Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Susan Paradise Baxter
Case #: 1:23-cv-00331
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)
Case Filed:Nov 21, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, December 09, 2024
13 13 misc Supplement Tue 12/10 4:03 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF by MASHIYAT RASHID. (keh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, April 15, 2024
12 12 respoth Reply (do not select for a Response to Motion) Mon 04/15 3:35 PM
REPLY to9 Response to Habeas Petition, filed by MASHIYAT RASHID. (keh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Envelope
Thursday, April 11, 2024
11 11 order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Thu 04/11 9:44 AM
ORDER denying10 Motion for Summary/Default Judgment. The government filed a response to Petitioner's petition on March 28, 2024. Petitioner's request that his petition be granted as unopposed is, accordingly, denied. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 4/11/24. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jdg)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
10 10 motion Summary Judgment Tue 04/09 8:47 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by MASHIYAT RASHID. Motion(s) referred to Richard A. Lanzillo. (keh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, March 28, 2024
9 9 respoth Response to Habeas Petition Thu 03/28 3:18 PM
RESPONSE to3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by HUTCHINSON. (Fischer, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Attachment A,
Att: 3 Attachment B,
Att: 4 Attachment C,
Att: 5 Attachment D,
Att: 6 Exhibit 2,
Att: 7 Exhibit 3
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 03/20 4:06 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Susan Paradise Baxter, presiding and Chief Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo, referral. (dlh)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
8 8 service Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed Mon 03/11 8:55 AM
Return of Service Returned Executed by MASHIYAT RASHID. HUTCHINSON served on 2/20/2024, answer due 4/22/2024. (keh)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
7 7 order Order for Consent/DJO form Mon 02/05 9:18 AM
TEXT ORDER: In accordance with the case management system in place in this district, this case has been assigned to the undersigned for all pretrial matters. Therefore, it is ORDERED that on or before 2/26/2024 , the PETITIONER shall complete an election form either consenting to jurisdiction by the Magistrate Judge or electing to have a District Judge assigned to the case, and shall file the form with the Clerk's Office. A copy of the form will be provided to Petitioner with this Order. Consent to Jurisdiction by Mag. Judge or electing to have a District Judge assigned due by 2/26/2024. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 2/5/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dlh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
6 6 misc Consent to Trial by Mag. Judge OR District Judge Option Wed 01/31 1:16 PM
CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by HUTCHINSON. (Fischer, Adam)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/31 1:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Fischer on behalf of HUTCHINSON. (Fischer, Adam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
4 4 order Habeas Corpus Service Tue 01/09 3:34 PM
IT IS ORDERED that the United States Marshal shall serve this Order, together with the petition, upon: (1) the Warden of FCI McKean; (2) the United States Attorney General; and (3) the United States Attorney for the Western District of Pennsylvania. Service shall be by certified mail. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 1/9/2024. (dlh)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
3 3 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (for Clerk of Court personnel only) Mon 12/11 12:53 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by MASHIYAT RASHID. (jkn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Request to inmate account office
2 2 misc Filing Fee Received Mon 12/11 12:37 PM
Filing fee: $5, receipt number 200006952 (jkn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
1 1 utility Remark for lodged habeas petition Fri 11/24 3:04 PM
Remark: Habeas Petition lodged without Motion for In Forma Pauperis or payment of filing fee (sms)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Request to inmate account office,
Att: 3 Envelope