Nevada District Court
Judge:Jennifer A Dorsey
Referred: Brenda Weksler
Case #: 2:23-cv-01958
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Nov 27, 2023
Case in other court:Eighth Judicial District Court, County of Clark, A-23-879565-c
Last checked: Saturday May 25, 2024 2:33 AM PDT
Defendant
Best Buy Co., Inc.
Backus } Burden 3050 S. Durango Drive
Las Vegas, NV 89117
Represented By
Lisa M. Szyc
Spilotro And Kulla, Chtd.
contact info
Dallin Knecht
Backus Burden
contact info
Jack P. Burden
Backus Carranza
contact info
Plaintiff
David Losey
High Stakes Injury Law 320 South Jones
Las Vegas, NV 89107
Represented By
Scott Poisson
Bernstein & Poisson
contact info
Ryan Kerbow
Bernstein & Poisson
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
26 26 order Order on Joint Pretrial Order Mon 05/12 11:31 AM
PRETRIAL ORDER granting25 Joint Pretrial Order. Jury Trial set for 5/19/2026 at 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. Calendar Call set for 5/4/2026 at 01:30 PM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. Exhibit List due by 5/4/2026. Proposed Jury Instructions due by 5/4/2026. Proposed Voir Dire due by 5/4/2026. Trial Briefs due by 5/4/2026. Motions in Limine due by 3/20/2026, and responses are due 14 days later. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/9/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
25 25 motion Proposed Pretrial Order Wed 04/23 4:57 PM
Proposed Joint Pretrial Order by Defendant Best Buy Co., Inc.. (Burden, Jack)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
24 24 notice Notice Appearance of Counsel Thu 04/17 2:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jacquelyn Michelle Franco on behalf of Defendant Best Buy Co., Inc.. AMENDED (Franco, Jacquelyn)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice Appearance of Counsel Thu 04/17 2:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jacquelyn Michelle Franco on behalf of Defendant Best Buy Co., Inc.. (Franco, Jacquelyn)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice Other Thu 04/17 2:33 PM
NOTICE of Remocal of Counsel for Defendant Bestg Buy Co., Inc. by Best Buy Co., Inc.. (Szyc, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
21 21 5 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 01/03 11:28 AM
ORDER Granting20 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Motions due by 2/20/2025. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/26/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 1/3/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
20 20 motion Stipulation Thu 01/02 2:05 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Third Request) by Defendant Best Buy Co., Inc..(Szyc, Lisa) (extend) (discovery)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Exhibit Appendix,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit F
Monday, July 01, 2024
19 19 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Scheduling Order Mon 07/01 4:29 PM
ORDER granting ECF No.18 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request). Discovery due by 12/23/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 1/23/2025. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/24/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/1/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
18 18 motion Stipulation Fri 06/28 1:20 PM
Second STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) to Extend Discovery Deadlines re15 Order on Stipulation,, Scheduling Order, by Defendant Best Buy Co., Inc.. (Burden, Jack) (extend) (discovery)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
minord Minute Order Order on Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List Fri 05/31 3:04 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 5/31/2024. ORDER granting16 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. The Clerk of Court is kindly directed to remove attorney Dallin Knecht from the electronic-service list. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BCI)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
16 16 motion Motion Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List Thu 05/30 11:28 AM
MOTION to remove attorney Dallin Knecht from the Electronic Service List in this case by Defendant Best Buy Co., Inc.. (Burden, Jack)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
15 15 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Scheduling Order Tue 04/23 1:42 PM
ORDER Granting14 Stipulation for Extension of Time re9 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 9/23/2024. Motions due by 10/25/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/25/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 4/23/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
14 14 motion Stipulation Thu 04/18 1:32 PM
First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re9 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order,,, by Defendant Best Buy Co., Inc.. (Szyc, Lisa) (extend) (discovery)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice Appearance of Counsel Thu 04/18 8:03 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Lisa M. Szyc on behalf of Defendant Best Buy Co., Inc.. (Szyc, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
12 12 6 pgs order Order on Stipulated Protective Order Wed 01/17 12:10 PM
ORDER Granting11 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 1/16/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Stipulated Protective Order Tue 01/16 9:08 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Defendant Best Buy Co., Inc... (Knecht, Dallin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
9 9 4 pgs order Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Thu 01/11 3:32 PM
ORDER granting8 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 7/25/2024. Motions due by 8/26/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/25/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 1/11/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
Related: [-]
notice Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge Thu 01/11 3:33 PM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (CAH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
8 8 motion Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Wed 01/10 8:10 AM
Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant Best Buy Co., Inc... (Knecht, Dallin)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
6 6 misc Statement in Removal Case Fri 12/01 9:15 AM
STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Best Buy Co., Inc... (Knecht, Dallin)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Certificate Interested Parties Fri 12/01 9:00 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Best Buy Co., Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Best Buy Stores L.P. (MN & DE), Other Affiliate Best Buy Co., Inc. (MN) for Best Buy Co., Inc. added.. (Burden, Jack)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice Other Fri 12/01 8:43 AM
NOTICE of Minutes of the Court dated 11 30-2023 by Best Buy Co., Inc. re3 Minute Order Removal Case,.. (Burden, Jack)
Related: [-]
misc QC Notice Fri 12/01 4:46 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No.4 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b). Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. (no image attached) (CJS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
3 3 minord Minute Order Removal Case Thu 11/30 4:59 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/30/2023. By Deputy Clerk: A. Miller. Statement regarding removed action is due by 12/15/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 12/30/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Tue 11/28 4:20 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by David Losey. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Kerbow, Ryan)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition Removal Tue 11/28 1:34 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District, Case Number A-23-879565-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7506379) by Best Buy Co., Inc.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 12/8/2023. (Burden, Jack)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service Index,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit C,
Att: 6 Exhibit D,
Att: 7 Exhibit E,
Att: 8 Exhibit F,
Att: 9 Exhibit G,
Att: 10 Exhibit H
Monday, November 27, 2023
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Thu 11/30 4:57 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (AMMi)
Related: [-]