South Carolina District Court
Judge:Mary Geiger Lewis
Referred: Paige J Gossett
Case #: 0:23-cv-05958
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights, State Filers
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
197 197 service Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served Wed 05/07 9:03 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shawn Hayden Owens. Matt Harris served on 4/11/2025, answer due 5/2/2025. (cpri)
Related: [-]