Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Julia K Munley
Case #: 3:23-cv-01941
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Nov 22, 2023
Terminated:Feb 20, 2024
Last checked: Monday May 20, 2024 4:47 AM EDT
Defendant
Johnson & Wales University
Represented By
Paul J. Bond
Holland & Knight
contact info
Sophie Kletzien
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Kathleen M Princivalle
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Lawrence Wright
Represented By
Max Morgan
The Weitz Firm, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 02/20 4:32 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE as stipulation of dismissal has been filed15 ; Parties to have 30 days to consummate the settlement. Signed by Honorable Julia K Munley on 2/20/24. (sm)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
15 15 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 02/16 1:15 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Johnson & Wales University. (Bond, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
14 14 order Scheduling Order Thu 02/01 1:50 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 2/28/2024 10:00 AM in Scranton before Honorable Julia K Munley. Plaintiff to initiate the call; Joint plan due 5 days prior; **SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS** Signed by Honorable Julia K Munley on 2/1/24. (sm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 01/31 2:52 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Johnson & Wales University.(Bond, Paul)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
12 12 order Special Admissions Form Approved Fri 12/15 2:37 PM
SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Sophie L. kleitzien Signed by Honorable Julia K Munley on 12/14/23. (sm)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Special Admissions Form Approved Fri 12/15 2:35 PM
SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Paul Bond Signed by Honorable Julia K Munley on 12/14/23. (sm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 12/13 5:00 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer - answer due 1/31/2024. Signed by Honorable Julia K Munley on 12/13/23 (sm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
9 9 misc Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice Tue 12/12 4:23 PM
PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Paul J. Bond on behalf of Johnson & Wales University Attorney Paul Bond is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-6488595.. (Bond, Paul)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice Tue 12/12 4:08 PM
PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Sophie Kletzien on behalf of Johnson & Wales University Attorney Sophie Kletzien is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-6488532.. (Kletzien, Sophie)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 12/12 10:08 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Johnson & Wales University.(Princivalle, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
6 6 misc Disclosure Statement Pursuant To FRCP 7.1 (Parent Corporations) Tue 12/12 10:05 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Johnson & Wales University. (Princivalle, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Tue 12/12 9:58 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen M Princivalle on behalf of Johnson & Wales University (Princivalle, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 11/28 5:34 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lawrence Wright. Johnson & Wales University served on 11/28/2023, answer due 12/19/2023. (Morgan, Max)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
3 3 1 pgs order Order Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Mon 11/27 11:38 AM
ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Signed by Honorable Julia K Munley on 11/27/23. (sm) (Main Document 3 replaced on 11/27/2023) (sm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 11/22 4:28 PM
Summons Issued as to Johnson & Wales University and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (cp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Packet
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 11/22 4:27 PM
COMPLAINT against Johnson & Wales University ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-6471252), filed by Lawrence Wright.(cp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet