New York Western District Court
Case #: 1:23-cr-00146
Case Filed:Nov 22, 2023
Terminated:Nov 22, 2023
Last checked: Friday Nov 24, 2023 2:21 AM EST
Plaintiff
USA
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Travell Thomas (1)
Terminated: 11/22/2023


Docket last updated: 10/05/2024 1:04 AM EDT
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
1 1 TRANSFER OF JURISDICTION for Supervision of Release Travell Thomas. Received copies of indictment, judgment and docket sheet from Southern District of New York. (JLV)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Docket sheet,
Att: 2 Judgment,
Att: 3 Indictment