Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Mark H Cohen
Case #: 1:23-cv-05310
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance)
Case Filed:Nov 17, 2023
Terminated:Aug 21, 2024
Last checked: Thursday May 16, 2024 6:06 AM EDT
Defendant
Muhannad Abdel-Haleem
Defendant
Anne Agcaoili
Defendant
Francis Agcaoili
Defendant
Gulali Aslanov
Represented By
Yonathan Nathanson
Mager Paruas, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Anthony Coles
Defendant
HBK Logistics, Inc.
Defendant
Akmed Mukhamad Muradov
Defendant
N & G Express FL, LLC
Represented By
Yonathan Nathanson
Mager Paruas, LLC
contact info
Bryan E. Busch
Busch Mills & Slomka, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Stephanie Scott
Plaintiff
Progressive Mountain Insurance Company
Represented By
Blair Joseph Cash
Moseley Marcinak Law Group, LLP
contact info
Anna Beaton
Moseley Marcinak Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Wed 08/21 9:49 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING20 Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (dgr)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 08/21 9:50 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (dgr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
20 20 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 08/20 4:46 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Progressive Mountain Insurance Company. (Cash, Blair)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
19 19 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Tue 08/06 4:55 PM
ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the appearing parties file the Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan in accordance with Local Rule 16.2 of this Court within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. The parties are notified that a failure to comply with this Order may result in sanctions, including dismissal of this case for want of prosecution. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 8/6/2024. (dgr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/05 3:33 PM
MINUTE ORDER Granting18 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Yonathan Nathanson by CRD at the direction of the Clerk's Office. Approved by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 3/5/24. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(lme)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Mon 03/04 11:00 AM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:18 APPLICATION for Admission of Yonathan Nathanson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13262523). Attorney Yonathan Nathanson added appearing on behalf of Gulali Aslanov, N & G Express FL, LLC. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (cpp)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
18 18 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/01 5:07 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Yonathan Nathanson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13262523).by N & G Express FL, LLC.(Busch, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Pro Hac Admission
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/01 4:54 PM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT by Aslanov and by N & G Express FL, LLC. Discovery ends on 7/29/2024.(Busch, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration Page
Friday, February 16, 2024
16 16 service Return of Service Executed Fri 02/16 2:17 PM
Return of Service Executed by Progressive Mountain Insurance Company. Anthony Coles served on 2/11/2024, answer due 3/4/2024. (Cash, Blair)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Return of Service Executed Fri 02/16 2:16 PM
Return of Service Executed by Progressive Mountain Insurance Company. Stephanie Scott served on 2/11/2024, answer due 3/4/2024. (Cash, Blair)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 02/05 1:37 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. Defendants N&G Express and Gulali Aslanov Answer due 3/1/2024. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 2/5/2024. (dgr)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Mon 02/05 12:28 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, for Defendants N&G Express and Aslanov by Progressive Mountain Insurance Company.(Cash, Blair)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order granting Motion for Extension of Time
12 12 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 02/05 12:21 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Progressive Mountain Insurance Company. Gulali Aslanov waiver mailed on 11/17/2023, answer due 1/16/2024. (Cash, Blair)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 02/05 12:17 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Progressive Mountain Insurance Company. N & G Express FL, LLC waiver mailed on 11/17/2023, answer due 1/16/2024. (Cash, Blair)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Return of Service Executed Mon 02/05 8:59 AM
Return of Service Executed by Progressive Mountain Insurance Company. HBK Logistics, Inc. served on 12/21/2023, answer due 1/11/2024. (Cash, Blair)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
9 9 service Return of Service Executed Tue 12/26 9:24 AM
Return of Service Executed by Progressive Mountain Insurance Company. Muhannad Abdel-Haleem served on 12/14/2023, answer due 1/4/2024. (Cash, Blair)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
8 8 service Return of Service Executed Fri 12/08 12:07 PM
Return of Service Executed by Progressive Mountain Insurance Company. HBK Logistics, Inc. served on 12/4/2023, answer due 12/26/2023. (Cash, Blair)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Thu 12/07 4:27 PM
Clerk's Notation re5 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement reviewed by Mark H. Cohen. (lme)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
7 7 service Return of Service Executed Wed 12/06 1:04 PM
Return of Service Executed by Progressive Mountain Insurance Company. Anne Agcaoili served on 12/6/2023, answer due 12/27/2023. (Cash, Blair)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Return of Service Executed Wed 12/06 1:03 PM
Return of Service Executed by Progressive Mountain Insurance Company. Francis Agcaoili served on 12/6/2023, answer due 12/27/2023. (Cash, Blair)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
5 5 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 12/05 7:36 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Progressive Mountain Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc. for Progressive Mountain Insurance Company. (Cash, Blair)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Return of Service Executed Tue 12/05 6:20 PM
Return of Service Executed by Progressive Mountain Insurance Company. Akmed Mukhamad Muradov served on 12/4/2023, answer due 12/26/2023. (Cash, Blair)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
3 3 30+ pgs order Order Tue 11/21 11:57 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 11/21/2023. (tmf)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Mon 11/20 9:04 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jkb)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 11/20 9:03 AM
COMPLAINT for DECLARATORY JUDGMENT filed by Progressive Mountain Insurance Company. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-13039850)(jkb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit B part 2,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet