Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Marcia Morales Howard
Referred: Patricia D Barksdale
Case #: 3:23-cv-01375
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2023
Terminated:Aug 26, 2024
Last checked: Saturday May 18, 2024 7:58 AM EDT
Defendant
Jayme Gohde
Represented By
Michael P. Spellman
Sniffen & Spellman, PA
contact info
Defendant
Randall Harrison
Represented By
Michael P. Spellman
Sniffen & Spellman, PA
contact info
Defendant
Mark A. Hunter
Represented By
Michael P. Spellman
Sniffen & Spellman, PA
contact info
Mediator
Thomas Bateman
Represented By
Thomas H. Bateman, III
Messer Caparello, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
James Hodges
Represented By
Amy Maletzky Hanna
Phillips & Hunt
contact info
John Michael Phillips
Law Offices Of John M. Phillips, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, August 26, 2024
48 48 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 08/26 4:21 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL)
Related: [-]
47 47 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 08/26 11:54 AM
ORDER dismissing case with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the file. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 8/26/2024. (JW)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
46 46 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 08/23 4:58 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Jayme Gohde, Randall Harrison. (Spellman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
45 45 19 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss / Failure to State a Claim Wed 08/21 11:01 AM
ORDER granting, in part, and denying as moot, in part, 13 Defendant Sheriff Hunter's Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike. Counts XI and XVI of the Complaint are dismissed. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the Sheriff as a defendant. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 8/21/2024. (JW)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
44 44 order Order on Motion to Compel Mon 07/01 4:43 PM
ENDORSED ORDER. Based on 42 the plaintiff's notice informing the Court the parties have resolved the discovery dispute, 28 the motion to compel is denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 7/1/2024. (AMH)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
43 43 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 06/28 3:29 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 42 the motion to cancel the July 2, 2024, hearing on 28 the motion to compel. Because the parties resolved the discovery dispute, the hearing is cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia Barksdale on June 28, 2024. (ASL)
Related: [-]
42 42 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 06/28 11:25 AM
NOTICE by James Hodges re 40 Order Notice of Cancellation of Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Set to Be Heard 07/02/2024 (Phillips, John) Modified on 6/28/2024 to make a pending motion (ASL)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
41 41 notice Notice (Other) Fri 06/21 2:47 PM
NOTICE by Jayme Gohde, Randall Harrison OF SERVICE OF RULE 68 OFFER OF JUDGMENT (Spellman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
40 40 order Order Fri 05/24 8:34 AM
ENDORSED ORDER. To allow the parties more time to confer on 28 the plaintiff's motion to compel, the May 24, 2024, hearing is rescheduled to July 2, 2024, at 10:00 a.m., in courtroom 5B of the Bryan Simpson United States Courthouse, 300 North Hogan Street, Jacksonville, Florida 32202. The Courtroom Deputy will digitally record the proceeding. If the parties resolve the dispute, they must promptly notify the Court by filing a notice on the docket, and the Court will cancel the hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on May 24, 2024. (AMH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
39 39 1 pgs order Order Setting Hearing on Motion Thu 05/16 2:29 PM
ORDER scheduling a hearing on 28 the plaintiff's motion to compel for 5/24/2024 at 11:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 5B before Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 5/16/2024. (ASL)
Related: [-]
38 38 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 05/16 2:04 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Marcia Morales Howard. New case number: 3:23-cv-1375-MMH-PDB. Senior Judge Henry Lee Adams, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (MDC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
37 37 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 05/14 2:37 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:23-cv-1375-HLA-PDB. Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson no longer assigned to the case. Motion(s) REFERRED:28 MOTION to Compel Coordination of Depositions . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. (MDC)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
36 36 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Mon 05/13 3:08 PM
ORDER of recusal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 5/13/2024. (ADM)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
35 35 minutes Settlement Conference Mon 05/06 1:14 PM
Minute Entry. In Person Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held on 5/6/2024. Impasse Declared. (Digital) (TSP)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
34 34 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 03/29 5:55 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re28 MOTION to Compel Coordination of Depositions filed by Jayme Gohde, Randall Harrison, Mark A. Hunter.(Spellman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 6 pgs Exhibit Emails,
Att: 2 Exhibit Pltf Rule 26 Disclosures
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
33 33 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Wed 03/27 3:27 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 32 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Amy M. Hanna is relieved of any further responsibility as counsel for Plaintiff in this matter, but she shall comply with all applicable obligations on withdrawing counsel, including any applicable Bar rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 3/27/2024. (ADM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
32 32 motion Withdraw as Attorney Tue 03/26 1:39 PM
MOTION for Amy M. Hanna to Withdraw as Attorney by James Hodges. (Phillips, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
31 31 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Telephonically / Video Thu 03/21 11:48 AM
ORDER denying as moot 29 Motion to Appear Remotely for Settlement Conference. The settlement conference is set for Monday, May 6, 2024, at 10:00 a.m., Courtroom 5C. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 3/21/2024. (ADM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
30 30 notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/20 4:52 PM
