 Conflict of Interest Policy_2020.11.03,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - 1.1.9 Conflict of Interest Policy_2023.02.20,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Email string Boehm-Bryan 12.22.22-1.2.23,
Att: 9 Exhibit I - Email to Burton-Boehm 10.11.22,
Att: 10 Exhibit J - Email string Burton-Sullivan 1.16.23-1.18.23,
Att: 11 Exhibit K - WI-DFI ARMORSTACK, LLC,
Att: 12 Exhibit L - ArmorStack MSA,
Att: 13 Exhibit M - Tanium SOW
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
8 8 misc Attachments Tue 11/21 10:10 AM
ATTACHMENTS State Court Notice of Filing of Defendant's Notice of Removal by Rotech Healthcare Inc re1 Notice of Removal,. (Jelenchick, Steven)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Attachments Tue 11/21 10:09 AM
ATTACHMENTS State Court Notice of Appearance by Rotech Healthcare Inc re1 Notice of Removal,. (Jelenchick, Steven)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Attachments Tue 11/21 10:06 AM
ATTACHMENTS State Court Affidavit of Process Server by Rotech Healthcare Inc re1 Notice of Removal,. (Jelenchick, Steven)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Attachments Tue 11/21 10:02 AM
ATTACHMENTS State Court Notice of Appearance by Rotech Healthcare Inc re1 Notice of Removal,. (Jelenchick, Steven)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Attachments Tue 11/21 10:00 AM
ATTACHMENTS State Court Summons & Complaint by Rotech Healthcare Inc re1 Notice of Removal,. (Jelenchick, Steven)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Attachments Tue 11/21 9:58 AM
ATTACHMENTS State Court Electronic Filing Notice by Rotech Healthcare Inc re1 Notice of Removal,. (Jelenchick, Steven)
Related: [-]
misc Case Opening Modification Tue 11/21 9:37 AM
Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. The state court documents are not attached to the Notice of Removal and should be filed immediately using the event attachment which is found under the heading other documents. ; Please refer to the[LINK:attorney case opening instructions] , the[LINK:summons instructions] and the[LINK:party name guidelines found in the user manual] for further guidance (rcm)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
2 2 misc Disclosure Statement Mon 11/20 12:25 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Rotech Healthcare Inc.. (Jelenchick, Steven)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 11/20 12:23 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Rotech Healthcare Inc. from Waukesha County Circuit Court, Case Number: 23-CV-1651 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4545089)(Jelenchick, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Electronic Filing Notice,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Summons & Complaint,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Mon 11/20 12:28 PM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available[LINK:here.] (jcl)
Related: [-]