VELO MOBILITY, INC.
Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | A Benjamin Goldgar |
Case #: | 1:23-bk-15797 |
Case Filed: | Nov 25, 2023 |
Creditor Meeting: | Dec 22, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jan 02, 2024 |
Debtor
VELO MOBILITY, INC.
894 Green Bay Road
Winnetka, IL 60093 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Alex D Moglia, ESQ
Moglia Advisors 1325 Remington Rd, Ste H
Schaumburg, IL 60173 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 219 S Dearborn St Room 873
Chicago, IL 60604 |
Docket last updated: 11/27/2023 12:01 AM CST |
Saturday, November 25, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual Fee Amount $338, Filed by Eric G Zelazny on behalf of VELO MOBILITY, INC. (Zelazny, Eric) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Sat 11/25 12:50 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 23-15797 ) [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A47210451. Fee Amount $ 338.00 (Zelazny, Eric) (U.S. Treasury) |
|
3 | 3
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Asset Corporation)
Sat 11/25 1:10 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/22/2023 at 12:00 PM at Zoom - Moglia: Meeting ID 501 638 3126, Passcode 6482383399, Phone 1-872-201-2797. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account) |