California Eastern District Court
Judge:Daniel J Calabretta
Case #: 2:23-cv-02704
Nature of Suit896 Other Statutes - Arbitration
Cause09:1 U.S. Arbitration Act
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Jul 18, 2024 4:33 AM PDT
Defendant
Wholesale 209, LLC
Represented By
Matthew Jon Olson
Dorsey & Whitney LLP
contact info
Jill Alisa Gutierrez
Dorsey & Whitney LLP
contact info
Kent J. Schmidt
Dorsey & Whitney LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Xiamen Xiangyu Logistics Group Corporation
Represented By
Aimee Scala
Mazzola Lindstrom LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
Wentao Lyu
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Wholesale 209, LLC
Represented By
Matthew Jon Olson
Dorsey & Whitney LLP
contact info
Jill Alisa Gutierrez
Dorsey & Whitney LLP
contact info
Kent J. Schmidt
Dorsey & Whitney LLP
contact info

GPO Dec 21 2023
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/20/23 ORDERING that respondent's response to the petition is due on or before 1/18/24. (Kastilahn, A)
GPO Jul 17 2024
ORDER signed by District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta on 07/16/24 DENYING 13 Motion to Refuse to Recognize Arbitration Award and ORDERING that the parties file a Joint Status Report within 30 days. (Licea Chavez, V)
GPO Sep 10 2024
AMENDED REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta on 9/10/2024 SETTING deadlines as follows: Fact Discovery due by 2/15/2025, Mid-Discovery Statements due by 11/15/2024, Motions heard by 6/15/2025 at 1:30 pm, Final Pretris of the entry of this order. (Michel, G.)al Conference set for 10/9/2025 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 10 (DJC) before District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta, and Bench Trial set for 11/3/2025 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (DJC) before District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta. Objections due within 14 day
GPO Oct 28 2024
PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta on 10/25/2024 GRANTING 45 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added Attorney Ruofei Xiang, PHV for Xiamen Xiangyu Logistics Group Corporation. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Becknal, R.)

Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
54 54 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Wed 04/16 10:52 AM
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta on 4/15/2025 GRANTING the Joint Stipulation and proposed Briefing Schedule; and EXTENDING the hearing deadline to 7/10/2025. (Deputy Clerk RRB)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
53 53 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 04/14 6:38 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER Extension of Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date by Xiamen Xiangyu Logistics Group Corporation. (Scala, Aimee)
Related: [-]