New York Northern District Court
Judge:Brenda K Sannes
Referred: Miroslav Lovric
Case #: 5:23-cv-01452
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Nov 17, 2023
Last checked: Thursday May 16, 2024 5:53 AM EDT
Defendant
737 Comstock Avenue, Inc.
Represented By
Ryan M. Jerome
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
William T. Eveland
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP
contact info
Defendant
Delta Delta Delta
Represented By
Arthur F. Hoge, III
Hall Estill
contact info
Littleton Tazewell Ellett, IV
Hall, Estill, Hardwick, Gable, Golden & Nelson, P.C.
contact info
Paul V. Mullin
Sugarman Law Firm Llp - Syracuse Office
contact info
Defendant
Claire Harris
Represented By
Arthur F. Hoge, III
Hall Estill
contact info
Littleton Tazewell Ellett, IV
Hall, Estill, Hardwick, Gable, Golden & Nelson, P.C.
contact info
Paul V. Mullin
Sugarman Law Firm Llp - Syracuse Office
contact info
Defendant
Ethan Hirsh
Represented By
Ryan M. Jerome
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
William T. Eveland
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP
contact info
Defendant
Luke Rogers
Represented By
Ryan M. Jerome
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
William T. Eveland
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP
contact info
Defendant
Sigma Chi Foundation
Represented By
Ryan M. Jerome
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
William T. Eveland
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP
contact info
Defendant
Sigma Chi International Fraternity, Incorporated
Represented By
Ryan M. Jerome
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
William T. Eveland
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP
contact info
Defendant
Syracuse University
Represented By
Lorraine M. Mertell
Mackenzie Hughes LLP
contact info
William B. Hunt
Mackenzie Hughes LLP
contact info
Defendant
Michael Montalto
Represented By
Frank S. Occhipinti
Lynn Occhipinti, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jane Doe
Represented By
Douglas E. Fierberg
The Fierberg National Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Jonathon N. Fazzola
The Fierberg National Law Group
contact info
Olympias I. Konidaris
The Fierberg National Law Group
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
John Roe
Terminated: 11/20/2023
Defendant
Emma Spadea
Terminated: 03/05/2024
Represented By
Arthur F. Hoge, III
Hall Estill
contact info
Littleton Tazewell Ellett, IV
Hall, Estill, Hardwick, Gable, Golden & Nelson, P.C.
contact info
Paul V. Mullin
Sugarman Law Firm Llp - Syracuse Office
contact info

GPO Sep 30 2024
MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Fraternity Defendants' motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. 56) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. It is further ORDERED that all of Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Hirsh and Foundation are DISMISSED and that Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Comstock on a theory of alter ego liability are DISMISSED. It is further ORDERED that Defendants Hirsh and Foundation are DISMISSED from this action. It is further ORDERED that Sorority Defendants' motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. 58) is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that University Defendant's motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. 55) is GRANTED as to the following claims, and that the following claims are DISMISSED: Plaintiff's negligent misrepresentation claim against Defendant University and Plaintiff's negligence claim against Defendant University for failing to offer, provide, or identify services to Plaintiff after she reported the rape. It is further ORDERED that Fraternity Defendant's motion to strike (Dkt. No. 56) is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff's request to amend the Complaint (Dkt. Nos. 67, 68, 69) is GRANTED with respect to the dismissed claims, and any amended complaint must be filed within thirty days of the date of this decision. Signed by Chief Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 9/30/2024. (nmk)

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, April 03, 2025
107 107 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/03 3:50 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Quinn Weedon on behalf of Delta Delta Delta (Weedon, Quinn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
106 106 order Order on Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/02 2:06 PM
ORDER granting104 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions. Counsel is reminded that, once the above is accomplished, a NOTICE OF APPEARANCE MUST BE FILED IN THIS ACTION or you will not receive electronic notifications in the case. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 4/2/2025. (jdc )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
105 105 misc Supplemental Admission documents Tue 04/01 5:06 PM
Supplemental Admission documents re:104 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice, [THIS DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND VIEWABLE BY COURT USERS ONLY] . [Filed via MFT on 4/1/2025.] (hmr)
Related: [-]