California Central District Court
Judge:John W Holcomb
Referred: Douglas F Mccormick
Case #: 8:23-cv-02170
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2023
Last checked: Saturday May 18, 2024 1:58 AM PDT
Defendant
Durustech Inc.
Defendant
Zebra Commerce Inc.
Defendant
Sun Ok Yun
Represented By
Ji Yoon Kim
Lk Professional Law Group
contact info
Defendant
Yeon Yi
Represented By
Ji Yoon Kim
Lk Professional Law Group
contact info
Defendant
Vitapro. Inc.
Defendant
Kris Park
Represented By
Ji Yoon Kim
Lk Professional Law Group
contact info
Defendant
Byungik David Oh
Represented By
Ji Yoon Kim
Lk Professional Law Group
contact info
Defendant
Hyejin Lee
Represented By
Ji Yoon Kim
Lk Professional Law Group
contact info
Defendant
Jungwoo Inc.
Defendant
Woo Young Jang
Represented By
Ji Yoon Kim
Lk Professional Law Group
contact info
Defendant
Insuk Worlwide Corp.
Defendant
Tae Myung Eom
Represented By
Ji Yoon Kim
Lk Professional Law Group
contact info
Defendant
Byung Woo Choi
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Zodiak, Inc.
Defendant
Upgo, Inc.
Defendant
Terramor Enterprises Inc.
Defendant
Retrievo, Inc.
Defendant
Medical Benefits Inc.
Defendant
Sun Joo Kim
Represented By
Ji Yoon Kim
Lk Professional Law Group
contact info
Defendant
Kiyong Jeong
Represented By
Ji Yoon Kim
Lk Professional Law Group
contact info
Defendant
Edward Hong
Represented By
Ji Yoon Kim
Lk Professional Law Group
contact info
Plaintiff
MidFirst Bank
Represented By
Daniel Manning Hayes
Hayes Litigation, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, February 27, 2025
85 85 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Thu 02/27 2:53 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Court finds that the Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Default [ECF No. 80] is appropriate for resolution without a hearing. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the Court VACATES the hearing set on March 7, 2025. The motion stands submitted on the papers timely filed. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cla)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
84 84 respm Reply (Motion related) Thu 02/20 2:44 PM
REPLY In Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Set Aside Default Re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form28 , Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form26 . 80 filed by Defendants Zebra Commerce Inc., Byungik David Oh. (Attorney Brendan Thomas Molloy added to party, Attorney Brendan Thomas Molloy added to party )(Molloy, Brendan)
Related: [-]