California Southern District Court
Judge:M James Lorenz
Referred: Barbara Lynn Major
Case #: 3:23-cv-02133
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441ed Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2023
Terminated:Feb 06, 2025
Case in other court:Superior Court, San Diego County, 37-02023-00045110-CU-WTCTL
Last checked: Saturday May 18, 2024 5:32 AM PDT
Defendant
Accent Controls, Inc
Represented By
Tuan Q. Nguyen
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Ashton M. Riley
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does 1 through 30
Plaintiff
Michael Malic
Represented By
Joshua S. Falakassa
Falakassa Law, P.C.
contact info
Zachary Cavanagh
Bokhour Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Mehrdad Bokhour
Bokhour Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Zachary James Cavanagh
Bokhour Law Group, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 82 minutes ago
Thursday, February 06, 2025
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 02/06 10:32 AM
ORDER18 of Dismissal. This action is dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 2/6/2025. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rmc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
18 18 motion Dismiss Wed 02/05 10:52 AM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Michael Malic. (Bokhour, Mehrdad) (rmc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
17 17 minutes Mandatory Settlement Conference Wed 11/06 2:44 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major: Mandatory Settlement Conference held on 11/6/2024 (Plaintiff Attorney Zachary Cavanagh, Kasra Torabi). (Defendant Attorney Ashton Riley, Tuan Nguyen). Case did not settle.(no document attached) (sjr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
16 16 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Thu 09/26 2:38 PM
Order Granting Joint Motion For Protective Order With Modifications[ECF No. 15]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 9/26/2024. (dim)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Protective Order Thu 09/26 10:01 AM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Accent Controls, Inc.(Riley, Ashton)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order re Stipulated Protective Order
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 08/28 4:06 PM
ORDER Granting In Part Plaintiffs Ex Parte Motion to Continue Fact Discovery Cut Off and Related Deadlines Related [+] Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/30/2025 11:00 AM before Judge M. James Lorenz. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 11/6/2024 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/16/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 8/28/2024. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rxc)
Related: [-] ECF No.13
Monday, August 26, 2024
13 13 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 08/26 10:50 PM
Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and All Related Deadlines by Michael Malic.(Cavanagh, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities Ex Parte Motion to Continue,
Att: 2 Declaration Cavanagh Declaration,
Att: 3 Supplement Joint Stipulation
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
12 12 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Wed 08/14 7:55 AM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Michael Malic re9 Order to Show Cause. (Cavanagh, Zachary) (dim)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
11 11 order Notice and Order of Document Discrepancies Mon 08/12 12:51 PM
Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge M. James Lorenz Rejecting re10 Declaration, from Plaintiff Michael Malic. Non-compliance with local rule(s), ECF §2.f(2): failure to comply with signature requirements. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties(dim)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Stricken Document
Friday, August 09, 2024
10 10 misc Declaration Fri 08/09 1:49 PM
DECLARATION of Zachary Cavanagh re OSC by Plaintiff Michael Malic. (Bokhour, Mehrdad)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 08/01 4:24 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Affidavit due by 8/14/2024. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 8/1/2024.(dim)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
8 8 order Scheduling Order Thu 01/04 5:13 PM
Scheduling Order Regulating Discovery and Other Pre-Trial Proceedings. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 9/23/2024 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/12/2025 11:00 AM before Judge M. James Lorenz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 1/4/2024.(dim)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
7 7 minutes Early Neutral Evaluation Conference Case Management Conference Wed 01/03 2:37 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 1/3/2024. Case did not settle. Case Management Conference held on 1/3/2024. Order to follow. (Plaintiff Attorney Zachary Cavanagh, Esq.). (Defendant Attorney Ashton Riley, Esq.). (no document attached) (ajf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
6 6 notice Joint Discovery Plan Tue 12/19 11:32 AM
JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Accent Controls, Inc (Riley, Ashton) (cxl1)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
5 5 8 pgs order Order for Early Neutral Evaluation Tue 11/21 10:50 AM
NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 1/3/2024 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Case Management Conference set for 1/3/2024 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Joint Discovery Plan due 12/22/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 11/21/2023.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(cxl1)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 11/21 9:13 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Accent Controls, Inc identifying Corporate Parent Accent Controls, Inc. for Accent Controls, Inc. (Riley, Ashton) (cxl1)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Party With Financial Interest Tue 11/21 9:08 AM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Accent Controls, Inc re1 Notice of Removal,, Defendant's Certificate of Interested Parties . Identifying Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Accent Controls, Inc., Other Affiliate Michael Malic for Accent Controls, Inc. (Riley, Ashton) (cxl1)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
2 2 respoth Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Mon 11/20 5:07 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Accent Controls, Inc. (stn)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 11/20 5:04 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-18363959.), filed by Accent Controls, Inc. The new case number is 3:23-cv-2133-L-BLM. Judge M. James Lorenz and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case.(stn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of M. Janiak,
Att: 3 Declaration Declaration of A. Riley,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit A to M. Janiak's Declaration,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit B to A. Riley's Declaration,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit C. to A. Riley's Declaration