Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:John M Younge
Case #: 2:23-cv-04646
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Nov 24, 2023
Terminated:Jul 31, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday May 22, 2024 5:01 AM EDT
Defendant
FRANKLIN TOWNE CHARTER HIGH SCHOOL
Represented By
Meghan Wynkoop
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
JOSEPH LONGO
O'Hagan Meyer PLLC
contact info
Anastasia Shubert-Baranowski
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
Defendant
THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF FRANKLIN TOWNE CHARTER HIGH SCHOOL
Represented By
Meghan Wynkoop
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
JOSEPH LONGO
O'Hagan Meyer PLLC
contact info
Anastasia Shubert-Baranowski
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
Defendant
JOSEPH VENDITTI
Represented By
Meghan Wynkoop
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
JOSEPH LONGO
O'Hagan Meyer PLLC
contact info
Anastasia Shubert-Baranowski
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
Plaintiff
PATRICK FIELD
Represented By
Christopher A. Miller
Miller Shah LLP
contact info
JAMES C. SHAH
Miller Shah LLP
contact info
ALEC BERIN
Miller Shah LLP
contact info
ERIC L. YOUNG
Young Law Group
contact info
JOSHUA M. BAKER
Young Law Group, PC
contact info
JAMES E. MILLER
Miller Shah LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
24 24 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Wed 07/31 9:09 AM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 7/24/24. 7/31/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
23 23 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 07/24 2:42 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by PATRICK FIELD. (BAKER, JOSHUA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Motion Thu 05/16 4:03 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of re17 First MOTION to Compel RFPD Responses (BAKER, JOSHUA)
Related: [-]
21 21 minutes Docket Call Thu 05/16 12:31 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. YOUNGE Video Conference held on 5/16/24. (bw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
20 20 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 05/02 1:10 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re17 First MOTION to Compel RFPD Responses filed by FRANKLIN TOWNE CHARTER HIGH SCHOOL, THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF FRANKLIN TOWNE CHARTER HIGH SCHOOL, JOSEPH VENDITTI.(Wynkoop, Meghan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum Memorandum,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service,
Att: 3 Exhibit A
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 04/23 2:38 PM
ORDER THAT A CONFERENCE WITH THE COURT WILL BE HELD ON 5/16/2024 AT 11:00 AM BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. YOUNGE. COUNSEL SHALL APPEAR BY VIDEO. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 4/23/24. 4/23/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Tue 04/23 9:16 AM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by JOSEPH LONGO on behalf of FRANKLIN TOWNE CHARTER HIGH SCHOOL, THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF FRANKLIN TOWNE CHARTER HIGH SCHOOL, JOSEPH VENDITTI(LONGO, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
17 17 motion Compel Mon 04/22 6:39 PM
First MOTION to Compel RFPD Responses filed by PATRICK FIELD.Motion to Compel Discovery Responses.(BAKER, JOSHUA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Compiled Exhibits 1-7
Thursday, April 04, 2024
16 16 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement Thu 04/04 11:16 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: ALL EXPERT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 9/12/24. ALL MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED BY 10/16/24. THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS FOR SETTLEMENT PURPOSES. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 2/20/25 AT 10:00 AM. COUNSEL SHALL APPEAR BY REMOTE VIDEO AND WILL BE NOTIFIED BY CHAMBERS VIA EMAIL WITH INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO PARTICIPATE REMOTELY. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 4/4/24. 4/4/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (mbh)
Related: [-]
15 15 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Thu 04/04 10:52 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN M. YOUNGE. Video Pretrial Conference held on 4/4/24. (mbh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
14 14 discov Discovery Plan Tue 03/26 11:23 AM
Discovery Plan by PATRICK FIELD.(BAKER, JOSHUA)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/25 2:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Anastasia Shubert-Baranowski on behalf of FRANKLIN TOWNE CHARTER HIGH SCHOOL, THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF FRANKLIN TOWNE CHARTER HIGH SCHOOL, JOSEPH VENDITTI (Shubert-Baranowski, Anastasia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/07 1:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA M. BAKER on behalf of PATRICK FIELD (BAKER, JOSHUA)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 02/05 2:21 PM
ORDER THAT A FRCP 16 CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 4/4/2024 AT 10:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE. COUNSEL SHALL APPEAR BY VIDEO AND WILL BE NOTIFIED BY CHAMBERS STAFF VIA EMAIL OF THE CONFERENCE LINK INSTRUCTIONS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. YOUNGE ON 2/5/24. 2/5/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
10 10 19 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Fri 02/02 3:33 PM
Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by FRANKLIN TOWNE CHARTER HIGH SCHOOL, THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF FRANKLIN TOWNE CHARTER HIGH SCHOOL, JOSEPH VENDITTI.(LONGO, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/02 3:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan Wynkoop on behalf of FRANKLIN TOWNE CHARTER HIGH SCHOOL, THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF FRANKLIN TOWNE CHARTER HIGH SCHOOL, JOSEPH VENDITTI with Certificate of Service(Wynkoop, Meghan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/02 3:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH LONGO on behalf of FRANKLIN TOWNE CHARTER HIGH SCHOOL, THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF FRANKLIN TOWNE CHARTER HIGH SCHOOL, JOSEPH VENDITTI with Certificate of Service(LONGO, JOSEPH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service
Thursday, December 14, 2023
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 12/14 11:59 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PATRICK FIELD. FRANKLIN TOWNE CHARTER HIGH SCHOOL waiver sent on 12/4/2023, answer due 2/2/2024; THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF FRANKLIN TOWNE CHARTER HIGH SCHOOL waiver sent on 12/4/2023, answer due 2/2/2024; JOSEPH VENDITTI waiver sent on 12/4/2023, answer due 2/2/2024. (YOUNG, ERIC)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/14 11:51 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A. Miller on behalf of PATRICK FIELD with Certificate of Service(Miller, Christopher)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/14 11:47 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by ALEC BERIN on behalf of PATRICK FIELD with Certificate of Service(BERIN, ALEC)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/14 11:40 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES E. MILLER on behalf of PATRICK FIELD with Certificate of Service(MILLER, JAMES)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/14 11:37 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES C. SHAH on behalf of PATRICK FIELD with Certificate of Service(SHAH, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 11/27 10:09 AM
Summons Issued as to FRANKLIN TOWNE CHARTER HIGH SCHOOL, THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF FRANKLIN TOWNE CHARTER HIGH SCHOOL, JOSEPH VENDITTI. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 11/27/23 (bw)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 24, 2023
1 1 32 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Fri 11/24 3:35 PM
COMPLAINT against FRANKLIN TOWNE CHARTER HIGH SCHOOL, THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF FRANKLIN TOWNE CHARTER HIGH SCHOOL, JOSEPH VENDITTI ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-17091328.), filed by PATRICK FIELD.(YOUNG, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form