California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Scott C Clarkson
Case #: 8:23-bk-12464
Case Filed:Nov 22, 2023
Creditor Meeting:Jan 16, 2024
Terminated:Jan 18, 2024

Debtor
SLE Enterprise, Inc.
1000 E Bishop St Unit K2
Santa Ana, CA 92701-6449
Represented By
Omero Banuelos
Omero Banuelos Attorney At Law
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Weneta M.A. Kosmala (TR)
4425 Jamboree Rd., Suite 183
Newport Beach, CA 92660
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701


Docket last updated: 11/22/2023 12:02 PM PST
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Wed 11/22 6:23 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:8:23-bk-12464] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A56201706. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Wed 11/22 6:21 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by SLE Enterprise, Inc. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 12/6/2023. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 12/6/2023. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 12/6/2023. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 12/6/2023. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 12/6/2023. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 12/6/2023. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 12/6/2023. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 12/6/2023. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 12/6/2023. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 12/6/2023. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 12/6/2023. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 12/6/2023. Chapter 7 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income (Form 122A-1) Due: 12/6/2023. Statement of Exemption from Presumption of Abuse (Form 122A-1Supp) Due: 12/6/2023. Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation (Form 122A-2) Due: 12/6/2023. Statement About Your Social Security Numbers (Form 121) due by 12/6/2023. Signature of Attorney on Petition (Form 101 or 201) due 12/6/2023. Schedule J-2: Expenses for Separate Household of Debtor 2 (Form 106J-2) due 12/6/2023. Cert. of Credit Counseling due by 12/6/2023. Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing of Petition due 12/6/2023. Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 12/6/2023. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 12/6/2023. Attorney Disclosure of Compensation Arrangement in Individual Chapter 7 Case (LBR Form F2090-1) due 12/6/2023. Petition Preparer Notice, Declaration, and Signature - Form 119 due by 12/6/2023. Disclosure of Compensation of Bankruptcy Petition Preparer (Form 2800) due 12/6/2023. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 12/6/2023. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 12/6/2023. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 12/6/2023. Incomplete Filings due by 12/6/2023. (Banuelos, Omero)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc List of Creditors (Master Mailing List of Creditors) Wed 11/22 6:29 AM
List of Creditors (Master Mailing List of Creditors) Filed by Debtor SLE Enterprise, Inc.. (Banuelos, Omero)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC) Wed 11/22 6:35 AM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/16/2024 at 08:00 AM at TR 7, TELEPHONIC MEETING. FOR INSTRUCTIONS CONTACT THE TRUSTEE. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required Wed 11/22 10:56 AM
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Incorrect schedules /statements recorded as deficient. THE PROPER DEFICIENCY HAS BEEN ISSUED. Related [+] (VN)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) filed by Debtor SLE Enterprise, Inc.