Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:David J Novak
Referred: Ivan D Davis
Case #: 1:23-cv-01595
Nature of Suit245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Case Filed:Nov 22, 2023
Terminated:Dec 04, 2024
Last checked: Monday May 20, 2024 4:52 AM EDT
Defendant
Jonathan Cabin
MD 1525 Wilson Blvd Suite 125
Arlington, VA 22209
Represented By
Tracie Dorfman
Hancock Daniel
contact info
Kambria Taryn Lannetti
Hancock, Daniel & Johnson, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
NOVA SurgiCare P.C.
Represented By
Wilfredo Bonilla, Jr.
Crenshaw, Ware & Martin, P.L.C.
contact info
Douglas E. Penner
Crenshaw, Ware & Martin, PLC
contact info
Erica Piotrowski
Crenshaw, Ware & Martin, P.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Sara Russell
Represented By
Charles Bennett Molster, III
The Law Offices Of Charles B. Molster Iii PLLC
contact info
Catherine Bertram
Betram & Murphy
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
SkinDC, PLLC
Represented By
Byron James Mitchell
Mitchell & Simopoulos, PLLC
contact info
ThirdParty Plaintiff
NOVA SurgiCare P.C.
Represented By
Wilfredo Bonilla, Jr.
Crenshaw, Ware & Martin, P.L.C.
contact info
Douglas E. Penner
Crenshaw, Ware & Martin, PLC
contact info
Erica Piotrowski
Crenshaw, Ware & Martin, P.L.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
62 62 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Settlement Wed 12/04 2:55 PM
ORDER (Approving Compromise Settlement and Ordering Dismissal): The Court ORDERS the parties to follow the terms contained in the Releases and Settlement Agreements (ECF Nos. 60-2, 60-3) as if they were incorporated into this Order and to pay and disburse the settlement amounts as set forth in the Settlement Distribution Summary (ECF No. 60-4). Finally, the Court DISMISSES this matter, including the Third-Party Complaint, WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge David J. Novak on 12/04/2024. (wgar, )
Related: [-]
61 61 minutes Omnibus Hearing Wed 12/04 12:49 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge David J. Novak:Final Settlement Hearing held on 12/4/2024. Matter came on for final settlement hearing. Court finds the settlement fair and reasonable. Notice given and no objections noted by Counsel or individuals present. Factual findings made by the Court. Settlement and attorney fees approved by the Court - FINAL ORDER TO ENTER. (Court Reporter Rebecca Stonestreet.)(cgar)
Related: [-]