Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Roderick C Young
Case #: 3:23-cv-00801
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Nov 22, 2023
Last checked: Monday May 20, 2024 4:54 AM EDT
Defendant
Chippenham & Johnston-Willis Hospitals, Inc.
Represented By
Maurice Scott Fisher, Jr
Harman Claytor Corrigan & Wellman
contact info
Elizabeth Olga Papoulakos
Harman Claytor Corrigan & Wellman
contact info
John Ryan Owen
Harman Claytor Corrigan & Wellman
contact info
Haley Christina Doss Santos
Harman Claytor Corrigan & Wellman
contact info
Defendant
City of Richmond
Represented By
Sharon Miranda Carr
Richmond City Attorney'S Office
contact info
Wirt P. Marks, IV
Office Of The City Attorney (richmond)
contact info
Defendant
Steven M. Gibson
Represented By
Gary Christopher Jones, Jr.
Sinnott Nuckols & Logan PC
contact info
Mark Charles Nanavati
Sinnott, Nuckols & Logan PC
contact info
Defendant
David R. Hyde, Jr.
Represented By
Maurice Scott Fisher, Jr
Harman Claytor Corrigan & Wellman
contact info
Elizabeth Olga Papoulakos
Harman Claytor Corrigan & Wellman
contact info
John Ryan Owen
Harman Claytor Corrigan & Wellman
contact info
Haley Christina Doss Santos
Harman Claytor Corrigan & Wellman
contact info
Defendant
John / Jane Doe Security Guards (1-5)
Movant
Chesterfield County Police Department
Chesterfield County Police Department 10001 Iron Bridge Road
Chesterfield, VA 23832
Represented By
Julie A.C. Seyfarth
Chesterfield County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Margaret P. Byers
Represented By
Paul McCourt Curley
Six East Law Group - Curley Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael C. Byers
Represented By
Paul McCourt Curley
Six East Law Group - Curley Law Firm, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 85 minutes ago
Friday, February 21, 2025
154 154 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Fri 02/21 4:12 PM
ORDER that this matter is before the Court on the parties' Stipulations of Dismissal (ECF Nos.151 ,152 , and153 ). The filing parties stipulate to the dismissal of the action as it relates to Defendants David R. Hyde, John/Jane Doe Security Guards (1-5), and Chippenham & Johnston-Willis Hospitals, Inc., pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41. Finding the terms of the stipulation proper, the Court hereby ACCEPTS the Stipulations of Dismissal and ORDERS that Plaintiffs' claims against the above-named Defendants are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees, expenses, and costs, and with none of the parties deemed a prevailing party. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young on 2/21/2025. (jenjones, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
153 153 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 02/20 3:41 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Chippenham & Johnston-Willis Hospitals, Inc.. (Santos, Haley)
Related: [-]
152 152 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 02/20 3:40 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by John / Jane Doe Security Guards (1-5). (Santos, Haley)
Related: [-]
151 151 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 02/20 3:39 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by David R. Hyde, Jr. (Santos, Haley)
Related: [-]