New York Southern District Court
Judge:Mary Kay Vyskocil
Case #: 1:23-cv-10293
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12112 Americans with Disabilities Act - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Nov 22, 2023
Last checked: Monday May 20, 2024 4:30 AM EDT
Defendant
John/Jane Doe Nos 1-2
Defendant
Meghan Jones
Represented By
Karla Del Pozo Garcia
Dentons Us Llp (ny)
contact info
Rebecca A. Stark
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Ned Henry Bassen
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Defendant
Klick USA, Inc. d/b/a Klick Health
Represented By
Karla Del Pozo Garcia
Dentons Us Llp (ny)
contact info
Rebecca A. Stark
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Ned Henry Bassen
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Defendant
Alexander Leavitt
Represented By
Karla Del Pozo Garcia
Dentons Us Llp (ny)
contact info
Rebecca A. Stark
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Ned Henry Bassen
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Defendant
Catherine MacInnis
Represented By
Karla Del Pozo Garcia
Dentons Us Llp (ny)
contact info
Rebecca A. Stark
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Ned Henry Bassen
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ari Schaefer
Represented By
Karla Del Pozo Garcia
Dentons Us Llp (ny)
contact info
Rebecca A. Stark
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Ned Henry Bassen
Dentons Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kaitlin Lally
Represented By
Patrick John Walsh
Stulberg & Walsh, LLP
contact info
James L. Deboer
Stulberg & Walsh, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
50 50 misc Letter Tue 04/29 3:02 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Ned H. Bassen dated April 29, 2025 re: Opposition to Pre-Motion Conf Request47 . Document filed by Meghan Jones, Klick USA, Inc. d/b/a Klick Health, Alexander Leavitt, Ari Schaefer..(Bassen, Ned)
Related: [-]
49 49 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Tue 04/29 2:27 PM
ORDER granting48 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Initial Pretrial conference scheduled for June 11, 2025 at 11:00 AM is ADJOURNED to July 16, 2025 at 11:30 AM. The Initial Pretrial materials are due one week before the conference. No further extensions will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 7/16/2025 at 11:30 AM before Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 4/29/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
48 48 motion Adjourn Conference Tue 04/29 10:46 AM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference re: June 11, 2025 Initial pretrial conference addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Ned H. Bassen dated April 29, 2025. Document filed by Meghan Jones, Klick USA, Inc. d/b/a Klick Health, Alexander Leavitt, Ari Schaefer..(Bassen, Ned)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
47 47 motion Conference Mon 04/28 6:58 PM
LETTER MOTION for Conference in anticipation of Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from James deBoer dated April 28, 2025. Document filed by Kaitlin Lally..(Deboer, James)
Related: [-]
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Mon 04/28 10:05 AM
FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 6/12/2025 at 10:00 AM in telephone or video conference.(sni)
Related: [-]