NOTICE by James Hodges (Phillips, John)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Appear Telephonically / Video Wed 03/20 11:39 AM
MOTION to appear telephonically by James Hodges. (Phillips, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
28 28 motion Compel Fri 03/15 10:20 AM
MOTION to Compel Coordination of Depositions by James Hodges.(Phillips, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Scheduling Emails,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - March 13, 2024 Correspondence
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
27 27 2 pgs order Order Wed 03/13 3:47 PM
ORDER directing the parties to confer and present dates for a settlement conference no later than 3/20/24. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 3/13/2024. (ADM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
26 26 2 pgs order Order Tue 02/27 11:05 AM
ORDER referring case to the Honorable Monte C. Richardson, United States Magistrate Judge, to conduct a settlement conference. Signed by Senior Judge Henry Lee Adams, Jr. on 2/27/2024. (MO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
25 25 order Case Management Scheduling Order Wed 02/14 11:20 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER AND REFERRAL TO MEDIATION: Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 5/6/2024; Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 9/4/2024; Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 9/18/2024; Discovery due by 11/1/2024; Dispositive motions due by 12/2/2024; Conduct mediation hearing by 3/17/2025; Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/22/2025 at 10:30 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 A before Senior Judge Henry Lee Adams, Jr.; Jury Trial set for the trial term commencing 6/2/2025 at 09:30 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 A before Senior Judge Henry Lee Adams, Jr. Signed by Senior Judge Henry Lee Adams, Jr. on 2/14/2024. (MO)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
24 24 misc Case Management Report Fri 02/09 11:21 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Spellman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
23 23 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 01/31 7:04 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Motion to Strike filed by Mark A. Hunter. (Spellman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
22 22 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 01/31 12:57 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint by Jayme Gohde.(LSS)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 01/30 4:30 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 20 Defendant Jayme Gohde's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint; finding as moot 12 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. The Clerk shall file Defendant Jayme Gohde's Answer and Affirmative Defenses (Doc. 20-1) as a separate document, which is deemed to be filed timely. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 1/30/2024. (ADM)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
20 20 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Mon 01/29 5:54 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Jayme Gohde.(Spellman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Answer and Affirmative Defenses
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
19 19 order Order Tue 01/23 10:51 AM
ENDORSED ORDER directing Defendant to file a reply to 18 Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to 13 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss And Motion to Strike no later than January 31, 2024. The reply shall not exceed six (6) pages. Signed by Senior Judge Henry Lee Adams, Jr. on 1/23/2024. (MO)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
18 18 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 01/18 2:12 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Motion to Strike filed by James Hodges. (Phillips, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/16 7:08 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Randall Harrison.(Spellman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
16 16 misc Supplement Fri 01/05 4:52 PM
SUPPLEMENT re13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Motion to Strike Regarding Conferral by Mark A. Hunter. (Spellman, Michael)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 01/05 10:54 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Jayme Gohde, Randall Harrison, Mark A. Hunter. (Spellman, Michael)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Fri 01/05 9:58 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by John Michael Phillips on behalf of James Hodges. Lead Counsel: John M. Phillips. (Phillips, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
13 13 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 01/04 6:44 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Motion to Strike by Mark A. Hunter. (Spellman, Michael)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Thu 01/04 1:07 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Spellman, Michael)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of appearance Thu 01/04 12:37 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Appearance by Michael P. Spellman on behalf of Jayme Gohde, Randall Harrison, Mark A. Hunter (Spellman, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
10 10 service Proof of service Wed 01/03 12:11 PM
PROOF of service by James Hodges (Phillips, John)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Proof of service Wed 01/03 12:10 PM
PROOF of service by James Hodges (Phillips, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
8 8 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 11/28 1:59 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by James Hodges. (Phillips, John)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of a Related Action Tue 11/28 1:57 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by James Hodges. Related case(s): Yes (Phillips, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 11/22 9:36 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
5 5 service Summons issued Tue 11/21 2:50 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Mark A. Hunter. (BGR)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons issued Tue 11/21 2:50 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Jayme Gohde. (BGR)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons issued Tue 11/21 2:49 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Randall Harrison. (BGR)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 11/21 12:08 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge Henry Lee Adams, Jr and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:23-cv-01375-HLA-MCR. (JG)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 11/20 9:20 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-21484729) filed by James Hodges.(Phillips, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons,
Att: 4 Proposed Summons